Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Roy K Altman
Referred: Patrick M Hunt
Case #: 0:18-cv-60379
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause15:0053 Federal Trade Commission Act
Case Filed:Feb 20, 2018
Terminated:Jun 10, 2019
Last checked: Sunday Aug 19, 2018 4:57 AM EDT
Defendant
Scott Chandler
Represented By
David Joseph Braun
contact info
Defendant
Thomas Dluca
Represented By
Charles Woodward Throckmorton, V
Carlton Fields Jorden Burt, P.A.
contact info
Michael Domenic Padula
contact info
Defendant
Louis Gatto
Represented By
David Joseph Braun
contact info
Defendant
Eric Pinkston
Represented By
David DiPietro
Di Pietro Partners, LLP
contact info
Garnishee
Branch Banking and Trust Company
Deposit Operations P.O. Box 1489
Lumbeton, NC 28359
Plaintiff
Federal Trade Commission
Represented By
Susan E Arthur
Federal Trade Commission
contact info
Jason C. Moon
Federal Trade Commission
contact info
M. Hasan Aijaz
U.S. Federal Trade Commission
contact info


1. FTC files lawsuit against Bitcoin Funding Team and My7Network (cryptovest.com)
Submitted Mon 03/19/2018
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Wednesday, November 20, 2019
213 213 notice Notice (Other) Wed 11/20 10:44 AM
NOTICE by Federal Trade Commission Regarding Asset Freeze (Moon, Jason)
Related: [-]