Carter v. Rudinplay, Inc.
Alabama Southern District Court | |
Judge: | William H Steele |
Referred: | Sonja F Bivins |
Case #: | 1:18-cv-00117 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgement |
Case Filed: | Mar 13, 2018 |
Terminated: | May 07, 2018 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 10, 2018 4:17 AM CDT |
Defendant
Rudinplay, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tonja B. Carter
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Tuesday, May 08, 2018 | ||
37 | 37
transfer
Case Transfer Confirmation
Tue 05/08 10:18 AM
***Case Transfer Confirmation. Case received and opened in Southern District of New York, Case Number 1:18-cv-04097. (tgw) |
|
Monday, May 07, 2018 | ||
36 | 36
19
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Order on Motion to Strike
Mon 05/07 3:32 PM
ORDER granting in part denying in part the13 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue. This action is transferred to the Southern District of New York. The29 Motion to Strike is moot. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 5/7/2018. (tgw) |
|
Tuesday, May 01, 2018 | ||
utility
Document Referred
Tue 05/01 8:56 AM
REFERRAL OF33 Reply to Response to Motion,34 Reply to Response to Motion,35 Notice of Action by the Southern District of New York to Judge Steele. (tgw) |
||
Monday, April 30, 2018 | ||
35 | 35
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 04/30 8:35 PM
NOTICE by Rudinplay, Inc. of Action by the Southern District of New York (Prater, Harlan) |
|
Att: 1 2 pgs Exhibit A - Order Setting Trial, | ||
Att: 2 20 pgs Exhibit B - Transcript of Hearing, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Scheduling Order | ||
34 | 34
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Mon 04/30 8:26 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion13 filed by Rudinplay, Inc.. (Prater, Harlan) |
|
Att: 1 Reply Declaration of Scott Rudin (with Exhibits A-C) | ||
33 | 33
17
pgs
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Mon 04/30 2:30 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion30 to Enjoin From Further Prosecuting Second-Filed Action filed by Tonja B. Carter. (Lembke, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 | ||
utility
Document Referred
Mon 04/30 9:14 AM
REFERRAL OF32 Response in Opposition to Motion to Judge Steele. (tgw) |
||
Friday, April 27, 2018 | ||
32 | 32
27
pgs
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Fri 04/27 11:45 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re30 Emergency MOTION Enjoin From Further Prosecuting Second-Filed Action filed by Rudinplay, Inc.. (Prater, Harlan) |
|
Att: 1 21 pgs Exhibit A - Declaration of Scott Rudin, | ||
Att: 2 3 pgs Exhibit B - Declaration of Scott Rudin, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Letter Agreement, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D - March 9, 2018 Letter, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Declaration of Jonathan Zavin, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F - Declaration of Jonathan Strauss, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit G - Declaration of Sara Slavin, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit H - SDNY Complaint (Part 1), | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit H - SDNY Complaint (Part 2), | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit H - SDNY Complaint (Part 3), | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit I - Proposed Order to Show Cause, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit J - Order to Show Cause, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit K - Rudinplay's Memorandum of Law, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit L - Motion for PHV Appearance, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit M - Carter's Opposition to Expedited Discovery | ||
Tuesday, April 24, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Motion Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 04/24 1:27 PM
Order re:30 Emergency MOTION Enjoin From Further Prosecuting Second-Filed Action filed by Tonja B. Carter. Responses due by 4/27/2018, Replies due by 4/30/2018. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 4/24/2018. (tgw) |
|
30 | 30
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 04/24 10:04 AM
Emergency MOTION Enjoin From Further Prosecuting Second-Filed Action by Tonja B. Carter. (Lembke, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 | ||
utility
Document Referred
Tue 04/24 8:49 AM
REFERRAL OF28 Response in Opposition to Motion, to Judge Steele. (tgw) |
||
utility
Motions Referred
Tue 04/24 8:50 AM
MOTIONS REFERRED:29 MOTION to Strike and Objection to Paragraphs 7, 8, and 9 of the Declaration of Stefan Schick to Judge Steele (tgw) |
||
Monday, April 23, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
motion
Strike
Mon 04/23 4:54 PM
MOTION to Strike and Objection to Paragraphs 7, 8, and 9 of the Declaration of Stefan Schick by Tonja B. Carter. (Lembke, Matthew) |
|
28 | 28
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Mon 04/23 4:50 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or, in the alternative, to Transfer filed by Tonja B. Carter. (Lembke, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 6, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 7, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 8 | ||
Tuesday, April 10, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 04/10 12:27 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting [Doc. 20] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Sarah Schacter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 04/10/2018. (ktw) |
|
26 | 26
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 04/10 12:26 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting [Doc. 19] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Sara Slavin. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 04/10/2018. (ktw) |
|
25 | 25
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 04/10 12:24 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting [Doc. 18] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Jonathan Neil Strauss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 04/10/2018. (ktw) |
|
24 | 24
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 04/10 12:21 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting [Doc. 17] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Jonathan Zavin. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 04/10/2018. (ktw) |
|
23 | 23
misc
Attorney Admission Letter
Tue 04/10 11:14 AM
Attorney Admission & ECF Registration Letter mailed to Jeffrey M. Anderson; Admission & Registration due within 7 days. (tgw) |
|
22 | 22
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Motion Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 04/10 10:45 AM
Order re:13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or, in the alternative, to Transfer. Responses due by 4/23/2018, Replies due by 4/30/2018. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 4/10/2018. (tgw) |
|
21 | 21
order
Order - Document NOTED
Tue 04/10 9:15 AM
Document endorsed NOTED by District Judge William H. Steele: Corporate Disclosure Statement14 filed by Rudinplay, Inc. (Steele, William) |
|
utility
Motions Referred
Tue 04/10 9:18 AM
MOTIONS REFERRED:13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or, in the alternative, to Transfer to Judge Steele (tgw) |
||
utility
Motions Referred
Tue 04/10 9:42 AM
MOTIONS REFERRED:17 MOTION for Jonathan Zavin to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 50, Receipt number 1128-2207750, Online Credit Card Payment.),18 MOTION for Jonathan Neil Strauss to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 50, Receipt number 1128-2207753, Online Credit Card Payment.),19 MOTION for Sara Slavin to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 50, Receipt number 1128-2207754, Online Credit Card Payment.) &20 MOTION for Sarah Schacter to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 50, Receipt number 1128-2207755, Online Credit Card Payment.) - Referred to Judge Sonja F. Bivins. (tgw) |
||
Monday, April 09, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 04/09 5:51 PM
MOTION for Sarah Schacter to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 50, Receipt number 1128-2207755, Online Credit Card Payment.) by Rudinplay, Inc.. (Schacter, Sarah) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Application for Admission | ||
19 | 19
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 04/09 5:48 PM
MOTION for Sara Slavin to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 50, Receipt number 1128-2207754, Online Credit Card Payment.) by Rudinplay, Inc.. (slavin, Sara) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Application for Admission | ||
18 | 18
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 04/09 5:45 PM
MOTION for Jonathan Neil Strauss to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 50, Receipt number 1128-2207753, Online Credit Card Payment.) by Rudinplay, Inc.. (Strauss, Jonathan) |
|
Att: 1 Errata A - Certificate of Good Standing, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Application for Admission | ||
17 | 17
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 04/09 5:41 PM
MOTION for Jonathan Zavin to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 50, Receipt number 1128-2207750, Online Credit Card Payment.) by Rudinplay, Inc.. (Zavin, Jonathan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Application for Admission | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 04/09 3:28 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by John Gordon Thompson, Jr on behalf of Rudinplay, Inc. (Thompson, John) |
|
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 04/09 3:25 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Paul Doss on behalf of Rudinplay, Inc. (Doss, Jeffrey) |
|
14 | 14
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 04/09 3:21 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Rudinplay, Inc.. (Prater, Harlan) |
|
13 | 13
motion
Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Mon 04/09 3:18 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or, in the alternative, to Transfer by Rudinplay, Inc.. (Prater, Harlan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Declaration of Scott Rudin, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Declaration of Stefan Schick | ||
Friday, April 06, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
cmp
Amended Complaint
Fri 04/06 4:57 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Rudinplay, Inc., filed by Tonja B. Carter. (Lembke, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
Tuesday, March 20, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 03/20 5:28 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tonja B. Carter. Rudinplay, Inc. served on 3/17/2018, answer due 4/9/2018 (Lembke, Matthew) |
|
Friday, March 16, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 03/16 1:51 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew H. Lembke on behalf of Tonja B. Carter (Lembke, Matthew) |
|
Wednesday, March 14, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Seal Document
Wed 03/14 1:05 PM
ORDER granting3 Motion to Seal Document. The Clerk is directed to maintain Exhibit B (Doc. 4) UNDER SEAL. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 3/14/2018. (tgw) |
|
8 | 8
order
Order - Document NOTED
Wed 03/14 9:41 AM
Document endorsed NOTED by District Judge William H. Steele: Corporate Disclosure Statement7 filed by Tonja B. Carter. (Steele, William) |
|
Tuesday, March 13, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 03/13 5:23 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiff Tonja B. Carter. (Lembke, Matthew) |
|
6 | 6
order
Service Order
Tue 03/13 2:13 PM
Service Order entered 3/13/2018. Plaintiff to notify the Court the action taken to effect service and the results thereof. Service order deadline set to 4/27/2018. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 3/13/2018. (tgw) |
|
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Tue 03/13 2:11 PM
Summons Issued as to Rudinplay, Inc.. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (tgw) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Sealed Document, Motion for Leave to File
Tue 03/13 9:49 AM
MOTION for leave to Seal Document by Tonja B. Carter. (Lembke, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Filing Proposed Summons
Tue 03/13 9:40 AM
NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Tonja B. Carter (Lembke, Matthew) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 03/13 9:39 AM
COMPLAINT against Rudinplay, Inc. ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 1128-2194355, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Tonja B. Carter. (Lembke, Matthew) (tgw) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
Att: 4 (3/13/2018) Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Motions Referred
Tue 03/13 2:08 PM
MOTIONS REFERRED:3 MOTION for leave to Seal Document & 4 Sealed Document to Judge Steele (tgw) |