In Re Madoff Securities
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:12-bk-02557 |
Nature of Suit | 423 Bankruptcy - Withdrawal 28 USC 157 |
Case Filed: | Jun 21, 2012 |
Terminated: | Dec 08, 2014 |
Alyssa Goldberg
|
|
Amanda Goldberg Snyderman
|
|
Ascot Partners, L.P.
|
|
Defendants' listed in Appendix A of the Court's April 13, 2012 Order
|
|
Elena Elkin
|
|
Estate of Gilbert M. Kotzen
|
|
Estate of Sylvia W. Lock
|
|
Fiterman Investment Fund, et al.
|
|
Frank A. Petito
|
|
Frederic J. Perlen
|
|
Frederick Goldberg
|
|
Gail Nessel
|
|
Gilbert M. Kotzen 1982 Trust
|
|
Gregory Antoniazzi
|
|
Hess Kline Rev. Trust, et al.
|
|
I.I. Kotzen Company
|
|
James Nosworthy
|
|
Jay Gaines
|
|
Jeremy Goldberg
|
|
Joan Elkin Madison
|
|
John Nessel
|
|
Joshua Elkin
|
|
Linda S. Paresky
|
|
Lorraine Lock Nosworthy
|
|
Marcia Kotzen 2002 Revocable Trust
|
|
Marital Trust created under Revocable Trust of Marvin G. Graybow
|
|
Melvin B. Nessel 2006 Trust u/a/d 3/14/06
|
|
Melvin B. Nessel Revocable Trust
|
|
Melvin N. Lock Trust
|
|
Meredith Goldberg
|
|
Metro Motor Imports, Inc., et al
|
|
Miles &Shirley Fiterman Charitable Foundation, et al.
|
|
Miles Q. Fiterman Revocable Trust, et al.
|
|
Mistral (SPC)
|
|
Neil N. Lapidus
|
|
Northern Trust, N.A.
|
|
Pamela W. Goldberg
|
|
Paul Rampell
|
|
Russell J. DeLucia
|
|
Sharon L. Graybow
|
|
Stanley J. Bernstein
|
|
Stepheny B. Riemer
|
|
Sumitomo Trust & Banking Co. Ltd.
|
|
Susan Siegal
|
|
Sylvia W. Lock Declaration of Trust, Dated April 13, 1982
|
|
Zephyros Limited
|
|
Amicus Curiae
Financial Institution Defendants
|
|
Amicus Curiae
National Association of Bankruptcy Trustees
|
|
Appellant
Irving H. Picard
|
|
Appellant
Securities Investor Protection Corporation
|
|
Appellee
10 Michael Drive Associates, L.P.
|
|
Appellee
125 Bethpage Associates
|
|
Appellee
1995 Jack Parker Descendant Trust No. 1
|
|
Appellee
45 South Service Road, LLC
|
|
Appellee
500 Bi-County Associates, L.P.
|
|
Appellee
Adam P. Glick
|
|
Appellee
Alan S. Gordon
|
|
Appellee
Alexander G. Anagnos
|
|
Appellee
Alexandra E. Hausner Cave
|
|
Appellee
Alice Rosenwald
|
|
Appellee
ALICE ROSENWALD FUND
|
|
Appellee
Alpine Trustees Limited
|
|
Appellee
AMERICAN PHILANTHROPIC FOUNDATION
|
|
Appellee
AMERICAN SECURITIES GROUP, L.L.C.
|
|
Appellee
American Securities Holdings Corp.
|
|
Appellee
American Securities Management, L.P.
|
|
Appellee
American Securities Opportunity Fund, L.P.
|
|
Appellee
Amy Metzenbaum
|
|
Appellee
ANCHORAGE CHARITABLE FUND
|
|
Appellee
Andrew Kostin
|
|
Appellee
Andrew Smith
|
|
Appellee
Anthony E. Stefanelli
|
|
Appellee
ARC-BDG Setauket Enterprise
|
|
Appellee
Arthur and Rochelle Belfer Foundation, Inc
|
|
Appellee
Ashby Holding Services Limited
|
|
Appellee
Ashby Investment Services Limited
|
|
Appellee
Ashby Trust
|
|
Appellee
Audax Group LP, Audax Management Co. LLC, 101 Huntington Holdings LLC, Marc B. Wolpow, Geoffrey S. Rehnert, Richard T. Joseph; Carol Nelson; Gordon Associates, Bruce Gordon; Robert M. Siff; Robert Ros
|
|
Appellee
Austin Bosarge
|
|
Appellee
B-4 Partnership
|
|
Appellee
Banca Carige S.P.A.
|
|
Appellee
Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria
|
|
Appellee
Banco Itau Europa International
|
|
Appellee
Banco Itau Europa Luxembourg, S.A.
|
|
Appellee
Bank Julius Baer &Co. Ltd.
|
|
Appellee
Barclays Bank (Suisse) S.A.
|
|
Appellee
Barclays Bank S.A.
|
|
Appellee
Barclays Private Bank & Trust Limited
|
|
Appellee
BCC II, LLC
|
|
Appellee
BDG 115 Broadhollow, L.P.
|
|
Appellee
BDG 125th Street, LLC
|
|
Appellee
BDG Commack, LLC
|
|
Appellee
BDG Construction Corp.
|
|
Appellee
BDG Daniel Street, LLC
|
|
Appellee
BDG Deer Park Associates, LLC
|
|
Appellee
BDG DWD Associates, LLC
|
|
Appellee
BDG Kingsbridge, LLC
|
|
Appellee
BDG Lake Grove I, LLC
|
|
Appellee
BDG Larkfield Associates, LLC
|
|
Appellee
BDG Piscataway, LLC
|
|
Appellee
BDG Yaphank, LLC
|
|
Appellee
Belfer Corporation
|
|
Appellee
Belinda F. Clarke
|
|
Appellee
Benjamin R. Sigelman
|
|
Appellee
Blanchefleur Macher
|
|
Appellee
Blumco Setauket, LLC
|
|
Appellee
Blumenfeld Development Group, Ltd.
|
|
Appellee
Bonnie J. Kansler
|
|
Appellee
Boxwood Realty Group
|
|
Appellee
Brad Blumenfeld
|
|
Appellee
Brad Blumenfeld Charitable Lead Trust
|
|
Appellee
Brad Blumenfeld Family Foundation
|
|
Appellee
Brad Blumenfeld Farmingdale Trust
|
|
Appellee
Buckmaster Farms, L.P.
|
|
Appellee
Bull Market Fund
|
|
Appellee
BWI
|
|
Appellee
C. Ray Johnson
|
|
Appellee
Calesa Associates L.P.
|
|
Appellee
Charitable Remainder Trust F/B/O Vivien Svigals
|
|
Appellee
Charles Murphy
|
|
Appellee
Charleston Enterprises, LLC
|
|
Appellee
Cheryl K. Tomchin
|
|
Appellee
Chester Management Cayman Limited
|
|
Appellee
Christopher Warren
|
|
Appellee
Citrus Investment Holdings Ltd.
|
|
Appellee
Coblum Setauket, LLC
|
|
Appellee
Corina Noel Piedrahita
|
|
Appellee
Cynthia A. Delles
|
|
Appellee
Cyril Jalon
|
|
Appellee
Daniel F. Lindley
|
|
Appellee
Daniel Land Co. LLC
|
|
Appellee
Daniel Lipton
|
|
Appellee
Daniel Schneider
|
|
Appellee
David Abel
|
|
Appellee
David B. Pearce
|
|
Appellee
David Blumenfeld
|
|
Appellee
David Blumenfeld Family Trust
|
|
Appellee
David Blumenfeld Farmingdale Trust
|
|
Appellee
David I. Koff
|
|
Appellee
David I. Lustig
|
|
Appellee
David Ivan Lustig
|
|
Appellee
David Kostin
|
|
Appellee
David R. Varet
|
|
Appellee
David Silver
|
|
Appellee
Deborah Madoff
|
|
Appellee
Deborah Weinstein
|
|
Appellee
DECIMAL INVESTMENTS, L.L.C.
|
|
Appellee
Denise M. Angeja
|
|
Appellee
Diane Ringler
|
|
Appellee
Dogwood Realty Group
|
|
Appellee
DOS BFS FAMILY PARTNERSHIP II, L.P., DONALD AND BETTE STEIN FAMILY TRUST, DONALD O. STEIN, WILLIAM STEIN, JAMIE STEIN WALKER, and BARBARA STEIN JAFFE
|
|
Appellee
Double B Squared LLC
|
|
Appellee
DWD Associates, LLC
|
|
Appellee
EDB Capital, LLC
|
|
Appellee
Edward and Susan Blumenfeld Charitable Lead Trust
|
|
Appellee
Edward and Susan Blumenfeld Foundation
|
|
Appellee
Edward Blumenfeld
|
|
Appellee
Edward Blumenfeld and Susan Blumenfeld
|
|
Appellee
Edward Blumenfeld and Susan Blumenfeld 2007 Charitable Lead Trust
|
|
Appellee
Edward Blumenfeld Gerald Y Mordfin
|
|
Appellee
Edward F. Calesa
|
|
Appellee
Edward R. Glantz Living Trust
|
|
Appellee
EJS
|
|
Appellee
El Prela Group Holding Services Limited
|
|
Appellee
El Prela Trading Investments Limited
|
|
Appellee
El Prela Trust
|
|
Appellee
Elaine Ostrin
|
|
Appellee
Elizabeth R. Varet
|
|
Appellee
Elizabeth R. Varet Defined Benefit Plan & Trust
|
|
Appellee
Elizabeth R. Varet IRA Rollover
|
|
Appellee
Elizabeth R. Varet Money Purchase Pension Plan
|
|
Appellee
Ellen J. Wertheim
|
|
Appellee
ELLEN V. GREENSPAN
|
|
Appellee
Enhancement Group
|
|
Appellee
Estate of Edward R. Glantz
|
|
Appellee
Estate of Elaine Cooper, Steven Mnuchin, Alan Mnuchin, Generation Skipping Transfer Trust FBO Alan Mnuchin, Generation Skipping Transfer Trust FBO Steven Mnuchin, Trust FBO Alan Mnuchin, Trust FBO Ste
|
|
Appellee
Estate of Elena Jalon
|
|
Appellee
Estate of Jesse L. Sigelman
|
|
Appellee
Estate of Kay Frankel
|
|
Appellee
Estate of Sarah E. Pearce
|
|
Appellee
Estate of Thelma Glantz
|
|
Appellee
Evelyn Fisher
|
|
Appellee
Fairfield Greenwich (Bermuda) Limited
|
|
Appellee
Fairfield Greenwich (UK) Limited
|
|
Appellee
Fairfield Greenwich Advisors LLC
|
|
Appellee
Fairfield Greenwich Limited
|
|
Appellee
Fairfield Heathcliff Capital LLC
|
|
Appellee
Fairfield International Managers, Inc.
|
|
Appellee
Fern Creek Limited Partnership
|
|
Appellee
Financiere Agache
|
|
Appellee
First Peninsula Trustees Limited
|
|
Appellee
Francine Fishman
|
|
Appellee
Freda B. Epstein
|
|
Appellee
Freda Epstein Revocable Trust
|
|
Appellee
Glantz Family Foundation
|
|
Appellee
Glantz-Ostrin Trust I
|
|
Appellee
Glantz-Ostrin Trust II
|
|
Appellee
Gordon Mackenzie
|
|
Appellee
Gorvis LLC, a California Limited Liability Company
|
|
Appellee
Gotham Plaza Associates, LLC
|
|
Appellee
Grace & Company
|
|
Appellee
Grace B. Evenstad
|
|
Appellee
Grace B. Evenstad Revocable Trust
|
|
Appellee
Gregory Fisher
|
|
Appellee
Harold Anfang
|
|
Appellee
Harold Greisman
|
|
Appellee
Harold J. Hein
|
|
Appellee
Harvey Cohen
|
|
Appellee
Hausner Group
|
|
Appellee
Hilda Hausner
|
|
Appellee
Howard M. Koff
|
|
Appellee
HUDSON CHARITABLE FUND
|
|
Appellee
Inteligo Bank Ltd. Panama Branch
|
|
Appellee
Isaac Jimmy Mayer
|
|
Appellee
Jacqueline Harary
|
|
Appellee
James Greiff
|
|
Appellee
James R. Ledley
|
|
Appellee
Janice M. Calesa
|
|
Appellee
Janice M. Calesa 1984 Trust
|
|
Appellee
Jay Gaines &Co., Inc. Profit Sharing Plan
|
|
Appellee
Jay Gaines In His Fiduciary Capacity As Trustee Of The Jay Gaines & Co. Profit Sharing Plan
|
|
Appellee
Jeanne T. Spring Trust
|
|
Appellee
Jeff E. Calesa
|
|
Appellee
Jeff E. Calesa Trust 1989
|
|
Appellee
Jeffrey Hinte
|
|
Appellee
Jelris & Associates, L.P.
|
|
Appellee
Jennifer Spring McPherson
|
|
Appellee
Jerald Ostrin
|
|
Appellee
Jerald Ostrin Trust
|
|
Appellee
Jerry Yanowitz
|
|
Appellee
Jill Fischer
|
|
Appellee
JJG FOUNDATION, INC.
|
|
Appellee
Joan Roman
|
|
Appellee
Joel Yanowitz
|
|
Appellee
John Reisman
|
|
Appellee
Joint Tenancy of Phyllis Guenzburger and Fabian Guenzburger
|
|
Appellee
Joint Tenancy of Robert Pinchou and Fabian Guenzburger
|
|
Appellee
Jonathan M. Aufzien
|
|
Appellee
Jonathan P. Rosensweig
|
|
Appellee
Jonathan R. Sigelman
|
|
Appellee
Joseph R. Varet
|
|
Appellee
JRAG, LLC
|
|
Appellee
Julie Schwartz
|
|
Appellee
Kara Fishbein Goldman
|
|
Appellee
Kathy Hausner Grossman
|
|
Appellee
KBC Investments Limited
|
|
Appellee
Kenneth Kreger
|
|
Appellee
Kenneth L. Evenstad
|
|
Appellee
Kenneth L. Evenstad Revocable Trust
|
|
Appellee
Kenneth Macher
|
|
Appellee
Kim Dickstein
|
|
Appellee
Kingate Euro Fund, Ltd.
|
|
Appellee
Kingate Global Fund, Ltd.
|
|
Appellee
Kostin Company
|
|
Appellee
LaGuardia Corporate Center Associates, L.P.
|
|
Appellee
LaGuardia Corporate Center Associates, LLC
|
|
Appellee
Lakeview Investment, LP
|
|
Appellee
Laurie Frenchman
|
|
Appellee
Leslie Aufzein Levine
|
|
Appellee
Linda Rosensweig
|
|
Appellee
Linda Sohn
|
|
Appellee
Lisa Aufzien
|
|
Appellee
Lourdes Barreneche
|
|
Appellee
Lustig Family 1990 Trust
|
|
Appellee
M. Harvey Rubin Trust of 11/11/92
|
|
Appellee
Macher Family Partnership
|
|
Appellee
Marcia Koff
|
|
Appellee
Marjorie Most
|
|
Appellee
Mark B. Evenstad
|
|
Appellee
Mark B. Evenstad Revocable Trust u/a/d January 30, 2003
|
|
Appellee
Mark McKeefrey
|
|
Appellee
Marvin L. Olshan
|
|
Appellee
Mary Ann Stefanelli
|
|
Appellee
Maurice Harvey Rubin
|
|
Appellee
Maxrob, L.P.
|
|
Appellee
MBE General LLC
|
|
Appellee
MBE Preferred Limited Partnership
|
|
Appellee
Meredith Aufzien Bauer
|
|
Appellee
Merlin & Associates, Ltd.
|
|
Appellee
METROPOLITAN PHILANTHROPIC FUND, INC.
|
|
Appellee
Michael A. Varet
|
|
Appellee
Michael Fisher
|
|
Appellee
Michael Frenchman
|
|
Appellee
Michael Most
|
|
Appellee
Michael N. Rosen
|
|
Appellee
Migs Woodside
|
|
Appellee
Morton Kurzrok
|
|
Appellee
Naidot & Co.
|
|
Appellee
Neal Goldman
|
|
Appellee
Nina Rosenwald
|
|
Appellee
Norman K. Aufzien
|
|
Appellee
Norton S. Rosensweig
|
|
Appellee
Ostrin Family Partnership
|
|
Appellee
Other Listed Defendants
|
|
Appellee
Patricia Silver
|
|
Appellee
Pergament Equities, LLC
|
|
Appellee
Peri Arenas
|
|
Appellee
PetCareRx, Inc.
|
|
Appellee
Peter Pearman
|
|
Appellee
Philip Toub
|
|
Appellee
Pioneer Alternative Investment Management Limited
|
|
Appellee
Pioneer Global Asset Management S.p.A.
|
|
Appellee
PIPARTNERS
|
|
Appellee
Port of Hercules Trustees Limited
|
|
Appellee
PSAssociates
|
|
Appellee
R.H. Book, LLC
|
|
Appellee
Randi C. Crawford
|
|
Appellee
Randi M. Calesa 1986 Trust
|
|
Appellee
Regina Fisher
|
|
Appellee
Richard Landsberger
|
|
Appellee
Richard M. Glantz
|
|
Appellee
Richard M. Glantz 1991 Living Trust
|
|
Appellee
Richard Spring
|
|
Appellee
Ringler Partners, L.P.
|
|
Appellee
RMGF LTD. Partnership
|
|
Appellee
Robert A. Belfer and Renee E. Belfer Family Foundation
|
|
Appellee
Robert A. Belfer, as Trustee of The Robert A. Belfer and Renee E. Belfer Family Foundation
|
|
Appellee
Robert Blum
|
|
Appellee
Robert H. Book
|
|
Appellee
Robert Nystrom
|
|
Appellee
Robert Roman
|
|
Appellee
Roberta Cohen
|
|
Appellee
Ronald J. Stein
|
|
Appellee
S.H. & Helen R. Scheuer Family Foundation, Inc.
|
|
Appellee
Santiago Reyes
|
|
Appellee
Sarah R. Varet
|
|
Appellee
Scott Ostrin
|
|
Appellee
Scott Ostrin Trust
|
|
Appellee
Serene Warren
|
|
Appellee
Serene Warren Revocable Trust
|
|
Appellee
Sew General, LLC
|
|
Appellee
Sew Preferred Limited Partnership
|
|
Appellee
Shannnon Mahoney Evenstad
|
|
Appellee
Sherry Gaines
|
|
Appellee
South Sea Holdings L.P.
|
|
Appellee
SPAssociates
|
|
Appellee
Spring Family Trust
|
|
Appellee
Stacy L. Koff
|
|
Appellee
Stephanie S. Mack
|
|
Appellee
Stephen H. Stern
|
|
Appellee
Steven Goldman
|
|
Appellee
Stuart H. Coleman
|
|
Appellee
Susan Blumenfeld
|
|
Appellee
Susan Blumenfeld GST Trust
|
|
Appellee
Susan Blumenfeld Interiors, Ltd.
|
|
Appellee
Susan Kostin
|
|
Appellee
Taj Inayat
|
|
Appellee
Tensyr Limited
|
|
Appellee
Tesuji Partners, LLC
|
|
Appellee
THE ABSTRACTION FUND
|
|
Appellee
The David I. Koff Investment Trust, a member of Gorvis, LLC
|
|
Appellee
The Koff Living Trust
|
|
Appellee
The Stacy L. Koff Investment Trust
|
|
Appellee
Thelma Glantz Living Trust
|
|
Appellee
Trust F/B/O Alexandra E. Hausner Cave
|
|
Appellee
Trust f/b/o Brad Blumenfeld
|
|
Appellee
Trust f/b/o David Blumenfeld
|
|
Appellee
Trust f/b/o Susan Blumenfeld
|
|
Appellee
Trust U/T/A 8/20/90
|
|
Appellee
Trust U/W/O David L. Fisher
|
|
Appellee
UniCredit Bank Austria AG
|
|
Appellee
UniCredit SPA
|
|
Appellee
Visiting Nurse Service of New York
|
|
Appellee
Vista Management Company
|
|
Appellee
WIlliam Rosenwald Family Fund, Inc.
|
|
Appellee
Zia Inayat Khan
|
|
Movant
Securities Industry and Financial Markets Association
|
![]() OPINION, judgment of the district court is affirmed, by BDP, GEL, CFD, FILED.[1386985] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] |