Original Case: 5:09-cv-03434

Third Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:12-cv-04135
Typecivil / private / diversity
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Case Filed:Nov 06, 2012
Terminated:Aug 07, 2020
Last checked: Monday Aug 10, 2020 4:24 AM EDT
Defendant - Appellee
STRAUSSER ENTERPRISES INC
Represented By
Patrick C. Campbell Jr.
Montgomery McCracken Walker & Rhoads
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
GARY STRAUSSER
Represented By
Patrick C. Campbell Jr.
Montgomery McCracken Walker & Rhoads
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
REGENT INSURANCE CO
Represented By
Christina Capobianco
Fineman Krekstein & Harris
contact info
Michael S. Saltzman
Goldberg Segalla
contact info

GPO Aug 07 2020
NOT PRECEDENTIAL OPINION. Coram: MCKEE, BIBAS and COWEN, Circuit Judges. Total Pages: 16. Judge: COWEN Authoring.

Docket last updated: 08/10/2020 4:24 AM EDT
Tuesday, November 06, 2012
RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (CLW)
Related: [-]
CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Regent Insurance Company in District Court No. 5-09-cv-03434. (CLW)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Civil Case Docketed
Att: 2 5 pgs District_Court_Order_100112
Att: 3 34 pgs District_Court_Opinion_100112
Att: 4 1 pgs Caption
Att: 5 1 pgs Standing_Order_Excess_Pagination
Att: 6 3 pgs Case Opening Letter