Wilkes County v. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-45239 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 05, 2018 |
Case in other court: | North Carolina Western, 5:18-cv-00030 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 5:18 PM EST |
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Noramco Inc
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Rite Aid Corporation
|
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
The North Carolina Mutual Wholesale Drug Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
The Purdue Frederick Company Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walmart, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
KVK-Tech, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Wilkes County
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 6:49 PM EDT |
Friday, February 16, 2018 | ||
Case assigned to Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney and Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the[LINK:Case Assignment Packet] . This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (nvc) [Transferred from ncwd on 3/5/2018.] | ||
Clerk's Entry and Service of[LINK:Initial Scheduling Order] and[LINK:Certificate of Initial Attorney FRCP 26(f) Conference Form] pursuant to the Standing Order Governing Civil Case Management before the Honorable Frank D. Whitney (3:07-mc-47 (Doc. No. 2)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. (nvc) [Transferred from ncwd on 3/5/2018.] | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-3599606), filed by Wilkes County.(Whitaker, Garry) [Transferred from ncwd on 3/5/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Cover Sheet Civil Coversheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit CIVIL COVERSHEET ADDENDUM | ||
Monday, March 05, 2018 | ||
2 | 2 Transfer Order of Judicial Panel MDL transferring case to District of Ohio Northern, MDL# 2804. Matter transferred for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case electronically transferred to District of Ohio Northern. (tmg) [Transferred from ncwd on 3/5/2018.] | |
3 | 3 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of North Carolina Western. Case number 5:18-cv-00030. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |