City of Cleveland, Ohio v. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-45132 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 06, 2018 |
Last checked: Monday Mar 02, 2020 10:13 AM EST |
*** SELECTION REQUIRED
Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc.
101 Reisterstown Road
Pikesville, MD 21208 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Noramco, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Prescription Supply Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
RiteAid Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walgreen Co.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Walmart, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Discount Drug Mart, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Anda, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Allergan Finance LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CVS Indiana, L.L.C.
|
|
Defendant
CVS RX Services, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cephalon, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Co.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
HBC Service Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Insys Therapeutics, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Plaintiff
State of Ohio
|
|
Plaintiff
City of Cleveland, Ohio
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Barbara A. Langhenry
|
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Miami-Luken, Inc.
Terminated: 05/18/2018
|
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.
Terminated: 07/20/2018
|
|
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
Terminated: 06/20/2018
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Kroger Co.
Terminated: 05/18/2018
|
Docket last updated: 03/02/2020 10:13 AM EST |
Tuesday, March 06, 2018 | ||
1 | 1 182 pgs Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-8584914. Plaintiff has indicated that case may be related to pending civil action 1:17-md-2804 . Filed by Cleveland, City of. (Butler, David) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |