New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Ann M Donnelly
Referred: Lois Bloom
Case #: 1:18-cv-01351
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Mar 01, 2018
Terminated:Oct 11, 2018
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 28, 2018 4:55 AM EDT
Cross Claimant
Eric Burtis
Represented By
George F. Sacco
George F. Sacco, Esq.
contact info
Cross Claimant
Brad Stark
Represented By
George F. Sacco
George F. Sacco, Esq.
contact info
Cross Claimant
Amanda Kegly
Represented By
George F. Sacco
George F. Sacco, Esq.
contact info
Cross Claimant
Hertz Corporations, LLC
Represented By
George F. Sacco
George F. Sacco, Esq.
contact info
Cross Claimant
Christopher Ferguson
Represented By
George F. Sacco
George F. Sacco, Esq.
contact info
Cross Claimant
ESIS Insurance Company
Represented By
George F. Sacco
George F. Sacco, Esq.
contact info
Cross Defendant
New York City Police Department
Cross Defendant
Mary Lowenburg
Cross Defendant
Laurinberg
Represented By
Daron R. Ravenborg
Nyc Law Department
contact info
Cross Defendant
Police Officer Gullo
Cross Defendant
Chubb Corporation LLC
Cross Defendant
City of New York
Represented By
Daron R. Ravenborg
Nyc Law Department
contact info
Defendant
Christopher Ferguson
Represented By
George F. Sacco
George F. Sacco, Esq.
contact info
Defendant
Eric Burtis
Represented By
George F. Sacco
George F. Sacco, Esq.
contact info
Defendant
Chubb Corporation LLC
Defendant
Brad Stark
Represented By
George F. Sacco
George F. Sacco, Esq.
contact info
Defendant
New York City Police Department
Defendant
Laurinberg
Represented By
Daron R. Ravenborg
Nyc Law Department
contact info
Defendant
Amanda Kegly
Represented By
George F. Sacco
George F. Sacco, Esq.
contact info
Defendant
Hertz Corporations, LLC
Represented By
George F. Sacco
George F. Sacco, Esq.
contact info
Defendant
ESIS Insurance Company
Represented By
George F. Sacco
George F. Sacco, Esq.
contact info
Plaintiff
Reginald Anderson
155-02 116th Drive
Jamaica, NY 11434
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Mary Lowenburg
Terminated: 07/31/2018
Represented By
Daron R. Ravenborg
Nyc Law Department
contact info
Defendant
Police Officer Gullo
Terminated: 07/31/2018
Represented By
Daron R. Ravenborg
Nyc Law Department
contact info
Defendant
City of New York
Terminated: 07/31/2018
Represented By
Daron R. Ravenborg
Nyc Law Department
contact info


Docket last updated: 42 minutes ago
Thursday, October 11, 2018
28 28 misc Stipulation Thu 10/11 2:16 PM
STIPULATION Discontinuing Action with prejudice by Eric Burtis, Chubb Corporation LLC, ESIS Insurance Company, Christopher Ferguson, Hertz Corporations, LLC, Amanda Kegly, Brad Stark (Sacco, George)
Related: [-]
order Order Dismissing Case Thu 10/11 4:31 PM
Stipulation Discontinuing action with prejudice. Ordered by Judge Ann M. Donnelly on 10/11/2018. (Greene, Donna)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 03, 2018
27 27 order Scheduling Order Thu 10/04 5:43 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: The parties settled the case on the record in Court on 7/17/2018. To date, parties have not filed their stipulation. The Court shall hold a conference in this case on 10/16/2018 at 1:00 p.m. in Courtroom 11A South of the United States Courthouse, unless the parties file the stipulation discontinuing the case against all Hertz and ESIS defendants by 10/10/2018 . SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom, on 10/3/2018. C/mailed. (Conference set for 10/16/2018 at 1:00 p.m. in Courtroom 11A South before Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom.) (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 31, 2018
26 26 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Parties Tue 07/31 3:32 PM
Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal. Parties Mary Lowenburg (Queens County Assistant District Attorney), City of New York and Gullo (New York City Police Officer (Shield #12097 103 precinct), in their official capacities) terminated. Ordered by Judge Ann M. Donnelly on 7/31/2018. (Greene, Donna)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 26, 2018
25 25 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 07/27 4:48 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Reginald Anderson. (Ramesar, Thameera)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 17, 2018
24 24 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay ~Util - Set Deadlines Wed 07/18 10:59 AM
ORDER: The parties agreed to the terms of the settlement on the record and the Court confirmed that all parties understood that the agreement is binding and enforceable. Accordingly, plaintiff and the Hertz and ESIS defendants shall file a stipulation discontinuing this case against all Hertz and ESIS defendants by 8/31/2018. Plaintiff also stated that he will voluntarily dismiss his claims against defendants City of New York, Officer Gullo, and ADA Lowenburg ("the City Defendants") with prejudice. The Office of the Corporation Counsel stated that the City Defendants would accept plaintiff's voluntary dismissal with prejudice to resolve this matter. The Office of the Corporation Counsel shall draft a stipulation of dismissal with prejudice for plaintiff to file with the Court. In light of these developments, the Court grants the City Defendants'22 motion to stay discovery. The Court applauds the parties for their efforts to resolve this matter on the record at today's conference. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom, on 7/17/2018. C/mailed. (Stipulation Discontinuing this Case shall be filed by 8/31/2018.) (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
Related: [-]
23 23 minutes Initial Conference Hearing Wed 07/18 10:36 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom: Initial Conference held on 7/17/2018. Recorded. Tick #(s) 11:05 - 11:14; 12:29 - 12:38. Appearance for Plaintiff: Reginald Anderson, pro se . Appearances for Defendants: George Sacco, Esq.; Daron R. Ravenborg, Assistant Corporation Counsel; and Suzanna Mettham, Assistant Corporation Counsel. (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 13, 2018
22 22 motion Stay Fri 07/13 12:20 PM
MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending City Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by City of New York, Gullo, Mary Lowenburg. (Ravenborg, Daron)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 09, 2018
21 21 misc Letter Mon 07/09 10:33 AM
Letter requesting oral arguments, re: City Defendants' motion to dismiss by City of New York, Gullo, Mary Lowenburg (Ravenborg, Daron)
Related: [-]
20 20 respm Affidavit/Declaration in Support of Motion Mon 07/09 10:30 AM
AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re18 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b) filed by City of New York, Gullo, Mary Lowenburg. (Ravenborg, Daron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
19 19 9 pgs respoth Memorandum in Support Mon 07/09 10:27 AM
MEMORANDUM in Support re18 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b) filed by City of New York, Gullo, Mary Lowenburg. (Ravenborg, Daron)
Related: [-]
18 18 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 07/09 10:26 AM
Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b) by City of New York, Gullo, Mary Lowenburg. (Ravenborg, Daron)
Related: [-]
order Scheduling Order Mon 07/09 1:05 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: By August 23, 2018, the plaintiff is to file his response to the motion to dismiss18 filed by the defendants City of New York, Police Officer Gullo, and Mary Lowenburg. The defendants are to file their reply, if any, by September 12, 2018. Ordered by Judge Ann M Donnelly on 7/9/2018. (Alsarraf, Ali)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 11, 2018
17 17 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 06/14 10:38 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed Eric Burtis served on 4/7/2018, answer due 4/30/2018; Chubb Corporation LLC served on 4/7/2018, answer due 4/30/2018; City of New York served on 4/17/2018, answer due 7/9/2018; ESIS Insurance Company served on 4/7/2018, answer due 4/30/2018; Christopher Ferguson served on 4/7/2018, answer due 4/30/2018; Gullo served on 4/12/2018, answer due 7/9/2018; Hertz Corporations, LLC served on 4/7/2018, answer due 4/30/2018; Amanda Kegly served on 4/7/2018, answer due 4/30/2018; Laurinberg served on 4/20/2018, answer due 5/11/2018; Brad Stark served on 4/7/2018, answer due 4/30/2018. (Ramesar, Thameera)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 01, 2018
16 16 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 06/04 10:37 AM
ORDER: Plaintiff writes to15 request an extension of time to respond to defendants' first set of interrogatories. The Court becomes involved in discovery only when there is a dispute that the parties have tried, but are unable to resolve. That being said, the first extension request is generally granted as a courtesy and defendants would likely grant plaintiff the extension he seeks. The Court shall hold an initial telephone conference on 7/17/2018 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 11A South of the United States Courthouse. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom, on 6/1/2018. C/mailed. (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Hearings Mon 06/04 10:40 AM
Set / Reset Hearing: Initial Telephone Conference set for 7/17/2018 at 11:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom. ( See doc.# 16 .) (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 31, 2018
15 15 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 05/31 4:04 PM
Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Reginald Anderson. (Ramesar, Thameera)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 25, 2018
14 14 misc Bond Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 05/25 11:13 AM
BOND posted by Eric Burtis, ESIS Insurance Company, Christopher Ferguson, Hertz Corporations, LLC, Amanda Kegly, Brad Stark, Corporate Disclosure Statement by Eric Burtis, ESIS Insurance Company, Christopher Ferguson, Hertz Corporations, LLC, Amanda Kegly, Brad Stark identifying Corporate Parent Hertz Global Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Chubb Limited for Amanda Kegly, Amanda Kegly, Brad Stark, Brad Stark, Christopher Ferguson, Christopher Ferguson, ESIS Insurance Company, ESIS Insurance Company, Eric Burtis, Eric Burtis, Hertz Corporations, LLC, Hertz Corporations, LLC. (Sacco, George)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 24, 2018
13 13 answer Answer to Complaint Crossclaim Thu 05/24 4:25 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against Chubb Corporation LLC, City of New York, Gullo, Laurinberg, Mary Lowenburg, New York City Police Department by Eric Burtis, Christopher Ferguson, Brad Stark, Amanda Kegly. (Sacco, George)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 17, 2018
12 12 notice Notice(Other) Mon 05/21 2:52 PM
NOTICE of 'Plaintiff's Statement of Monetary Damages' filed by Reginald Anderson. (Ramesar, Thameera)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 09, 2018
11 11 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 05/11 10:25 AM
ORDER: The Office of Corporation Counsel writes on behalf of the City defendants to request a sixty-day extension of time to respond to pro se plaintiff's complaint and to defendants Hertz Corporation, LLC ("Hertz") and ESIS Insurance Company's ("ESIS") cross-claims. The10 request is granted. Defendants City of New York, Lowenburg, and Gullo shall respond to plaintiff's complaint and to defendants Hertz and ESIS's cross-claims by 7/9/2018. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom, on 5/9/2018. C/mailed. (City of New York; ADA Mary Lowenburg; and Gullo's answers due by 7/9/2018.) (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 08, 2018
10 10 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Tue 05/08 2:10 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to complaint and cross claims by City of New York, Laurinberg. (Ravenborg, Daron)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 04, 2018
9 9 order Order(Other) ~Util - Set Deadlines Fri 05/04 5:00 PM
ORDER: By6 letter filed 5/1/2018, pro se plaintiff informs the Court that he is having difficulty serving individual defendants Burtis, Ferguson, Kegly, and Starks. From review of the Complaint, it appears that the aforementioned individual defendants are employed by defendant ESIS Insurance Company ("ESIS"). Defendant ESIS recently filed its7 answer in this matter and counsel has appeared on its behalf. Accordingly, counsel for ESIS shall provide plaintiff with the last known addresses for defendants Burtis, Ferguson, Kegly, and Starks or agree to accept service on their behalf by 6/4/2018. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom, on 5/4/2018. C/mailed. (Defendant ESIS's Response due by 6/4/2018.) (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 05/04 12:00 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Daron R. Ravenborg on behalf of City of New York, Laurinberg (aty to be noticed) (Ravenborg, Daron)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 03, 2018
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Crossclaim Thu 05/03 4:17 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against City of New York, Gullo, Laurinberg, New York City Police Department, Queens County District Attorney by Hertz Corporations, LLC, ESIS Insurance Company. (Sacco, George)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 01, 2018
6 6 misc Letter Wed 05/02 11:42 AM
Letter dated 4/26/2018 to Judge Lois Bloom from pro se Reginald Anderson, stating that the undersigned was unable to serve the summons and complaint upon four defendants and requesting the Court's assistance regarding this matter. (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 12, 2018
5 5 service Summons Issued Fri 04/13 11:47 AM
Amended Summons Issued as to Eric Burtis, Chubb Corporation LLC, City of New York, ESIS Insurance Company, Christopher Ferguson, Gullo, Hertz Corporations, LLC, Amanda Kegly, Laurinberg, Brad Stark. (Piper, Francine)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 07, 2018
4 4 order Order(Other) ~Util - Set Deadlines Thu 03/08 10:45 AM
ORDER: The Honorable Ann M. Donnelly assigned this case to me for all pretrial purposes. Enclosed is a copy of the "Individual Practices of Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom." Plaintiff and defendants, alike, are required to follow these rules. Plaintiff is to provide a copy of this Order and the enclosed rules to defendants along with the summons and complaint. Plaintiff shall have 90 days from the date the summonses were issued to serve defendants. Accordingly, if service is not made upon defendants by 6/4/2018, or if plaintiff fails to show good cause why such service has not been effected by that date, it will be recommended that the Court should dismiss this action without prejudice. Plaintiff may choose to receive electronic notification of court issued filings in this civil case. If plaintiff is eligible and wishes to receive electronic notification of court issued documents, plaintiff should complete the attached Registration and Consent form and return the form to the Court. Plaintiff is advised that even if he chooses to receive electronic notifications in this action, he is still required to advise the Court of any change to his mailing address. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom, on 3/7/2018. C/mailed w/Attachments: # 1 Individual Practices of Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom, # 2 Instruction for Pro Se Registration and Consent for Electronic Service of Orders and Notices Issued by the Court in Civil Cases, # 3 Pro Se Registration and Consent Form. ( Service upon Defendants due by 6/4/2018.) (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 06, 2018
3 3 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Tue 03/06 11:07 AM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 05, 2018
2 2 service Summons Issued Tue 03/06 11:06 AM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 01, 2018
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 03/06 11:04 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Reginald Anderson. (Bowens, Priscilla)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
misc Filing Fee Received Tue 03/06 11:07 AM
FILING FEE: $ 400, receipt number 4653125255 (Bowens, Priscilla)
Related: [-]