Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors v. Afn, LLC
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-01302
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-01302
Indiana Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Jeffrey J Graham |
Case #: | 1:18-ap-50041 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Mar 07, 2018 |
Terminated: | Apr 04, 2018 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Afn, LLC
7230 N. Caldwell Avenue
Niles, IL 60714 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, of Gregg Appliances, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of U.S. Trustee 101 W. Ohio St.. Ste. 1000
Indianapolis, IN 46204 |
Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:07 PM EDT |
Wednesday, April 04, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
court
Close Adversary Proceeding
Wed 04/04 1:17 PM
Adversary Proceeding[LINK:1:18-ap-50041] Closed. (cmd) |
|
Tuesday, March 27, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
Monday, March 12, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Certificate of Service of Summons re: AFN, LLC . (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
5 | 5
![]() Summons Issued. Attorney for Plaintiff must serve the summons and a copy of the complaint on parties pursuant to Fed.R.Bankr.P. 7004 . A certificate of service must be filed with the Court by 03/26/2018 . Adversary Answer due by 4/11/2018. (cmd) |
|
4 | 4
![]() Certificate of Service re: Appearance, filed by Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors . (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
Thursday, March 08, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Deficiency Notice Issued re: Appearance . Deficiency to be cured by 3/22/2018. (cmd) |
|
Wednesday, March 07, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
![]() Appearance filed by Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case[LINK 18-50041 . Complaint filed by Plaintiff(s) Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors against Defendant(s) Afn, LLC [12 ], [13], [14], [14]. (Steinfeld, Joseph) |