In re Payment Card Interchange
Original Case: 1:05-md-01720
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:12-cv-04708 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 410 Other Statutes - Antitrust |
Case Filed: | Nov 28, 2012 |
Terminated: | Jun 30, 2016 |
Last checked: Monday Jul 04, 2016 7:18 AM EDT |
Defendant - Appellee
Defendants in civil action Jetro Holding, Inc. et al v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv-4520 JG-JO
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Defendants in civil actionNational Association of Convenience Stores et al v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv-4521 JG-JO
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Defendants in civil action Supervalu Inc. v. Visa U.S.A. Inc. et al 05-cv-4650 JG-JO
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Defendants in civil action Publix Supermarkets, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A. Inc. et al 05-cv-4677-JG-JO
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Defendants in civil action Seaway Gas & Petroleum, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05--cv-4728 JG-JO
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Defendants in civil action Raley's v. Visa U.S.A. Inc. et al 05-cv-4799- JG-JO
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Defendants in civil action East Goshen Pharmacy, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc 05-cv-5073-JG-JO
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Defendants iin civil action National Grocers Association et al v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv- 5207 JG -JO
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Defendants in civil action American Booksellers Association v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv-5319 JG -JO
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Defendants in civil action Rookies, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5069-JG-JO
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Defendants in civil action Jasperson v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5070-JG-JO
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Defendants in civil action Animal Land, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5074-JG-JO
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Defendants in civil action Bonte Wafflerie, LLC v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5083 JG-JO
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Defendants in civil action Broken Ground, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5082 JG-JO
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Defendants in civil action Baltimore Avenue Foods, LLC v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5080 JG-JO
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Defendants in civil action Fairmont Orthopedics & Sports Medicine, PA v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5076-JG-JO
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Defendants in civil action Tabu Salon & Spa, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5072 -JG-JO
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Defendants in civil action Lakeshore Interiors v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5081 JG-JO
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Defendants in civil action Parkway Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5077-JG-JO
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Defendants in civil action NuCity Publications, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5070-JG-JO
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Defendants in civil action Hyman v. VISA International Service Association, Inc. 05-cv-5866 JG -JO
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Defendants in civil action Lee et al v. Visa U.S.A. Inc. et al 05-cv-03800
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Defendants in civil action Resnick Amsterdam & Leshner P.C. v. Visa U.S. A, Inc. et al, 05-cv-3924 JG-JO
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Defendants in civil action Hy-Vee, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv-03925 JG-JO
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Defendants in civil action Meijer, Inc. et al v. Visa U.S.A. Inc. et al 05-cv-4131 JG-JO
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Defendants in civil action Lepkowski v. Mastercard International Incorporated et al 05-cv-4974-JG-JO
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Defendants in civil action Photos Etc. Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5071-JG-JO
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Defendants in civil action Kroger Co. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5078 JG-JO
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Defendants in civil case Fitlife Health Systems of Arcadia, Inc. v. Mastercard International Incorporated et a 05-cv-5153 JG -JO
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Defendants in civil action Rite Aid Corporation et al. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al. 05-cv-5352 JG-JO
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Defendants in civil action The Kroger Co., et al. v. MasterCard Inc., et al., 06-cv-0039 JG-JO
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Defendants in civil action Harris Stationers, Inc., et al. v. Visa International Service Association, et al. 05-cv-5868 JG-JO
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Defendants in civil action Dr. Roy Hyman, et al. v. Visa International Service Association, Inc., et al. 05-cv-5866
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Defendants in civil action Performace Labs, Inc. v. American Express Travel Related Services Co., Inc., et al 05-cv-5869 JG-JO
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Defendants in civil action Discount Optics, Inc., et al. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc., et al. 05-cv-5870 JG-JO
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Defendants in civil action LDC, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al. 05-cv-5871 JG-JO
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Defendants in civil action G.E.S. Bakery, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc,. et al. 05-cv-5879 JG-JO
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Defendants in civil action Leeber Cohen, M.D. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc., et al. 05-cv-5878 JG-JO
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Defendants in civil action Connecticut Food Association, Inc., et al. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc., et al 05-cv-5880 JG-JO
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Defendants in civil action Twisted Spoke v. Visa U.S.A., Inc., et al. 05-cv-5881 JG-JO
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Defendants in civil action Lombardo Bros., Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5882 JG-JO
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Defendants in civil action Abdallah Bishara, etc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5883 JG-JO
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Defendants in civil action 518 Restaurant Corp. v. American Express Travel Related Services Co., et al. 05-cv-5884 JG-JO
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Defendants in civil action JGSA, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc., et al 05-cv-5885
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Defendants in civil action Fringe, Inc. v. Visa, U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv-4194 JG-JO
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
HSBC Bank USA, N.A.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
M.C.E.S., Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Capital One, F.S.B.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Capital One Financial Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Wells Fargo & Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
National City Bank of Kentucky
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
National City Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Juniper Financial Corporation
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Mastercard Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
HSBC Finance Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
HSBC North America Holdings Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Citibank, N.A.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Republic of Argentina
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Citigroup Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Defendants in civil action Bi-Lo, LLC. et al v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 06-cv-2532 JG-JO
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Defendants in civil action Bi-Lo, LLC. et al v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 06-cv-2534 JG-JO
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Chase Bank USA, N.A.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
JPMorgan Chase & Co.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Fifth Third Bancorp
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Bank of America, N.A.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Visa International Service Association
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Visa U.S.A. Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Defendants in civil action 06-cv-5583, Esdacy, INC. v. Visa USA, INC. et al
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Bank of America Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Texas Independent Bancshares, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
First National Bank of Omaha
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Barclays Financial Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Washington Mutual, Inc.
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Chase Paymentech Solutions, LLC
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Defendants in civil action BKS. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 09-cv-2264-JG-JO
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Wachovia Bank, National Association
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Wachovia Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Defendants in civil action Gulfside Casino Partnership. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 09-cv-03225 JG-JO
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Landers Harley-Davidson Little Rock
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Sears Holdings Management Corporation
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Discover
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor
American Express
|
|
Intervenor
Mary Watson
|
Represented By
|
Objector
Home Depot USA, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Petitioner - Appellee
Robersons Fine Jewelry, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Coborn's Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
D'Agostino Supermarkets, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
National Restaurant Association
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Affiliated Foods Midwest
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Jetro Holdings, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Jetro Cash & Carry Enterprises, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
National Community Pharmacists Association
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
National Cooperative Grocers Association
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
National Association of Convenience Stores
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
National Association of Truck Stop Operators
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
National Grocers Association
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Plaintiffs in civil action Jetro Holding, Inc. et al v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv-4520 JG-JO
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Plaintiffs in civil action National Association of Convenience Stores et al v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv-4521 JG-JO
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Plaintiffs in civil action Supervalu Inc. v. Visa U.S.A. Inc. et al 05-cv-4650 JG-JO
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Plaintiffs in civil action Publix Supermarkets, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A. Inc. et al 05-cv-4677 - JG-JO
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Plaintiffs in civil action Seaway Gas & Petroleum, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv-4728-JG-JO
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Plaintiffs in civil action Raley's v. Visa U.S.A. Inc. et al 05-cv- 4799 JG-JO
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Plaintiffs in civil action East Goshen Pharmacy, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5073 JG-JO
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Plaintiffs in civil action National Grocers Association et al v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv- 5207 JG-JO
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Plaintiffs in civil action American Booksellers Association v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv-5319 JG-JO
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Plaintiffs in civil action Rookies, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-CV-5069 JG-JO
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Plaintiffs in civil action Jasperson v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5070 JG-JO
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Plaintiffs in Civil action Animal Land, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc 05-cv-5074 JG-JO
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Plaintiffs in civil action Bonte Wafflerie, LLC v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5083 JG-JO
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Plaintiffs in civil action Broken Ground, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5082 JG-JO
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Plaintiffs in civil action Baltimore Avenue Foods, LLC v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5080 JG-JO
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Plaintiffs in civil action Fairmont Orthopedics & Sports Medicine, PA v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5076 JG JO
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Plaintiffs in civil action Tabu Salon & Spa, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5072 JG-JO
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Plaintiffs in civil action Lakeshore Interiors v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5081JG JO
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Plaintiffs in civil action Parkway Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5077 JG-JO
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Plaintiffs in civil action NuCity Publications, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5075 JG-JO
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Plaintiffs in civil action Hyman v. VISA International Service Association, Inc. 05-cv-5866 JG-JO
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Plaintiffs in civil action Lee et al v. Visa U.S.A. Inc. et al 05-cv-3800 JG-JO
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Plaintiffs in civil action Resnick Amsterdam & Leshner P.C. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv-3924 JG-JO
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Plaintiffs in civil action Hy-Vee, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv-3925-JG-JO
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Plaintiffs in civil action Meijer, Inc. et al v. Visa U.S.A. Inc. et al 05-cv-4131-JG-JO
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Plaintiffs in civil action Lepkowski v. Mastercard International Incorporated et al 05-cv-4974 JG-JO
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Plaintiffs in civil actionPhotos Etc. Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5071JG-JO
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Plaintiffs in civil action Kroger Co. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5078 JG-JO
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Plaintiffs in civil action Fitlife Health Systems of Arcadia, Inc. v. Mastercard International Incorporated et al 05-cv-5153 JG-JO
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Plaintiffs in civil action Harris Stationers, Inc., et al. v. Visa International Service Association, et al. 05-cv-5868 JG-JO
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Plaintiffs in civil action Dr. Roy Hyman, et al v. Visa International Service Association, Inc., et al . 05-cv-5866 JG-JO
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Plaintiffs in civil action Performance Labs, Inc. v. American Express Travel Related Services Co., Inc., et al. 05-cv-5869 JG-JO
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Plaintiffs in civil action Discount Optics, Inc., et al. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc., et al. 05-cv-5870 JG-JO
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Plaintiffs in civil action LDC, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc., et al 05-cv-5871 JG-JO
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Plaintiffs in civil action Leeber Cohen, M.D. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc., et al. 05-cv-5878 JG-JO
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Plaintiffs in civil action G.E.S. Bakery, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc., et al. 05-cv-5879 JG-JO
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Plaintiffs in civil action Connecticut Food Association, Inc., et al. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc., et al. 05-cv-5880 JG-JO
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Plaintiffs in Twisted Spoke v. Visa U.S.A., Inc., et al. 05-cv-5881 JG-JO
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Plaintiffs in civil action Lombardo Bros., Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-5882 JG-JO
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Plaintiffs in civil action Abdallah Bishara, etc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5883 JG-JO
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Plaintiffs in civil action 518 Restaurant Corp. v. American Express Travel Related Services Co., Inc., et al. 05-cv-5884 JG-JO
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Plaintiffs in civil action JGSA, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc., et al. 05-cv-5885 JG-JO
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Plaintiffs in civil action The Kroger Co., et al. v. MasterCard Inc., et al., 06-cv-0039 JG-JO
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Plaintiffs in civil action Rite Aid Corporation et al. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al. 05-cv-5352 JG-JO
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Plaintiffs in civil action Fringe, Inc. v. Visa, U.S.A., Inc et al 05-cv-4194 JG-JO
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Plaintiffs in civil action Bi-Lo, LLC. et al v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 06-cv-2532 JG-JO
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Plaintiffs in civil action Bi-Lo, LLC. et al v. Mastercard Incorporated et al 06-cv-2534 JG-JO
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Plaintiffs in civil action 06-cv-5583, Esdacy, INC. v. Visa USA, INC. et al
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
QVC, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Payless Shoe Source, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
GMRI, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Capital Audio Electronics, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
NATSO, Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Plaintiffs in civil action BKS. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 09-cv-2264-JG-JO
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Plaintiffs in civil action Gulfside Casino Partnership. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 09-cv-03225 JG-JO
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Keith Superstores, BKS, INC., BKS of LA, Inc. d/b/a KEITH SUPERSTORES, and KEITHCO PETROLEUM, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Keithco Petroleum, Inc., BKS, INC., BKS of LA, Inc. d/b/a KEITH SUPERSTORES, and KEITHCO PETROLEUM, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 07/04/2016 7:12 AM EDT |
Wednesday, November 28, 2012 | ||
1 | 1
![]() |
|
2 | 2 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Affiliated Foods Midwest, Coborn's Incorporated, D'Agostino Supermarkets, Jetro Cash & Carry Enterprises, LLC, Jetro Holdings, Inc., National Association of Convenience Stores, National Association of Truck Stop Operators, National Community Pharmacists Association, National Cooperative Grocers Association, National Grocers Association and National Restaurant Association, district court docket entry re: receipt # 0207-5862405, FILED.[784272] 12-4708 [Entered: 12/03/2012 10:46 AM] | |
3 | 3
![]() |
|
4 | 4
![]() |