Keilee Fant, et al v. City of Ferguson, MO
Original Case: 4:15-cv-00253
Eighth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:18-cv-01472 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Mar 06, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jan 10, 2019 |
Last checked: Friday Jan 11, 2019 2:29 AM CST |
Defendant - Appellant
City of Ferguson, Missouri
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Keilee Fant, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Roelif Carter
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Allison Nelson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Herbert Nelson, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Alfred Morris
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Anthony Kimble
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Donyale Thomas
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Shameika Morris
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Daniel Jenkins
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Ronnie Tucker
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Tonya DeBerry
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 01/11/2019 2:29 AM CST |
Tuesday, March 06, 2018 | ||
5 pgs Civil case docketed. [4636321] 18-1472 (BNS) | ||
30+ pgs Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, and order dated 2/13/18. [4636325] 18-1472 (BNS) | ||
2
pgs
BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Transcript due on or before 04/16/2018. Appendix due 04/25/2018. BRIEF APPELLANT, City of Ferguson due 04/25/2018 Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. Appellant reply brief is due 14 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellee brief. [4636327] 18-1472 (BNS) |
||
1 pgs APPEARANCE filed by John M. Reeves for Appellant City of Ferguson w/service 03/06/2018 [4636490] 18-1472 (JMR) |