Tennessee Western District Court
Judge:Thomas L Parker
Referred: Tu M Pham
Case #: 2:18-cv-02164
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Mar 09, 2018
Terminated:Oct 12, 2018
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 05, 2018 4:06 AM CDT
Defendant
Ingersoll Rand Trane
Represented By
Oscar John Norris, III
Jackson Lewis Llp - Memphis
contact info
Defendant
Trane U.S., Inc
Represented By
Oscar John Norris, III
Jackson Lewis Llp - Memphis
contact info
Plaintiff
Audrey Arrindell
Represented By
Robert L.J. Spence, Jr.
The Spence Law Firm
contact info
Jerrick D. Murrell
The Spence Law Firm, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Friday, October 12, 2018
28 28 1 pgs order Judgment Fri 10/12 4:40 PM
JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 10/12/2018. (Parker, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 11, 2018
27 27 2 pgs misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 10/11 5:18 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Ingersoll Rand Trane, Trane U.S., Inc. (Norris, Oscar)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 05, 2018
26 26 2 pgs order Order Fri 10/05 3:13 PM
ORDER REQUIRING NOTICE OR STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL re25 Notice of Mediation Status filed by Audrey Arrindell. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 10/5/2018. (Parker, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 28, 2018
25 25 2 pgs notice Notice of Mediation Status Tue 08/28 1:07 PM
NOTICE OF MEDIATION STATUS by Audrey Arrindell (Spence, Robert)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 16, 2018
24 24 2 pgs notice Notice (Other) Mon 07/16 3:14 PM
NOTICE by Audrey Arrindell of Service of Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Productions of Documents (Spence, Robert)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 20, 2018
23 23 17 pgs respoth Amended Answer to Complaint Wed 06/20 2:47 PM
AMENDED ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Ingersoll Rand Trane, Trane U.S., Inc. (Norris, Oscar)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 12, 2018
22 22 notice Notice (Other) Tue 06/12 5:00 PM
NOTICE by Audrey Arrindell of Service of Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures (Spence, Robert)
Related: [-]
21 21 notice Notice (Other) Tue 06/12 11:39 AM
NOTICE by Audrey Arrindell regarding Selection of Mediator (Spence, Robert)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 01, 2018
20 20 order Scheduling Order Fri 06/01 10:50 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 06/01/2018. (Parker, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 29, 2018
19 19 minutes Scheduling Conference Tue 05/29 12:19 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas L. Parker: Scheduling Conference held on 5/29/2018. Both Parties present in Court. The Parties updated the Court as to the status of the Case. Plaintiff is presently not working & seeks to be reinstated. The Court adjusted a couple of dates within the Proposed Scheduling Order, order to be entered. Parties anticipate the case to take 3 days to try at trial. A Status conference date will be set at a later date. (Plaintiff: Robert L.J. Spence, Jr., Jerrick D. Murrell)(Defense: Oscar John Norris, III) (Court Reporter Cathy Best.) (wrh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 22, 2018
18 18 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Tue 05/22 4:18 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Spence, Robert)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 11, 2018
17 17 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 05/11 5:26 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Ingersoll Rand Trane, Trane U.S., Inc.(Norris, Oscar)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 04, 2018
16 16 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Fri 05/04 5:29 PM
** TEXT ORDER ONLY--NOTHING ATTACHED ** ORDER granting15 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendants' new response deadline is May 11, 2018. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 05/04/2018. (Parker, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 03, 2018
15 15 motion Extension of Time to File Document Thu 05/03 5:49 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint [proposed order submitted] by Ingersoll Rand Trane, Trane U.S., Inc.(Norris, Oscar)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Consultation
Tuesday, April 24, 2018
14 14 notice Setting Letter Tue 04/24 4:18 PM
SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for Tuesday, 5/29/2018 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 2 - Memphis before Judge Thomas L. Parker. (jpw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 12, 2018
13 13 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Thu 04/12 7:21 PM
** TEXT ORDER ONLY--NOTHING ATTACHED ** ORDER granting12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant's new response deadline is now May 4, 2018. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 04/12/2018. (Parker, Thomas)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Extension of Time to File Document Thu 04/12 2:37 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint [proposed order submitted] by Ingersoll Rand Trane, Trane U.S., Inc.(Norris, Oscar)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Consultation
Tuesday, March 27, 2018
11 11 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 03/27 12:25 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Audrey Arrindell as to Ingersoll Rand Trane. (Spence, Robert)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 03/27 12:24 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Audrey Arrindell as to Trane U.S., Inc. (Spence, Robert)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 03/27 12:21 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Audrey Arrindell as to Trane U.S., Inc. (Spence, Robert)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 09, 2018
8 8 service Summons Issued Mon 03/12 8:38 AM
Summons Issued as to Ingersoll Rand Trane. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Issued Mon 03/12 8:37 AM
Summons Issued as to Trane U.S., Inc. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice LR 72.1 - Right to Consent to Jurisdiction by Magistrate Judge Mon 03/12 8:33 AM
NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jld)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice ADR Compliance Mon 03/12 8:33 AM
NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Courtesy Notice Mon 03/12 8:18 AM
COURTESY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document1 Complaint, filed by Audrey Arrindell has been filed. For future reference, please note ECF Policies and Procedures 10.1 Effectivesnes of Electronic Signature. There is a "wet signature" on the civil cover sheet.. Please refer to the[LINK:ECF User Manual] and[LINK:ECF Policies and Procedures] . Filer is not required to resubmit document. 3/12/2018 (jld)
Related: [-]
3 3 utility Add and Terminate Judges Mon 03/12 8:16 AM
Judge Thomas L. Parker and Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham added. 3/12/2018 (jld)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 03/09 5:09 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jerrick D. Murrell on behalf of Audrey Arrindell (Murrell, Jerrick)
Related: [-]
1 1 19 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 03/09 5:04 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0651-2743103), filed by Audrey Arrindell.(Spence, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Notice of Right to Sue Letter,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Summons Summons as to Trane U.S., Inc.,
Att: 4 Summons Summons as to Ingersoll Rand Trane