Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-01302

Indiana Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Jeffrey J Graham
Case #: 1:18-ap-50043
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Mar 07, 2018
Terminated:Sep 14, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
Landstar Ranger, Inc.
13410 Sutton Park Drive South
Jacksonville, FL 32224
Represented By
Landstar Ranger, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, of Gregg Appliances, Inc.
Represented By
Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr.
Ask LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of U.S. Trustee 101 W. Ohio St.. Ste. 1000
Indianapolis, IN 46204


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:07 PM EDT
Monday, December 03, 2018
18 18 court Minute Entry/Order Tue 12/04 10:18 AM
Minute Order . Hearing DATE: 12/03/2018, MATTER: Trial: Complaint To Avoid And Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547,548,549 and 550 And to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 5021 ,8 DISPOSITION: See Attached PDF document for details. (vCal Hearing ID (294225)). (HHeiserDavis)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 14, 2018
17 17 court Close Adversary Proceeding Fri 09/14 9:35 AM
Adversary Proceeding[LINK:1:18-ap-50043] Closed. (btw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 06, 2018
16 16 notice Dismissal Stipulation re: Adversary Proceeding, Party or Count Thu 09/06 9:53 AM
Stipulation of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by Martha R. Lehman, Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Defendant Landstar Ranger, Inc., Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Steinfeld, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 06, 2018
15 15 order Scheduling Order Wed 06/06 1:04 PM
Order Scheduling Trial and Setting Cut-Off Dates Related [+]. Dispositive motions due by 9/7/2018. Exhibit List due by 10/5/2018. Witness List due by 10/5/2018. Trial date set on 12/3/2018 at 09:00 AM EST in Rm 311 U.S. Courthouse, Indianapolis (Trial time allotted is 1 day). The Clerk's Office will distribute this order. (cmd)
Related: [-] 14
Tuesday, June 05, 2018
14 14 court Minute Entry/Order Wed 06/06 9:27 AM
Minute Order . Hearing DATE: 06/05/2018, MATTER: Telephonic Pretrial Conference: Complaint To Avoid And Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547,548,549 and 550 And to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 5021 ,8 DISPOSITION: See Attached PDF document for details. (vCal Hearing ID (291874)). (LauraATrepes)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 29, 2018
13 13 misc Pretrial Statement Tue 05/29 2:49 PM
Joint Pretrial Statement filed by Martha R. Lehman, Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Defendant Landstar Ranger, Inc., Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors Related [+]. (Steinfeld, Joseph)
Related: [-] 12
Thursday, April 19, 2018
12 12 order Setting Pretrial Conference Thu 04/19 1:32 PM
Order Setting Telephonic Pretrial Conference. Pretrial Statement/Report due by 5/29/2018. Telephonic Pretrial Conference set on 6/5/2018 at 09:00 AM EDT in Telephone # 317-229-3960. The Clerk's Office will distribute this order. (cmd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 17, 2018
11 11 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Tue 04/17 1:27 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement Pursuant to FRBP 7007.1 filed by Mark R. Wenzel, Martha R. Lehman on behalf of Defendant Landstar Ranger, Inc. [Corporate Parent(s): Landstar System Holdings, Inc.]. (Lehman, Martha)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 12, 2018
10 10 court Deficiency Notice - Miscellaneous Thu 04/12 10:42 AM
Deficiency Notice Issued re: Answer to Complaint Related [+]. Deficiency to be cured by 4/26/2018. (cmd)
Related: [-] 8
Wednesday, April 11, 2018
9 9 notice Appearance Wed 04/11 2:05 PM
Appearance filed by Martha R. Lehman, Mark R. Wenzel on behalf of Defendant Landstar Ranger, Inc (Wenzel, Mark) CORRECTION: Filed by Mark R. Wenzel only. Modified on 4/12/2018 (cmd)
Related: [-]
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 04/11 2:02 PM
Answer to Complaint filed by Martha R. Lehman on behalf of Defendant Landstar Ranger, Inc Related [+]. (Lehman, Martha)
Related: [-] 1
7 7 notice Appearance Wed 04/11 1:58 PM
Appearance filed by Martha R. Lehman on behalf of Defendant Landstar Ranger, Inc. (Lehman, Martha)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 12, 2018
6 6 cmp Summons Certificate of Service Mon 03/12 3:41 PM
Certificate of Service of Summons re: Landstar Ranger, Inc Related [+]. (Steinfeld, Joseph)
Related: [-] 5
5 5 court Summons Issued - Original/Alias Mon 03/12 12:49 PM
Summons Issued. Attorney for Plaintiff must serve the summons and a copy of the complaint on parties pursuant to Fed.R.Bankr.P. 7004 . A certificate of service must be filed with the Court by 03/26/2018 . Adversary Answer due by 4/11/2018. (cmd)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Certificate of Service Mon 03/12 10:20 AM
Certificate of Service re: Appearance, filed by Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors Related [+]. (Steinfeld, Joseph)
Related: [-] 2
Thursday, March 08, 2018
3 3 court Deficiency Notice - Miscellaneous Thu 03/08 10:35 AM
Deficiency Notice Issued re: Appearance Related [+]. Deficiency to be cured by 3/22/2018. (cmd)
Related: [-] 2
Wednesday, March 07, 2018
2 2 notice Appearance Wed 03/07 1:45 PM
Appearance filed by Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Steinfeld, Joseph)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 03/07 1:44 PM
Adversary case[LINK 18-50043 . Complaint filed by Plaintiff(s) Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors against Defendant(s) Landstar Ranger, Inc. [12 Related [+]], [13], [14], [14]. (Steinfeld, Joseph)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 547 preferencecovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfercovery of money/property - othercovery of money/property - other