Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors v. Smith Transport, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-01302
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-01302
Indiana Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Jeffrey J Graham |
Case #: | 1:18-ap-50044 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Mar 07, 2018 |
Terminated: | Sep 17, 2019 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Smith Transport, Inc.
153 Smith Transport Road
Roaring Spring, PA 16673 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, of Gregg Appliances, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of U.S. Trustee 101 W. Ohio St.. Ste. 1000
Indianapolis, IN 46204 |
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Friday, January 10, 2020 | ||
30 | 30
court
Minute Entry/Order Vacated
Mon 01/13 8:50 AM
Minute Entry/Order: re: Continued Trial (Day 2 of 2) |
|
Thursday, January 09, 2020 | ||
29 | 29
court
Minute Entry/Order Vacated
Fri 01/10 2:09 PM
Minute Entry/Order: re: Continued Trial (Day 1 of 2): Complaint To Avoid And Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547,548,549 and 550 And to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 5021 ,8 . Trial vacated per Stipulation of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed 9/9/2019 . (lat) |
|
Tuesday, September 17, 2019 | ||
28 | 28
court
Close Adversary Proceeding
Tue 09/17 8:52 AM
Adversary Proceeding 1:18-ap-50044 Closed. (btw) |
|
Monday, September 09, 2019 | ||
27 | 27
notice
Dismissal Stipulation re: Adversary Proceeding, Party or Count
Mon 09/09 11:00 AM
Stipulation of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by Patrick W Carothers, Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, Defendant Smith Transport, Inc. (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
Thursday, May 30, 2019 | ||
26 | 26
misc
Mediator's Connections, Affidavit Disclosing
Thu 05/30 8:40 AM
Affidavit Disclosing Mediator's Connections filed by Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Mediator Jeffrey Vanacore . (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
Wednesday, May 29, 2019 | ||
25 | 25
order
Continue Hearing/Trial/Pretrial Conference, Order on Motion to
Wed 05/29 10:55 AM
Order Granting Joint Second Motion to Continue Trial Date And Extend Pre-Trial Deadlines . Exhibit List due by 9/20/2019. Witness List due by 9/20/2019. Trial date set in Rm 311 U.S. Courthouse, Indianapolis, Indiana at 09:00 AM EST on 1/9/2020 and 1/10/2020 (Trial time allotted is two (2) days). The Clerk's Office will distribute this order. (lat) |
|
Friday, May 24, 2019 | ||
24 | 24
motion
Continue Hearing/Trial/Pretrial Conference, Motion to
Fri 05/24 4:08 PM
Joint Motion to Continue Trial filed by Patrick W Carothers, Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, Defendant Smith Transport, Inc . (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
Tuesday, May 14, 2019 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Mediator, Notice of Selection of
Tue 05/14 9:01 AM
Agreed Notice of Selection of Mediator Jeffery D. Vanacore, filed by Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors . (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
Wednesday, May 08, 2019 | ||
22 | 22
order
Refer to Medition, Order on Motion to
Wed 05/08 12:42 PM
Order Granting Motion to Refer to Mediation . Notice of Selection of Mediator or Motion to Select Panel of Mediator Candidates due by 5/22/2019. Attorney for Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors must distribute this order. (btw) |
|
Monday, May 06, 2019 | ||
21 | 21
motion
Mediation, Motion to Refer to
Mon 05/06 3:37 PM
Motion to Refer to Mediation filed by Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
Tuesday, December 11, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
2
pgs
order
Order (Generic)
Tue 12/11 2:22 PM
Order Reinstating Trial Date and Pre-Trial Deadlines . The Clerk's Office will distribute this order. (btw) |
|
Monday, December 10, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
notice
Notice of Submission
Mon 12/10 1:40 PM
Notice of Submission of Withdrawal of Demand for Jury Trial filed by Patrick W Carothers on behalf of Defendant Smith Transport, Inc . (Carothers, Patrick) |
|
Thursday, August 30, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
3
pgs
order
Order (Generic)
Thu 08/30 3:51 PM
Order Establishing Briefing Schedule on Defendant's Demand for Jury Trial . The Clerk's Office will distribute this order. (btw) |
|
Tuesday, August 28, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
court
Minute Entry/Order
Wed 08/29 11:36 AM
Minute Order . Hearing DATE: 08/28/2018, MATTER: Telephonic Status Conference: Defendant's Demand for a Jury Trial8 ,13 DISPOSITION: See Attached PDF document for details. (vCal Hearing ID (295986)). (LauraATrepes) |
|
Friday, July 27, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
court
Notice w/options for Hearings/Conferences/Etc.
Fri 07/27 10:34 AM
Notice of Status Teleconference. Status teleconference to be held on 8/28/2018 at 10:30 AM EDT via a teleconference at 877-848-7030; access code 8891756. (lat) |
|
Thursday, July 19, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
order
Scheduling Order
Thu 07/19 1:31 PM
Scheduling Order Setting Trial and Setting Cut-Off Dates . Dispositive motions due by 4/19/2019. Exhibit List due by 5/24/2019. Witness List due by 5/24/2019. Trial date set in Rm 311 U.S. Courthouse, Indianapolis at 09:00 AM EDT on 8/1/2019 and 8/2/2019 (Trial time allotted is 2 days). The Clerk's Office will distribute this order. (cmd) |
|
Tuesday, July 17, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
court
Minute Entry/Order
Wed 07/18 11:27 AM
Minute Order . Hearing DATE: 07/17/2018, MATTER: Telephonic Pretrial Conference: Complaint To Avoid And Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547,548,549 and 550 And to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 5021 ,8 DISPOSITION: See Attached PDF document for details. (vCal Hearing ID (294745)). (LauraATrepes) |
|
Tuesday, July 10, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Pretrial Statement
Tue 07/10 3:18 PM
Joint Pretrial Statement filed by Patrick W Carothers, Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, Defendant Smith Transport, Inc . (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
Thursday, June 28, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
court
Van30 - Mega-insert Notice
Thu 06/28 2:56 PM
Notice of Amended Dial-in Number for Telephonic Pre-Trial Conference. Parties are directed to dial 877-848-7030 and use access code 8891756 . (lat) |
|
Thursday, June 14, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
order
Setting Pretrial Conference
Thu 06/14 2:43 PM
Order Setting Telephonic Pretrial Conference. Pretrial Statement/Report due by 7/10/2018. Telephonic Pretrial Conference set on 7/17/2018 at 10:15 AM EDT in Telephone # 317-229-3960. The Clerk's Office will distribute this order. (cmd) |
|
Wednesday, June 13, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Corporate Ownership Statement
Wed 06/13 1:01 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement Pursuant to FRBP 7007.1 filed by Patrick W Carothers on behalf of Defendant Smith Transport, Inc. [Corporate Parent(s): Smith Transport, Inc.]. (Carothers, Patrick) |
|
Wednesday, May 30, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
court
Deficiency Notice - Miscellaneous
Wed 05/30 9:59 AM
Deficiency Notice Issued re: Answer to Complaint . Deficiency to be cured by 6/13/2018. (cmd) |
|
Tuesday, May 29, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 05/29 3:38 PM
Answer to Complaint filed by Patrick W Carothers on behalf of Defendant Smith Transport, Inc .(Carothers, Patrick) |
|
7 | 7
motion
Pro Hac Vice, Motion to Appear
Tue 05/29 3:32 PM
Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice with Affidavit in Support filed by Patrick W Carothers on behalf of Defendant Smith Transport, Inc. (Carothers, Patrick) |
|
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card
Tue 05/29 3:33 PM
Receipt of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice([LINK 18-50044 ) [motion,mprohac] (100.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A28617244. Fee amount 100.00 . (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Monday, March 12, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
cmp
Summons Certificate of Service
Mon 03/12 3:42 PM
Certificate of Service of Summons re: Smith Transport, Inc . (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
5 | 5
court
Summons Issued - Original/Alias
Mon 03/12 12:54 PM
Summons Issued. Attorney for Plaintiff must serve the summons and a copy of the complaint on parties pursuant to Fed.R.Bankr.P. 7004 . A certificate of service must be filed with the Court by 03/26/2018 . Adversary Answer due by 4/11/2018. (cmd) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Certificate of Service
Mon 03/12 10:22 AM
Certificate of Service re: Appearance, filed by Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors . (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
Thursday, March 08, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
court
Deficiency Notice - Miscellaneous
Thu 03/08 10:37 AM
Deficiency Notice Issued re: Appearance . Deficiency to be cured by 3/22/2018. (cmd) |
|
Wednesday, March 07, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Appearance
Wed 03/07 1:48 PM
Appearance filed by Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 03/07 1:47 PM
Adversary case[LINK 18-50044 . Complaint filed by Plaintiff(s) Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors against Defendant(s) Smith Transport, Inc. [12 ], [13], [14], [14]. (Steinfeld, Joseph) |