Florida Northern District Court
Case #: 4:18-cr-00008
Case Filed:Feb 06, 2018
Last checked: Thursday Mar 08, 2018 2:49 AM EST
Defendant
SHELLY BAITY (4)
Represented By
LUKE NEWMAN
Luke Newman Pa - Tallahassee Fl
contact info
Defendant
JAMES CASE (3)
Represented By
R TIMOTHY JANSEN
R Timothy Jansen Pa - Tallahassee Fl
contact info
Defendant
BARNEY CRUTCHFIELD (1)
Represented By
RICHARD HIGDON SMITH
Richard Smith Pa - Tallahassee Fl
contact info
STEPHEN S DOBSON
Baker Donelson Bearman Etc Pc - Tallahassee Fl
contact info
THOMAS MARSHALL FINDLEY
Baker Donelson Bearman Etc Pc - Tallahassee Fl
contact info
FREDERICK MARSHALL CONRAD
Frederick M Conrad Pa - Tallahassee Fl
contact info
Defendant
WILLIAM EDWARDS (5)
Represented By
GARY ANTHONY ROBERTS
Gary A Roberts & Assoc Llc - Tallahassee Fl
contact info
Defendant
ADAM KING (2)
Represented By
JOSEPH FRANS DEBELDER
Federal Public Defender Office - Tallahassee Fl
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
GARY KENNETH MILLIGAN, II
Us Attorney - Tallahassee Fl
contact info


Docket last updated: 12/13/2019 8:14 PM EST
Wednesday, January 17, 2018
1 1 COMPLAINT as to JAMES CASE (1). (amm) [4:18-mj-00016-CAS]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT as to BARNEY CRUTCHFIELD (1). (amm) [4:18-mj-00015-CAS]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT as to ADAM KING (1). (amm) [4:18-mj-00017-CAS]
Related: [-]
2 2 8 pgs AFFIDAVIT in Support of Criminal Complaint by USA Re:1 Complaint as to JAMES CASE. (amm) [4:18-mj-00016-CAS]
Related: [-]
2 2 12 pgs AFFIDAVIT in Support of Criminal Complaint by USA Re:1 Complaint as to BARNEY CRUTCHFIELD. (amm) [4:18-mj-00015-CAS]
Related: [-]
2 2 8 pgs AFFIDAVIT in Support of Criminal Complaint by USA Re:1 Complaint as to ADAM KING. (amm) [4:18-mj-00017-CAS]
Related: [-]
4 4 2 pgs Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS:Initial Appearance as to JAMES CASE held on 1/17/2018 (Court Reporter DCR TLH.) (amm) [4:18-mj-00016-CAS]
Related: [-]
4 4 2 pgs Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS:Initial Appearance as to BARNEY CRUTCHFIELD held on 1/17/2018 (Court Reporter DCR TLH.) (amm) [4:18-mj-00015-CAS]
Related: [-]
4 4 2 pgs Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS:Initial Appearance as to ADAM KING held on 1/17/2018 (Court Reporter DCR TLH.) (amm) [4:18-mj-00017-CAS]
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER as to JAMES CASE: Defendant shall have until 1/24/2018 to have his retained counsel file a permanent notice of appearance. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS on 1/17/18. (amm) [4:18-mj-00016-CAS]
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER as to BARNEY CRUTCHFIELD: Defendant shall have until by 1/24/2018 to have his retained counsel file a permanent notice ofappearance. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS on 1/17/18. (amm) [4:18-mj-00015-CAS]
Related: [-]
5 5 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by ADAM KING (PDF sealed per Privacy Policy) (amm) [4:18-mj-00017-CAS]
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER OF DETENTION as to JAMES CASE: Preliminary and Detention Hearings set for 1/19/2018 10:00 AM in U.S. Courthouse Tallahassee before MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS on 1/17/18. (amm) [4:18-mj-00016-CAS]
Related: [-]
6 6 1 pgs ORDER OF DETENTION as to BARNEY CRUTCHFIELD: Preliminary and Detention Hearings set for 1/19/2018 2:00 PM in U.S. Courthouse Tallahassee before MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS on 1/17/18. (amm) [4:18-mj-00015-CAS]
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to ADAM KING. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS on 1/17/18. (amm) [4:18-mj-00017-CAS]
Related: [-]
7 7 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 1/17/18 in case as to JAMES CASE. (amm) [4:18-mj-00016-CAS]
Related: [-]
7 7 1 pgs Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 1/17/18 in case as to BARNEY CRUTCHFIELD. (amm) [4:18-mj-00015-CAS]
Related: [-]
7 7 ORDER OF DETENTION as to ADAM KING: Preliminary and Detention Hearings set for 1/19/2018 11:00 AM in U.S. Courthouse Tallahassee before MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS on 1/17/18. (amm) [4:18-mj-00017-CAS]
Related: [-]
8 8 1 pgs Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 1/17/18 in case as to ADAM KING. (amm) [4:18-mj-00017-CAS]
Related: [-]
Friday, January 19, 2018
8 8 1 pgs Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS: Preliminary and Detention Hearings as to BARNEY CRUTCHFIELD held on 1/19/2018. Defendant retains attorney Richard Smith as permanent counsel for case. Defendant waives a preliminary hearing and stipulates to detention. (Court Reporter DCR TLH.) (amm) [4:18-mj-00015-CAS]
Related: [-]
9 9 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS:Detention Hearing as to JAMES CASE held on 1/19/2018 - Defendant waives preliminary hearing. Government stipulates to release of Defendant. Defendant released on order setting conditions of release. (Court Reporter DCR TLH.) (amm) [4:18-mj-00016-CAS]
Related: [-]
9 9 WAIVER of Preliminary Examination Hearing by BARNEY CRUTCHFIELD. (amm) [4:18-mj-00015-CAS]
Related: [-]
9 9 NOTICE OF HEARING as to ADAM KING: Preliminary and Detention Hearings reset for 1/22/2018 1:30 PM in U.S. Courthouse Tallahassee before MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS. United States Courthouse, Courtroom 2 South, 111 North Adams St., Tallahassee, Florida 32301. NOTE: If you or any party, witness or attorney in this matter has a disability that requires special accommodation, such as, a hearing impairment that requires a sign language interpreter or a wheelchair restriction that requires ramp access, please contact Angie Maxwell at 850-521-3516 in the Clerk's Office at least one week prior to the hearing (or as soon as possible) so arrangements can be made. s/ Angie Maxwell Courtroom Deputy Clerk (amm) [4:18-mj-00017-CAS]
Related: [-]
10 10 WAIVER of Preliminary Examination Hearing by JAMES CASE. (amm) [4:18-mj-00016-CAS]
Related: [-]
10 10 ORDER OF DETENTION as to BARNEY CRUTCHFIELD. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS on 1/19/18. (amm) [4:18-mj-00015-CAS]
Related: [-]
11 11 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to JAMES CASE. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS on 1/19/18. (amm) [4:18-mj-00016-CAS]
Related: [-]
Monday, January 22, 2018
10 10 2 pgs Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS:Preliminary and Detention Hearings as to ADAM KING held on 1/22/2018. (Court Reporter DCR TLH.) (amm) [4:18-mj-00017-CAS]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 5 pgs Government Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 4 pgs Government Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 3 pgs Government Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 3 pgs Government Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 6 pgs Government Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 13 pgs Defendant Exhibit 1,
Att: 7 1 pgs Defendant Exhibit 2
Tuesday, January 23, 2018
11 11 ORDER OF DETENTION AND PRELIMINARY HEARING as to ADAM KING. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS on 1/23/18. (amm) [4:18-mj-00017-CAS]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 24, 2018
8 8 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: R TIMOTHY JANSEN appearing for JAMES CASE (JANSEN, R) [4:18-mj-00016-CAS]
Related: [-]
Friday, January 26, 2018
12 12 Passport SURRENDERED as to JAMES CASE. Passport issued by USA. PDF sealed per privacy policy due to the inclusion of personal identifiers. (amm) [4:18-mj-00016-CAS]
Related: [-]
Monday, January 29, 2018
Attorney update in case as to BARNEY CRUTCHFIELD. Attorney STEPHEN S DOBSON,THOMAS MARSHALL FINDLEY for BARNEY CRUTCHFIELD added. (amm)
Related: [-]
11 11 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by BARNEY CRUTCHFIELD (DOBSON, STEPHEN) [4:18-mj-00015-CAS]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 06, 2018
13 13 9 pgs INDICTMENT (PDF redacted per privacy policy.) as to BARNEY CRUTCHFIELD (1) count(s) 1, 2, 4, 6, ADAM KING (2) count(s) 1, 3, JAMES CASE (3) count(s) 1, 2, 5, SHELLY BAITY (4) count(s) 1, 2, WILLIAM EDWARDS (5) count(s) 1, 3. (pll)
Related: [-]
14 14 Sealed Document - Unredacted Indictment (pll)
Related: [-]
15 15 CRIMINAL COVER SHEET by USA as to BARNEY CRUTCHFIELD (copy to US Marshal)(PDF sealed per Privacy Policy) (pll)
Related: [-]
16 16 CRIMINAL COVER SHEET by USA as to ADAM KING (copy to US Marshal)(PDF sealed per Privacy Policy) (pll)
Related: [-]
17 17 CRIMINAL COVER SHEET by USA as to JAMES CASE (copy to US Marshal)(PDF sealed per Privacy Policy) (pll)
Related: [-]
18 18 ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF ARREST WARRANT as to JAMES CASE. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS on 2/6/18. (pll)
Related: [-]
20 20 CRIMINAL COVER SHEET by USA as to SHELLY BAITY (copy to US Marshal)(PDF sealed per Privacy Policy) (pll)
Related: [-]
21 21 ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF ARREST WARRANT as to SHELLY BAITY. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS on 2/6/18. (pll)
Related: [-]
23 23 CRIMINAL COVER SHEET by USA as to WILLIAM EDWARDS (copy to US Marshal)(PDF sealed per Privacy Policy) (pll)
Related: [-]
25 25 Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued as to WILLIAM EDWARDS for WILLIAM EDARDS re: 24 Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS on 2/6/18. (pll)
Related: [-]