Texas Western District Court
Case #: 1:18-cr-00040
Case Filed:Feb 06, 2018
Last checked: Thursday Mar 08, 2018 1:42 AM CST
Defendant
Patrick Donovan Rawls (1)
Represented By
E. G. Morris
Law Office Of E.G. Morris
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Grant Sparks
U.S. Attorney'S Office/austin Division
contact info


Docket last updated: 09/25/2018 4:28 PM CDT
Tuesday, December 12, 2017
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Patrick Donovan Rawls (1). Signed by Judge Mark Lane. (kkc) [1:17-mj-00763-ML]
Related: [-]
2 2 Arrest Warrant Issued by Judge Mark Lane as to Patrick Donovan Rawls. (kkc) [1:17-mj-00763-ML]
Related: [-]
3 3 MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond by USA as to Patrick Donovan Rawls. (Sparks, Grant) [1:17-mj-00763-ML]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 13, 2017
Arrest of Patrick Donovan Rawls (vs) [1:17-mj-00763-ML]
Related: [-]
4 4 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 12/13/17 as to Patrick Donovan Rawls. (vs) [1:17-mj-00763-ML]
Related: [-]
5 5 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mark Lane: Initial Appearance as to Patrick Donovan Rawls held on 12/13/2017 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.) (Court Reporter ERO.) (vs) [1:17-mj-00763-ML]
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION: as to Patrick Donovan Rawls Detention Hearing and Preliminary Hearing set for 12/18/2017 10:00 AM before Judge Mark Lane. Signed by Judge Mark Lane. (vs) [1:17-mj-00763-ML]
Related: [-]
Monday, December 18, 2017
7 7 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mark Lane: Preliminary and Detention Hearing as to Patrick Donovan Rawls held on 12/18/2017 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.) (Court Reporter ERO.) (kkc) [1:17-mj-00763-ML]
Related: [-]
8 8 WITNESS LIST by USA, Patrick Donovan Rawls for Preliminary and Detention Hearing held on December 18, 2017. (kkc) [1:17-mj-00763-ML]
Related: [-]
9 9 ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL: as to Patrick Donovan Rawls. Signed by Judge Mark Lane. (vs) [1:17-mj-00763-ML]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 03, 2018
10 10 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: E. G. Morris appearing for Patrick Donovan Rawls . Attorney E. G. Morris added to party Patrick Donovan Rawls(pty:dft) (Morris, E.) [1:17-mj-00763-ML]
Related: [-]
11 11 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time 18 USC 3161(b) Deadline by Patrick Donovan Rawls. (Morris, E.) [1:17-mj-00763-ML]
Related: [-]
12 12 ORDER GRANTING11 Motion to Extend Time as to Patrick Donovan Rawls (1). Signed by Judge Mark Lane. (vs) [1:17-mj-00763-ML]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 06, 2018
13 13 3 pgs INDICTMEN Related [+] filed. Unredacted document sealed pursuant to E-Government Act of 2002 as to Patrick Donovan Rawls (1) count(s) 1-2, 3. (dm)
Related: [-] dacted Version
Att: 1 Redacted Personal Data Sheet
15 15 ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF Bench Warrant as to Patrick Donovan Rawls. Signed by Judge Mark Lane. (dm)
Related: [-]
16 16 Bench Warrant Issued by Judge Mark Lane as to Patrick Donovan Rawls. (dm)
Related: [-]