Florida Middle District Court
Judge:James S Moody, Jr
Referred: Julie S Sneed
Case #: 8:18-cv-00552
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1981 Civil Rights
Case Filed:Mar 07, 2018
Terminated:May 31, 2018
Case in other court:11th Circuit, 18-12480-J
Last checked: Monday Sep 03, 2018 5:27 AM EDT
Defendant
Michael P. McDaniel
Represented By
David Hollingsworth McClain
David Mcclain, Esq.
contact info
Defendant
Mark McMann
Defendant
Tamesha Saddlers
Defendant
Maria Zucker
Represented By
David Hollingsworth McClain
David Mcclain, Esq.
contact info
Defendant
Polk County Department of Revenue
Represented By
David Hollingsworth McClain
David Mcclain, Esq.
contact info
Plaintiff
Larael Owens
500 S MacArthur Dr. Apt A4
Camilla, GA 31730


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, April 18, 2019
36 36 1 pgs appeal Writ of certiorari denied - Supreme Court Thu 04/18 9:49 AM
Notification from the U.S. Court of Appeals, 11th Circuit, that WRIT OF CERTIORARI has been denied by the U.S. Supreme Court as to30 Notice of appeal filed by Larael Owens Issued on 4/16/19. The court's mandate having previously issued, no further action will be taken by this court. (JNB)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 17, 2018
35 35 appeal USCA order Mon 12/17 11:36 AM
ORDER of USCA: ENTRY OF DISMISSAL. Pursuant to the 11th Cir.R.42-1(b), this appeal is DISMISSED for want of prosecution because the appellant Larael Owens has failed to pay the filing and docketing fees to the district court within the time fixed by the rules as to26 Notice of appeal filed by Larael Owens,30 Notice of appeal filed by Larael Owens. EOD: 12/14/18; USCA number: 18-12480 J. (KE)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 04, 2018
34 34 notice Notice of appearance Tue 09/04 10:55 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Shelley B. Cridlin on behalf of Michael P. McDaniel, Polk County Department of Revenue, Maria Zucker (Cridlin, Shelley)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 10, 2018
33 33 3 pgs order Order on motion for leave to appeal in forma pauperis/affidavit of indigency Tue 07/10 1:38 PM
ORDER denying 31 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis on Appeal/affidavit of indigency. The Clerk of Court is directed to immediately notify the parties and the United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit that Plaintiff's appeal is not taken in good faith. Plaintiff shall pay the appellate docketing and filing fees within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed on 7/10/2018. (JAR)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 06, 2018
32 32 appeal Transmittal of initial appeal package Fri 07/06 9:44 AM
TRANSMITTAL of initial appeal package to USCA consisting of copies of notice of appeal, docket sheet, order/judgment being appealed, and motion, if applicable to USCA re30 Notice of appeal. (DG)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 05, 2018
31 31 motion Appeal in forma pauperis/affidavit of indigency Fri 07/06 9:35 AM
MOTION for leave to appeal in forma pauperis/affidavit of indigency by Larael Owens.(DG)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
30 30 appeal Notice of appeal Fri 07/06 9:33 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to29 Order on motion for leave to appeal in forma pauperis/affidavit of indigency by Larael Owens. Filing fee not paid.(DG)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Mailing Envelope
Thursday, June 21, 2018
29 29 4 pgs order Order on motion for leave to appeal in forma pauperis/affidavit of indigency Thu 06/21 3:59 PM
ORDER denying 27 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis on Appeal/affidavit of indigency. The Clerk of Court is directed to immediately notify the parties and the United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit that Plaintiff's appeal is not taken in good faith. Plaintiff shall pay the appellate docketing and filing fees within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed on 6/21/2018. (JAR)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 13, 2018
28 28 appeal Transmittal of initial appeal package Wed 06/13 3:31 PM
TRANSMITTAL of initial appeal package to USCA consisting of copies of notice of appeal, docket sheet, order/judgment being appealed, and motion, if applicable to USCA re26 Notice of appeal. (LSS)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 11, 2018
27 27 motion Appeal in forma pauperis/affidavit of indigency Wed 06/13 3:21 PM
MOTION for leave to appeal in forma pauperis/affidavit of indigency by Larael Owens. (LSS)
Related: [-]
26 26 appeal Notice of appeal Wed 06/13 3:20 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to25 Order on motion to dismiss by Larael Owens. Filing fee not paid.(LSS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Mailing Envelope
Thursday, May 31, 2018
25 25 3 pgs order Order on motion to dismiss Thu 05/31 10:15 AM
ORDER: Defendant Polk County Department of Revenue's Motion to Dismiss Dkt. 22 is granted. Plaintiff's amended complaint is dismissed without prejudice. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case and terminate any pending motions as moot. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 5/31/2018. (SMB)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 29, 2018
24 24 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 05/29 2:55 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re22 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by Larael Owens.(LSS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Mailing Envelope
Thursday, May 24, 2018
23 23 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 05/25 3:39 PM
DUPLICATE RESPONSE in Opposition re13 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint 42 U.S.C. 1983 Civil Rights Action filed by Larael Owens.(LSS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Mailing Envelope
Thursday, May 17, 2018
22 22 motion Dismiss Thu 05/17 9:42 AM
MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint by Michael P. McDaniel, Polk County Department of Revenue, Maria Zucker. (McClain, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 07, 2018
21 21 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 05/07 4:24 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Michael P. McDaniel, Mark McMann, Polk County Department of Revenue, Tamesha Saddlers, Maria Zucker with Jury Demand. filed by Larael Owens. Related document: 1 Complaint filed by Larael Owens.(LSS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 & 2,
Att: 2 Main Document
Thursday, April 26, 2018
20 20 3 pgs order Order on motion to dismiss Thu 04/26 3:23 PM
ORDER: The Motion to Dismiss Dkt. 13 filed by Defendants Maria Zucker, Michael McDaniel, and the Polk County Department of Revenue, a/k/a Florida Department of Revenue is GRANTED to the extent stated herein. Plaintiff's complaint is dismissed without prejudice to Plaintiff to file an amended complaint within fourteen (14) days of this Order. If Plaintiff does not file an amended complaint during the applicable time, this action will be closed without further notice. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 4/26/2018. (SMB)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 23, 2018
19 19 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 04/25 11:25 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re13 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint 42 U.S.C. 1983 Civil Rights Action filed by Larael Owens.(LSS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Mailing Envelope
Tuesday, April 10, 2018
13 13 motion Dismiss Tue 04/10 8:22 AM
MOTION to Dismiss Complaint 42 U.S.C. 1983 Civil Rights Action by Michael P. McDaniel, Polk County Department of Revenue, Maria Zucker.(McClain, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Admin. Order 5-31.7
Monday, April 09, 2018
18 18 service Summons returned executed Wed 04/11 4:24 PM
RETURN of service executed on 3/20/2018 by Larael Owens as to Tamesha Saddlers. (LSS)
Related: [-]
17 17 service Summons returned executed Wed 04/11 4:23 PM
RETURN of service executed on 3/20/2018 by Larael Owens as to Mark McMann. (LSS)
Related: [-]
16 16 service Summons returned executed Wed 04/11 4:22 PM
RETURN of service executed on 3/20/2018 by Larael Owens as to Michael P. McDaniel. (LSS)
Related: [-]
15 15 service Summons returned executed Wed 04/11 4:21 PM
RETURN of service executed on 3/20/2018 by Larael Owens as to Maria Zucker. (LSS)
Related: [-]
14 14 service Summons returned executed Wed 04/11 4:18 PM
RETURN of service executed on 3/20/2018 by Larael Owens as to Polk County Department of Revenue. (LSS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 04, 2018
12 12 service Summons returned executed Thu 04/05 3:56 PM
RETURN of service executed on 3/23/2018 by Larael Owens as to Mark McMann.(LSS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Mailing Envelope
11 11 service Summons returned executed Thu 04/05 3:53 PM
RETURN of service executed on 3/26/2018 by Larael Owens as to Tamesha Saddlers. (LSS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Mailing Envelope
Monday, March 19, 2018
10 10 service Summons issued Wed 03/21 4:37 PM
SUMMONS issued as to Michael P. McDaniel. (LSS)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Summons issued Wed 03/21 4:36 PM
SUMMONS issued as to Tamesha Saddlers. (LSS)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons issued Wed 03/21 4:35 PM
SUMMONS issued as to Polk County Department of Revenue. (LSS)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of pendency of related cases Wed 03/21 4:12 PM
NOTICE of pendency of related cases re4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Larael Owens. Related case(s): yes (LSS)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons issued Wed 03/21 4:11 PM
SUMMONS issued as to Maria Zucker. (LSS)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons issued Wed 03/21 4:11 PM
SUMMONS issued as to Mark McMann. (LSS)
Related: [-]
misc Fees paid Mon 03/19 11:11 AM
FEES paid by Larael Owens (Filing fee $400.00 receipt number tpa049481) (ARC)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 09, 2018
4 4 order Related case order and track 2 notice Fri 03/09 8:57 AM
RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Issued by Deputy Clerk on 3/9/2018. (AD)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 08, 2018
3 3 2 pgs order Order on motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis/affidavit of indigency Thu 03/08 3:44 PM
ORDER denying 2 Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis/affidavit of indigency. Plaintiff is directed to pay the filing fee to the Clerk by April 9, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed on 3/8/2018. (LBL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 07, 2018
2 2 motion Proceed in forma pauperis/affidavit of indigency Thu 03/08 11:01 AM
MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis/affidavit of indigency by Larael Owens. (LNR)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 03/08 11:00 AM
COMPLAINT against Michael P. McDaniel, Mark McMann, Tamesha Saddlers, Maria Zucker filed by Larael Owens.(LNR) Modified on 3/8/2018 (LNR).(Unsigned complaint)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit,
Att: 5 Exhibit,
Att: 6 Mailing Envelope