DILLABER et al v. ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN et al
District Of Columbia District Court | |
Judge: | Ketanji Brown Jackson |
Case #: | 1:18-cv-00554 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1602 Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 09, 2018 |
Terminated: | Mar 30, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 05, 2018 5:20 AM EDT |
Defendant
IRANIAN MINISTRY OF INFORMATION AND SECURITY
|
|
Defendant
ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN
|
|
Defendant
KINGDOM OF SAUDI ARABIA
|
|
Plaintiff
MARY JO CLARKE
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
THOMAS CLARKE, JR.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JOHN DILLABER
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ESTATE OF PHILIP DILLABER
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ESTATEOF JACQUELINE DILLABER
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ANNE YOUNGBLOOD
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
KATHERINE MARIE DILLABER
|
Represented By
|
1. | Lawsuit alleges Saudi, Iran support for 9/11 hijackers (aljazeera.com) |
Submitted Fri 03/23/2018 | |
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
Thu 04/18 4:15 PM
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to KATHERINE MARIE DILLABER. Attorney Caragh Fay Owens terminated.(Owens, Caragh) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, April 11, 2018 | ||
misc
Receipt and Acknowledgment of Transfer Papers
Thu 04/12 1:26 PM
Receipt on 04/11/2018 of Electronic Transfer. Other Court Number 1:18-cv-03162 sent by USDC for the Southern District of New York. (zrdj) |
||
Monday, April 02, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Extraction
Mon 04/02 2:20 PM
NOTICE of Extraction of case transferred to the Southern District of New York. (ztnr) |
|
8 | 8
misc
EMAIL MDL
Mon 04/02 2:18 PM
EMAIL dated 4/2/18 from the U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York requesting the transfer of the original file to be sent using the extract civil case feature of CM/ECF. (ztnr) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Certified Copy of Conditional Transfer Order
Mon 04/02 2:17 PM
CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-6) dated 3/30/18 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation directing the transfer to the U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Judge George B. Daniels for coordinated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407.(MDL 1570) (ztnr) |
|
misc
Case Transferred Out
Mon 04/02 2:19 PM
Case transferred to the USDC for the Southern District of New York, pursuant to Court Order entered 3/30/18; Sent to Court via extraction. (ztnr) |
||
Friday, March 30, 2018 | ||
order
.Order
Fri 03/30 8:46 PM
MINUTE ORDER: In light of the transfer of this matter for coordinated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1407, it is hereby ORDERED that this case is CLOSED; this matter shall be reopened upon remand by the MDL court. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 03/30/2018. (lckbj1) |
||
Monday, March 19, 2018 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 03/19 2:36 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. It is hereby ORDERED that Amanda Fox Perry is admitted pro hac vice in this matter as counsel for Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 03/19/2018. (lckbj1) |
||
Friday, March 16, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
order
.Order
Fri 03/16 10:06 AM
GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES FOR CIVIL CASES BEFORE JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these directives, and parties and counsel should pay particular attention to the Courts instructions for briefing motions and filing exhibits. Failure to adhere to this Order may, when appropriate, result the imposition of sanctions and/or sua sponte denial of non-conforming motions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 3/16/2018. (lckbj1) |
|
Thursday, March 15, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 03/15 5:25 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Amanda Fox Perry, :Firm- Fay Law Group PA, :Address- 777 6th Street NW Suite 410. Phone No. - 202-589-1300. Fax No. - 202-216-0298 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5375887. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by KATHERINE M. DILLABER(Fay, Caragh) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, March 14, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
service
Electronic Summons Issued
Wed 03/14 9:47 AM
SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to IRANIAN MINISTRY OF INFORMATION AND SECURITY, ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN, KINGDOM OF SAUDI ARABIA. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 03/14 9:39 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (zsb) |
||
Friday, March 09, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Related Case
Fri 03/09 6:07 PM
NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by All Plaintiffs. Case related to Case No. 03-1570 in the U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York. (Fay, Caragh) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Waiver
Fri 03/09 6:05 PM
MOTION for Waiver of Local Civil Rule 5.1(e) by KATHERINE M. DILLABER(Fay, Caragh) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 03/09 5:37 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5367707) filed by KATHERINE M. DILLABER.(Fay, Caragh) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons Islamic Republic of Iran, | ||
Att: 3 Summons Ministry of Information and Security, | ||
Att: 4 Summons Kingdom of Saudi Arabia |