In Re:Mary Santiago-Monteverde
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:12-bk-04131 |
Type | bankruptcy / district court |
Nature of Suit | 422 Bankruptcy - Appeal 28 USC 158 |
Case Filed: | Oct 12, 2012 |
Terminated: | Mar 02, 2015 |
Debtor
Mary Veronica Santiago-Monteverde
, |
Represented By
|
Last checked: Friday Nov 21, 2014 4:18 PM EST |
Amicus Curiae
New York City Bankruptcy Assistance Project
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
MFY Legal Services, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Appellee
John S. Pereira, Chapter 7 Trustee
|
Represented By
|
![]() OPINION, reversing the district court decision and remanding for further proceedings, per curiam (RDS, BDP, RR, C.JJ,), FILED.[1449259] [12-4131] |
1. | NYC rent-stabilized leases off-limits in bankruptcy: court (reuters.com) |
Submitted Mon 03/02/2015 | |
2. | Court Ruling Favors New Yorkers With Regulated Apartments (online.wsj.com) |
Submitted Fri 11/21/2014 | |
3. | Court Test Nears on Whether Bankruptcy Shields Rent-Stabilized Leases (online.wsj.com) |
Submitted Thu 09/18/2014 | |
Docket last updated: 11/21/2014 4:17 PM EST |
Thursday, October 11, 2012 | ||
1 | 1
![]() |
|
2 | 2
![]() |
|
4 | 4
![]() |
|
5 | 5
![]() |