New Jersey Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Michael B Kaplan
Case #: 3:18-bk-14603
Case Filed:Mar 09, 2018
Terminated:Aug 24, 2020

TypePartnership
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$50,000,001 to $100 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Princeton Alternative Income Fund, LP
100 Canal Pointe Blvd Ste 208
Princeton, NJ 08540
Represented By
Timothy H Caine
King & Spalding
contact info
George R. Hirsch
Sills Cummis & Gross PC
contact info
Valerie A. Hamilton
Sills Cummis & Gross, PC
contact info
Last checked: Friday Apr 13, 2018 2:40 PM EDT
Creditor
Ranger Alternative Management, II, L.P.
Represented By
Dean C. Waldt
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
David A. Haworth
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Creditor
Ranger Direct Lending Fund Trust
Represented By
Dean C. Waldt
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
David A. Haworth
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Creditor
Ranger Specialty Income Fund, L.P.
Represented By
Dean C. Waldt
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
David A. Haworth
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Covenant Strategic Income Fund Series Interests of the SALI Multi-Series Fund II 3(c)(1), LP
Represented By
John C. Kilgannon
Stevens & Lee
contact info
Interested Party
MicroBilt Corporation
100 Canal Pointe Boulevard, Suite 208
Princeton, NJ 08540
Represented By
Derek J. Baker
Reed Smith, LLP
contact info
Interested Party
admin
Represented By
John C. Kilgannon
Stevens & Lee
contact info
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
US Dept of Justice Office of the US Trustee One Newark Center Ste 2100
Newark, NJ 07102
Represented By
Benjamin Teich
Office Of The United States Trustee
contact info

GPO Aug 29 2019
Letter Opinion Approving Compromise and Order Granting Motion to Approve Compromise (related document:691 Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019 filed by Trustee Matthew Cantor).. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 8/29/2019. (wir)

Docket last updated: 45 minutes ago
Friday, January 28, 2022
utility Close Adversary Case Fri 01/28 1:45 PM
Adversary Case (3:18-ap-1598) Closed. (wir)
Related: [-]
utility Close Adversary Case Fri 01/28 1:53 PM
Adversary Case (3:19-ap-1157) Closed. (wir)
Related: [-]