County Commission of Putnam County v. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-45251 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 14, 2018 |
Case in other court: | West Virginia Southern, 3:18-cv-00350 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 5:19 PM EST |
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharmaceuticals, L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Manufacturing, L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
P.F. Laboratories, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Noramco Inc
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health 200, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health 110, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Allergan USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
County Commission of Putnam County
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 6:35 PM EDT |
Friday, February 23, 2018 | ||
CASE assigned to Judge David A. Faber. (klc) [Transferred from wvsd on 3/14/2018.] | ||
1 | 1 64 pgs COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # 0425-6263589. (jsa) [Transferred from wvsd on 3/14/2018.] | |
Att: 1 61 pgs Continuation of Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
Monday, February 26, 2018 | ||
2 | 2 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Allergan PLC, Allergan USA, Inc., AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health 110, LLC, Cardinal Health 200, LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC., Mallinckrodt PLC, McKesson Corporation, Noramco, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma Manufacturing, L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., Purdue Pharmaceuticals, L.P., TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., The P.F. Laboratories, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., re:1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (jsa) [Transferred from wvsd on 3/14/2018.] | |
Att: 1 summons as to Actavis Pharma, Inc., | ||
Att: 2 summons as to Allergan USA, Inc., | ||
Att: 3 summons as to Allergan PLC, | ||
Att: 4 summons as to AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, | ||
Att: 5 summons as to Cardinal Health 110, LLC, | ||
Att: 6 summons as to Cardinal Health 200, LLC, | ||
Att: 7 summons as to Cardinal Health, Inc., | ||
Att: 8 summons as to Cephalon, Inc., | ||
Att: 9 summons as to Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., | ||
Att: 10 summons as to Endo Health Solutions, Inc., | ||
Att: 11 summons as to Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., | ||
Att: 12 summons as to Johnson & Johnson, | ||
Att: 13 summons as to Mallinckrodt LLC, | ||
Att: 14 summons as to Mallinckrodt PLC, | ||
Att: 15 summons as to McKesson Corporation, | ||
Att: 16 summons as to Noramco, Inc., | ||
Att: 17 summons as to PAR Pharmaceutical, Inc., | ||
Att: 18 summons as to The P.F. Laboratories, Inc., | ||
Att: 19 summons as to Purdue Pharma Manufacturing, L.P., | ||
Att: 20 summons as to Purdue Pharma L.P., | ||
Att: 21 summons as to Purdue Pharmaceuticals, L.P., | ||
Att: 22 summons as to Purdue Pharma, Inc., | ||
Att: 23 summons as to The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., | ||
Att: 24 summons as to Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., | ||
Att: 25 summons as to Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., | ||
Att: 26 summons as to Watson Laboratories, Inc. | ||
3 | 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Aboulhosn. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (jsa) (Modified on 2/27/2018 to correct referral to Magistrate Judge Aboulhosn) (ts). [Transferred from wvsd on 3/14/2018.] | |
Wednesday, March 14, 2018 | ||
4 | 4 NOTIFICATION FROM JUDICIAL PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION re: Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-14), MDL 2804. (kp) [Transferred from wvsd on 3/14/2018.] | |
5 | 5 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-14) JUDICIAL PANEL ON MDL: certified copy from the Northern District of Ohio transferring this action to the USDC/NDO for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1407. Signed by Jeffery N. Luthi, Clerk of the Panel on 3/14/2018. (cc: attys) (kp) [Transferred from wvsd on 3/14/2018.] | |
6 | 6 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of West Virginia Southern. Case number 3:18-cv-00350. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |