MSO OF PUERTO RICO LLC et al v. GONZALEZ et al
Puerto Rico District Court | |
Judge: | Francisco A Besosa |
Case #: | 3:18-cv-01126 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 18:1836(b) Civil Action to Protect Trade Secrets |
Case Filed: | Mar 07, 2018 |
Terminated: | Apr 27, 2018 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 03, 2018 5:17 AM AST |
Counter Claimant
Priscilla Gonzalez
|
Represented By
|
Counter Claimant
Angel Rivera
|
Represented By
|
Counter Claimant
Smart Care Solutions LLC
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Castellana Physician Services, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
MMM Healthcare LLC
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
MSO of Puerto Rico LLC
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
PMC Medicare Choice LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Priscilla Gonzalez
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Angel Rivera
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Smart Care Solutions LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Castellana Physician Services, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MMM Healthcare LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MSO of Puerto Rico LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
PMC Medicare Choice LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM AST |
Friday, April 27, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
1
pgs
order
Judgment
Fri 04/27 11:09 AM
JUDGMENT dismissing this case without prejudice. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 04/27/2018. (brc) |
|
24 | 24
order
Order
Fri 04/27 10:52 AM
ORDER re22 Response to Motion. Request to dismiss the federal claims with prejudice is DENIED. Request for attorneys' fees is DENIED. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 04/27/2018. (brc) |
|
23 | 23
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Fri 04/27 10:43 AM
ORDER re21 Motion to Dismiss: GRANTED. This case is DISMISSED without prejudice. Judgment shall be entered accordingly. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 04/27/2018. (brc) |
|
22 | 22
3
pgs
respm
Response to Motion
Fri 04/27 10:07 AM
RESPONSE to Motion for Voluntary Dismissal filed by All Defendants Re:21 MOTION to dismiss as to Priscilla Gonzalez, Angel Rivera, Smart Care Solutions LLC filed by MMM Healthcare LLC, PMC Medicare Choice LLC, Castellana Physician Services, LLC, MSO of Puerto Rico LLC filed by All Defendants. (Colon, Kenneth) |
|
Thursday, April 26, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
2
pgs
motion
Dismiss
Thu 04/26 6:13 PM
MOTION to dismiss as to Priscilla Gonzalez, Angel Rivera, Smart Care Solutions LLC filed by Ramon E. Dapena on behalf of MMM Healthcare LLC, PMC Medicare Choice LLC, MSO of Puerto Rico LLC, Castellana Physician Services, LLC Responses due by 5/10/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Dapena, Ramon) |
|
20 | 20
order
Order on Informative Motion
Thu 04/26 4:53 PM
ORDER re19 Informative Motion: NOTED. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 04/26/2018. (brc) |
|
19 | 19
2
pgs
motion
Informative Motion
Thu 04/26 3:12 PM
INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Docket No 17 filed by Juan M. Frontera-Suau on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 5/10/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Frontera-Suau, Juan) |
|
Wednesday, April 25, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
order
Order on Informative Motion
Wed 04/25 6:02 PM
ORDER re17 Informative Motion: NOTED. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 04/25/2018. (brc) |
|
17 | 17
2
pgs
motion
Informative Motion
Wed 04/25 5:03 PM
INFORMATIVE Motion regarding proposal tendered to defendants filed by Ramon E. Dapena on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 5/9/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Dapena, Ramon) |
|
16 | 16
motion
Requesting Order
Wed 04/25 1:11 PM
MOTION requesting Order to the effect that the Motion to Dismiss (Docket No. 12) be granted as unopposed, that the Court dismiss all federal claims against the defendants with prejudice and the remaining state law claims without prejudice under federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6), and that the Court set aside the preliminary injunction hearing. filed by Kenneth Colon on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 5/9/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Colon, Kenneth) |
|
Monday, April 09, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
2
pgs
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 04/09 8:04 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Juan M. Frontera-Suau on behalf of All Defendants (Frontera-Suau, Juan) |
|
Friday, April 06, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
8
pgs
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Fri 04/06 6:46 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion Memorandum in Support of Injunctive Relief (Docket No. 2) filed by All Defendants Re:2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by MMM Healthcare LLC, PMC Medicare Choice LLC, Castellana Physician Services, LLC, MSO of Puerto Rico LLC filed by All Defendants. (Colon, Kenneth) |
|
13 | 13
17
pgs
answer
Answer to Complaint Counterclaim
Fri 04/06 6:40 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs filed by Kenneth Colon on behalf of Plaintiffs Castellana Physician Services, LLC, MMM Healthcare LLC, MSO of Puerto Rico LLC, PMC Medicare Choice LLC.(Colon, Kenneth) |
|
12 | 12
motion
Dismiss
Fri 04/06 6:37 PM
MOTION to dismiss as to All Plaintiffs filed by Kenneth Colon on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 4/20/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Colon, Kenneth) |
|
Tuesday, March 20, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order on Motion to Continue
Tue 03/20 11:03 AM
ORDER re10 Motion to Continue: GRANTED. The preliminary injunction hearing is continued to May 4, 2018. The Court is unavailable on the dates suggested by counsel. Preliminary Injunction Hearing reset for 5/4/2018 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Francisco A. Besosa. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 3/20/2018. (grf) |
|
Monday, March 19, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Continue
Mon 03/19 8:30 PM
MOTION to Continue Preliminary Injunction Hearing filed by Ramon E. Dapena on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 4/2/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically.(Dapena, Ramon) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
Thursday, March 15, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
6
pgs
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 03/15 11:58 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by MSO of Puerto Rico LLC, Castellana Physician Services, LLC, PMC Medicare Choice LLC, MMM Healthcare LLC upon Priscilla Gonzalez served on 3/14/2018, answer due 4/4/2018; Angel Rivera served on 3/14/2018, answer due 4/4/2018; Smart Care Solutions LLC served on 3/14/2018, answer due 4/4/2018. (Dapena, Ramon) |
|
Thursday, March 08, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 03/08 12:38 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Ivan Llado-Rodriguez on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Llado-Rodriguez, Ivan) |
|
7 | 7
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 03/08 12:18 PM
ORDER. Plaintiffs will serve process on defendants no later than March 16, 2016. Answer and response to motion deadline April 6, 2018. Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for April 20, 2018 at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 2 before Judge Francisco A. Besosa. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 03/08/2018. (brc) |
|
6 | 6
order
Order on Motion for Issuance of Summons
Thu 03/08 11:05 AM
ORDER re3 Motion for Issuance of Summons: NOTED and MOOT. Summons have been issued. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 03/08/2018. (brc) |
|
5 | 5
1
pgs
service
Summons Issued
Thu 03/08 10:06 AM
Summons Issued as to PRISCILLA GONZALEZ, ANGEL RIVERA, SMART CARE SOLUTIONS LLC (arg) |
|
Att: 1 Summons | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Judge Assignment
Thu 03/08 9:29 AM
NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Francisco A. Besosa (arg) |
|
Wednesday, March 07, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Issuance of Summons
Wed 03/07 4:16 PM
MOTION for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants filed by Ramon E. Dapena on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 3/21/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically.(Dapena, Ramon) |
|
Att: 1 Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons | ||
2 | 2
9
pgs
motion
Preliminary Injunction
Wed 03/07 3:51 PM
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Ramon E. Dapena on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 3/21/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Dapena, Ramon) |
|
1 | 1
12
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Wed 03/07 3:48 PM
COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-5776604.), filed by MSO OF PUERTO RICO LLC, CASTELLANA PHYSICIAN SERVICES LLC, PMC MEDICARE CHOICE LLC, MMM HEALTHCARE LLC. Service due by 6/5/2018,(Dapena, Ramon) |
|
Att: 1 Category Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 5 pgs Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 4 10 pgs Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 5 2 pgs Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 6 3 pgs Exhibit D |