Rees et al v. McKesson Corporation et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-45252 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Mar 14, 2018 |
Case in other court: | Illinois Southern, 3:18-cv-00511 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 5:19 PM EST |
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Indivior, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Ceonda Rees
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Deric Rees
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 4:36 PM EDT |
Wednesday, February 28, 2018 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-3491972.), filed by All Plaintiffs.(Clayborne, James) [Transferred from ilsd on 3/14/2018.] | |
2 | 2 EXHIBIT (Civil Cover Sheet) by All Plaintiffs. Exhibit to1 Complaint . (Clayborne, James) [Transferred from ilsd on 3/14/2018.] | |
3 | 3 NOTICE of Appearance by James F. Clayborne, Jr on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Clayborne, James) [Transferred from ilsd on 3/14/2018.] | |
Thursday, March 01, 2018 | ||
4 | 4 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge J. Phil Gilbert and Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly assigned. All future documents must bear case number 18-511-JPG-RJD. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (trb) [Transferred from ilsd on 3/14/2018.] | |
5 | 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel for all further proceedings. Judge J. Phil Gilbert no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 3/1/2018. (jdh) [Transferred from ilsd on 3/14/2018.] | |
Friday, March 09, 2018 | ||
6 | 6 Summons Requested. (Clayborne, James) [Transferred from ilsd on 3/14/2018.] | |
7 | 7 Summons Requested. (Clayborne, James) [Transferred from ilsd on 3/14/2018.] | |
8 | 8 Summons Requested. (Clayborne, James) [Transferred from ilsd on 3/14/2018.] | |
9 | 9 Summons Requested. (Clayborne, James) [Transferred from ilsd on 3/14/2018.] | |
10 | 10 Summons Requested. (Clayborne, James) [Transferred from ilsd on 3/14/2018.] | |
11 | 11 Summons Requested. (Clayborne, James) [Transferred from ilsd on 3/14/2018.] | |
12 | 12 Summons Requested. (Clayborne, James) [Transferred from ilsd on 3/14/2018.] | |
13 | 13 Summons Requested. (Clayborne, James) [Transferred from ilsd on 3/14/2018.] | |
14 | 14 Summons Requested. (Clayborne, James) [Transferred from ilsd on 3/14/2018.] | |
15 | 15 Summons Requested. (Clayborne, James) [Transferred from ilsd on 3/14/2018.] | |
16 | 16 Summons Requested. (Clayborne, James) [Transferred from ilsd on 3/14/2018.] | |
17 | 17 Summons Requested. (Clayborne, James) [Transferred from ilsd on 3/14/2018.] | |
18 | 18 Summons Requested. (Clayborne, James) [Transferred from ilsd on 3/14/2018.] | |
19 | 19 Summons Requested. (Clayborne, James) [Transferred from ilsd on 3/14/2018.] | |
20 | 20 Summons Requested. (Clayborne, James) [Transferred from ilsd on 3/14/2018.] | |
21 | 21 Summons Requested. (Clayborne, James) [Transferred from ilsd on 3/14/2018.] | |
22 | 22 Summons Requested. (Clayborne, James) [Transferred from ilsd on 3/14/2018.] | |
23 | 23 Summons Requested. (Clayborne, James) [Transferred from ilsd on 3/14/2018.] | |
24 | 24 Summons Requested. (Clayborne, James) [Transferred from ilsd on 3/14/2018.] | |
25 | 25 Summons Requested. (Clayborne, James) [Transferred from ilsd on 3/14/2018.] | |
26 | 26 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney David R. Barney, Jr $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-3502701 by on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Barney, David) [Transferred from ilsd on 3/14/2018.] | |
Monday, March 12, 2018 | ||
27 | 27 ORDER granting26 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney David R. Barneyon behalf of All Plaintiffs. (trb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. [Transferred from ilsd on 3/14/2018.] | |
28 | 28 Summons Issued as to All Defendants.(trb) [Transferred from ilsd on 3/14/2018.] | |
29 | 29 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Anthony D. Gray $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-3504033 by on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Gray, Anthony) [Transferred from ilsd on 3/14/2018.] | |
Tuesday, March 13, 2018 | ||
30 | 30 ORDER granting29 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Anthony D. Gray on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (dkd)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. [Transferred from ilsd on 3/14/2018.] | |
Wednesday, March 14, 2018 | ||
31 | 31 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER CTO-14 TRANSFERRING CASE TO OTHER DISTRICT: Case transferred to Ohio Northern MDL 2804 in re: National Prescription Opiate Litigation. (kdb) [Transferred from ilsd on 3/14/2018.] | |
32 | 32 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Illinois Southern. Case number 3:18-cv-00511. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |