California Northern District Court
Judge:Edward M Chen
Referred: Sallie Kim
Case #: 3:18-cv-01554
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause05:702 Administrative Procedure Act
Case Filed:Mar 12, 2018
Terminated:Feb 27, 2024
Case in other court:18-16981
Last checked: Saturday Sep 08, 2018 1:49 AM PDT
Amicus
County of Los Angeles
Represented By
Daniel R. Suvor
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
contact info
Margaret Louise Carter
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Amicus
State of California
Represented By
James F. Zahradka, II
California Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
United States of America
Represented By
Gary D Feldon
Department Of Justice
contact info
Rhett Martin
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Joseph C Dugan
United States Department Of Justice
contact info
Kevin M Snell
United States Department Of Justice
contact info
Adam Kirschner
contact info
Defendant
United States Department of Homeland Security
Represented By
Gary D Feldon
Department Of Justice
contact info
Rhett Martin
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Joseph C Dugan
United States Department Of Justice
contact info
Kevin M Snell
United States Department Of Justice
contact info
Adam Kirschner
contact info
Defendant
Elaine C. Duke
Represented By
Gary D Feldon
Department Of Justice
contact info
Rhett Martin
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Joseph C Dugan
United States Department Of Justice
contact info
Kevin M Snell
United States Department Of Justice
contact info
Adam Kirschner
contact info
Defendant
Kirstjen Nielsen
Represented By
Gary D Feldon
Department Of Justice
contact info
Rhett Martin
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Joseph C Dugan
United States Department Of Justice
contact info
Kevin M Snell
United States Department Of Justice
contact info
Adam Kirschner
contact info
Plaintiff
Cristina Morales
Represented By
Nicole Marie Ryan
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Amanda Robin Farfel
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Sean Ashley Commons
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Alycia Ann Degen
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Jessica Johnson Fishfeld
Sidley Austin
contact info
Ryan M. Sandrock
Sidley Austin, LLP
contact info
William S. Freeman
Aclu Foundation Of Northern California
contact info
Andrew Brian Talai
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Emilou MacLean
National Day Laborer Organizing Network
contact info
Mark E. Haddad
contact info
Katelyn Rowe
Sidley Austin
contact info
Mohindra Rupram
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Jessica Karp Bansal
National Day Laborer Organizing Network
contact info
Marisol Ramirez
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Matthew Joseph Letten
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Matthew Waters Light
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Ahilan Thevanesan Arulanantham
Aclu Of Southern California
contact info
Jillian Rebecca Dent
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Orlando Zepeda
Represented By
Nicole Marie Ryan
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Amanda Robin Farfel
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Sean Ashley Commons
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Alycia Ann Degen
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Jessica Johnson Fishfeld
Sidley Austin
contact info
Ryan M. Sandrock
Sidley Austin, LLP
contact info
William S. Freeman
Aclu Foundation Of Northern California
contact info
Andrew Brian Talai
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Emilou MacLean
National Day Laborer Organizing Network
contact info
Mark E. Haddad
contact info
Katelyn Rowe
Sidley Austin
contact info
Mohindra Rupram
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Jessica Karp Bansal
National Day Laborer Organizing Network
contact info
Marisol Ramirez
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Matthew Joseph Letten
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Matthew Waters Light
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Ahilan Thevanesan Arulanantham
Aclu Of Southern California
contact info
Jillian Rebecca Dent
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Benjamin Zepeda
Represented By
Nicole Marie Ryan
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Amanda Robin Farfel
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Sean Ashley Commons
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Alycia Ann Degen
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Jessica Johnson Fishfeld
Sidley Austin
contact info
Ryan M. Sandrock
Sidley Austin, LLP
contact info
William S. Freeman
Aclu Foundation Of Northern California
contact info
Andrew Brian Talai
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Emilou MacLean
National Day Laborer Organizing Network
contact info
Mark E. Haddad
contact info
Katelyn Rowe
Sidley Austin
contact info
Mohindra Rupram
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Jessica Karp Bansal
National Day Laborer Organizing Network
contact info
Marisol Ramirez
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Matthew Joseph Letten
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Matthew Waters Light
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Ahilan Thevanesan Arulanantham
Aclu Of Southern California
contact info
Jillian Rebecca Dent
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Rilya Salary
Represented By
Nicole Marie Ryan
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Amanda Robin Farfel
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Sean Ashley Commons
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Alycia Ann Degen
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Jessica Johnson Fishfeld
Sidley Austin
contact info
Ryan M. Sandrock
Sidley Austin, LLP
contact info
William S. Freeman
Aclu Foundation Of Northern California
contact info
Andrew Brian Talai
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Emilou MacLean
National Day Laborer Organizing Network
contact info
Mark E. Haddad
contact info
Katelyn Rowe
Sidley Austin
contact info
Mohindra Rupram
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Jessica Karp Bansal
National Day Laborer Organizing Network
contact info
Marisol Ramirez
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Matthew Joseph Letten
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Matthew Waters Light
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Ahilan Thevanesan Arulanantham
Aclu Of Southern California
contact info
Jillian Rebecca Dent
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Crista Ramos
Represented By
Nicole Marie Ryan
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Amanda Robin Farfel
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Sean Ashley Commons
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Alycia Ann Degen
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Jessica Johnson Fishfeld
Sidley Austin
contact info
Ryan M. Sandrock
Sidley Austin, LLP
contact info
William S. Freeman
Aclu Foundation Of Northern California
contact info
Andrew Brian Talai
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Emilou MacLean
National Day Laborer Organizing Network
contact info
Mark E. Haddad
contact info
Katelyn Rowe
Sidley Austin
contact info
Mohindra Rupram
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Jessica Karp Bansal
National Day Laborer Organizing Network
contact info
Marisol Ramirez
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Matthew Joseph Letten
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Matthew Waters Light
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Ahilan Thevanesan Arulanantham
Aclu Of Southern California
contact info
Jillian Rebecca Dent
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Elsy Yolanda Flores de Ayala
Represented By
Nicole Marie Ryan
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Amanda Robin Farfel
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Sean Ashley Commons
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Alycia Ann Degen
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Jessica Johnson Fishfeld
Sidley Austin
contact info
Ryan M. Sandrock
Sidley Austin, LLP
contact info
William S. Freeman
Aclu Foundation Of Northern California
contact info
Andrew Brian Talai
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Emilou MacLean
National Day Laborer Organizing Network
contact info
Mark E. Haddad
contact info
Katelyn Rowe
Sidley Austin
contact info
Mohindra Rupram
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Jessica Karp Bansal
National Day Laborer Organizing Network
contact info
Marisol Ramirez
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Matthew Joseph Letten
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Matthew Waters Light
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Ahilan Thevanesan Arulanantham
Aclu Of Southern California
contact info
Jillian Rebecca Dent
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Hiwaida Elarabi
Represented By
Nicole Marie Ryan
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Amanda Robin Farfel
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Sean Ashley Commons
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Alycia Ann Degen
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Jessica Johnson Fishfeld
Sidley Austin
contact info
Ryan M. Sandrock
Sidley Austin, LLP
contact info
William S. Freeman
Aclu Foundation Of Northern California
contact info
Andrew Brian Talai
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Emilou MacLean
National Day Laborer Organizing Network
contact info
Mark E. Haddad
contact info
Katelyn Rowe
Sidley Austin
contact info
Mohindra Rupram
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Jessica Karp Bansal
National Day Laborer Organizing Network
contact info
Marisol Ramirez
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Matthew Joseph Letten
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Matthew Waters Light
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Ahilan Thevanesan Arulanantham
Aclu Of Southern California
contact info
Jillian Rebecca Dent
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Wilna Destin
Represented By
Nicole Marie Ryan
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Amanda Robin Farfel
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Sean Ashley Commons
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Alycia Ann Degen
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Jessica Johnson Fishfeld
Sidley Austin
contact info
Ryan M. Sandrock
Sidley Austin, LLP
contact info
William S. Freeman
Aclu Foundation Of Northern California
contact info
Andrew Brian Talai
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Emilou MacLean
National Day Laborer Organizing Network
contact info
Mark E. Haddad
contact info
Katelyn Rowe
Sidley Austin
contact info
Mohindra Rupram
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Jessica Karp Bansal
National Day Laborer Organizing Network
contact info
Marisol Ramirez
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Matthew Joseph Letten
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Matthew Waters Light
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Ahilan Thevanesan Arulanantham
Aclu Of Southern California
contact info
Jillian Rebecca Dent
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Hnaida Cenemat
Represented By
Nicole Marie Ryan
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Amanda Robin Farfel
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Sean Ashley Commons
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Alycia Ann Degen
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Jessica Johnson Fishfeld
Sidley Austin
contact info
Ryan M. Sandrock
Sidley Austin, LLP
contact info
William S. Freeman
Aclu Foundation Of Northern California
contact info
Andrew Brian Talai
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Emilou MacLean
National Day Laborer Organizing Network
contact info
Mark E. Haddad
contact info
Katelyn Rowe
Sidley Austin
contact info
Mohindra Rupram
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Jessica Karp Bansal
National Day Laborer Organizing Network
contact info
Marisol Ramirez
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Matthew Joseph Letten
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Matthew Waters Light
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Ahilan Thevanesan Arulanantham
Aclu Of Southern California
contact info
Jillian Rebecca Dent
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Sherika Blanc
Represented By
Nicole Marie Ryan
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Amanda Robin Farfel
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Sean Ashley Commons
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Alycia Ann Degen
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Jessica Johnson Fishfeld
Sidley Austin
contact info
Ryan M. Sandrock
Sidley Austin, LLP
contact info
William S. Freeman
Aclu Foundation Of Northern California
contact info
Andrew Brian Talai
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Emilou MacLean
National Day Laborer Organizing Network
contact info
Mark E. Haddad
contact info
Katelyn Rowe
Sidley Austin
contact info
Mohindra Rupram
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Jessica Karp Bansal
National Day Laborer Organizing Network
contact info
Marisol Ramirez
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Matthew Joseph Letten
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Matthew Waters Light
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Ahilan Thevanesan Arulanantham
Aclu Of Southern California
contact info
Jillian Rebecca Dent
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Maria Jose Ayala Flores
Represented By
Nicole Marie Ryan
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Amanda Robin Farfel
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Sean Ashley Commons
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Alycia Ann Degen
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Jessica Johnson Fishfeld
Sidley Austin
contact info
Ryan M. Sandrock
Sidley Austin, LLP
contact info
William S. Freeman
Aclu Foundation Of Northern California
contact info
Andrew Brian Talai
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Emilou MacLean
National Day Laborer Organizing Network
contact info
Mark E. Haddad
contact info
Katelyn Rowe
Sidley Austin
contact info
Mohindra Rupram
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Jessica Karp Bansal
National Day Laborer Organizing Network
contact info
Marisol Ramirez
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Matthew Joseph Letten
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Matthew Waters Light
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Ahilan Thevanesan Arulanantham
Aclu Of Southern California
contact info
Jillian Rebecca Dent
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Juan Eduardo Ayala Flores
Represented By
Nicole Marie Ryan
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Amanda Robin Farfel
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Sean Ashley Commons
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Alycia Ann Degen
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Jessica Johnson Fishfeld
Sidley Austin
contact info
Ryan M. Sandrock
Sidley Austin, LLP
contact info
William S. Freeman
Aclu Foundation Of Northern California
contact info
Andrew Brian Talai
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Emilou MacLean
National Day Laborer Organizing Network
contact info
Mark E. Haddad
contact info
Katelyn Rowe
Sidley Austin
contact info
Mohindra Rupram
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Jessica Karp Bansal
National Day Laborer Organizing Network
contact info
Marisol Ramirez
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Matthew Joseph Letten
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Matthew Waters Light
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Ahilan Thevanesan Arulanantham
Aclu Of Southern California
contact info
Jillian Rebecca Dent
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Imara Ampie
Represented By
Nicole Marie Ryan
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Amanda Robin Farfel
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Sean Ashley Commons
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Alycia Ann Degen
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Jessica Johnson Fishfeld
Sidley Austin
contact info
Ryan M. Sandrock
Sidley Austin, LLP
contact info
William S. Freeman
Aclu Foundation Of Northern California
contact info
Andrew Brian Talai
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Emilou MacLean
National Day Laborer Organizing Network
contact info
Mark E. Haddad
contact info
Katelyn Rowe
Sidley Austin
contact info
Mohindra Rupram
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Jessica Karp Bansal
National Day Laborer Organizing Network
contact info
Marisol Ramirez
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Matthew Joseph Letten
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Matthew Waters Light
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Ahilan Thevanesan Arulanantham
Aclu Of Southern California
contact info
Jillian Rebecca Dent
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Mazin Ahmed
Represented By
Nicole Marie Ryan
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Amanda Robin Farfel
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Sean Ashley Commons
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Alycia Ann Degen
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Jessica Johnson Fishfeld
Sidley Austin
contact info
Ryan M. Sandrock
Sidley Austin, LLP
contact info
William S. Freeman
Aclu Foundation Of Northern California
contact info
Andrew Brian Talai
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Emilou MacLean
National Day Laborer Organizing Network
contact info
Mark E. Haddad
contact info
Katelyn Rowe
Sidley Austin
contact info
Mohindra Rupram
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Jessica Karp Bansal
National Day Laborer Organizing Network
contact info
Marisol Ramirez
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Matthew Joseph Letten
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Matthew Waters Light
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Ahilan Thevanesan Arulanantham
Aclu Of Southern California
contact info
Jillian Rebecca Dent
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info

GPO Jun 25 2018
ORDER - ABBREVIATED ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying 20 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2018)
GPO Aug 06 2018
ORDER Denying 20 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/6/2018. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2018)
GPO Aug 13 2018
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 65 Motion for Preliminary Injunction Briefing Schedule filed by Mazin Ahmed, etc. Preliminary Injunction Hearing reset for 9/25/2018 01:30 PM. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/13/18. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2018)
GPO Aug 15 2018
ORDER denying 73 Defendants' Motion for Relief from Magistrate Judge's Discovery Order. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 08/15/2018. (emclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2018)
GPO Oct 03 2018
ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 120 Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Case Management Statement due by 10/19/2018. Further Case Management Conference set for 10/26/2018 10:30 AM. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2018)
GPO Dec 28 2023
ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 206 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. (emclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2023)
GPO Aug 15 2024
ORDER re 228 Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorneys' Fees. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/15/2024. (emclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2024)

Docket last updated: 05/04/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, April 24, 2025
260 260 2 pgs order Order Thu 04/24 11:00 AM
ORDER GRANTING 258 STIPULATION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/24/2025. (vla, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
259 259 misc Proposed Order Thu 04/24 10:15 AM
Proposed Order re258 Stipulation,, by Rilya Salary, National TPS Alliance, Mariela Gonzalez, Freddy Arape Rivas, Cecilia Gonzalez Herrera, Alba Purica Hernandez, E.R., M.H., Hendrina Vivas Castillo, Sherika Blanc, Imara Ampie, Mazin Ahmed, Hiwaida Elarabi, Crista Ramos, Cristina Morales, Benjamin Zepeda, Orlando Zepeda, Juan Eduardo Ayala Flores, Maria Jose Ayala Flores, Keshav Bhattarai, Sajjan Pandey, Sumnima Thapa, Donaldo Posadas Caceres, Sorayda Rodriguez Motino, Denis Molina Chavez, S.S. (A minor), G.D.P. (a minor), Elsy Yolanda Flores de Ayala, Hnaida Cenemat, Wilna Destin. (Arulanantham, Ahilan)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
258 258 misc Stipulation without Proposed Order Mon 04/21 2:00 PM
STIPULATION re 257 Order,, (JOINT STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME) filed by Rilya Salary, National TPS Alliance, Mariela Gonzalez, Freddy Arape Rivas, Cecilia Gonzalez Herrera, Alba Purica Hernandez, E.R., M.H., Hendrina Vivas Castillo, Sherika Blanc, Imara Ampie, Mazin Ahmed, Hiwaida Elarabi, Elaine C. Duke, Crista Ramos, Cristina Morales, Benjamin Zepeda, Orlando Zepeda, Juan Eduardo Ayala Flores, Maria Jose Ayala Flores, Keshav Bhattarai, Sajjan Pandey, Sumnima Thapa, Donaldo Posadas Caceres, Sorayda Rodriguez Motino, Denis Molina Chavez, S.S. (A minor), G.D.P. (a minor), Elsy Yolanda Flores de Ayala, Hnaida Cenemat, Wilna Destin. (Arulanantham, Ahilan)
Related: [-]