Massachusetts District Court
Judge:F Dennis Saylor, IV
Case #: 1:18-cv-10510
Nature of Suit196 Contract - Franchise
Cause18:1836(b) Civil Action to Protect Trade Secrets
Case Filed:Mar 16, 2018
Terminated:Oct 17, 2018
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 12, 2018 4:36 AM EDT
Defendant
Glassdoor, Inc.
100 Shoreline Highway Building A
Mill Valley, CA 94941
Represented By
Jeffrey Jackson Pyle
Prince Lobel Tye LLP
contact info
Defendant
John Does 1-20
Plaintiff
Craft Beer Stellar, LLC
51 Leonard Street Cellar Floor
Belmont, MA 02478
Represented By
Russell A. Haverty
Reed And Giordano, P.A.
contact info
Philip M. Giordano
Reed & Giordano, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Wednesday, October 17, 2018
21 21 8 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Fri 11:25 AM
Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ORDER entered. AMENDED MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS(Halley, Taylor)
Related: [-]
20 20 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Thu 9:57 AM
Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ORDER entered. ORDER DISMISSING CASE(Halley, Taylor)
Related: [-]
19 19 8 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Thu 9:53 AM
Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered granting13 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Halley, Taylor)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 22, 2018
18 18 minutes Motion Hearing Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Fri 2:23 PM
Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: Motion Hearing held on 6/22/2018 re13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Glassdoor, Inc. Case called. Court heard argument on the motion. Court took the matter UNDER ADVISEMENT. (Court Reporter: Valerie OHara at vaohara@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: Giordano, Haverty, Pyle) (Pezzarossi, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 29, 2018
17 17 order Order Setting Hearing on Motion Tue 1:43 PM
Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM : Motion Hearing set for 6/22/2018 02:00 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV.(Pezzarossi, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 25, 2018
16 16 21 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Fri 4:30 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Certificate of Service filed by Craft Beer Stellar, LLC. (Giordano, Philip)
Related: [-]
15 15 respoth Withdrawal of Claim Fri 4:29 PM
Stipulation of Dismissal and WITHDRAWAL of Claim re10 Amended Complaint, Solely as to Count II Against Defendant Glasddor, Inc. Alone, with Certificate of Service by Craft Beer Stellar, LLC. (Giordano, Philip)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 11, 2018
14 14 18 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Fri 1:29 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Glassdoor, Inc.. (Pyle, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Fri 1:27 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Glassdoor, Inc..(Pyle, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 02, 2018
12 12 order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Wed 1:20 PM
Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered finding as moot7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Pezzarossi, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 27, 2018
11 11 3 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Fri 11:59 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Certificate of Service filed by Craft Beer Stellar, LLC. (Giordano, Philip)
Related: [-]
10 10 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 6:54 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT with Demand for Jury Trial, with Certificate of Service against All Defendants, filed by Craft Beer Stellar, LLC.(Giordano, Philip)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G
Monday, April 16, 2018
9 9 order Order Setting Hearing on Motion Mon 10:48 AM
Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM : Motion Hearing set for 5/11/2018 11:00 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV.(Pezzarossi, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 13, 2018
8 8 13 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Fri 2:01 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Glassdoor, Inc.. (Pyle, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Fri 2:00 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Glassdoor, Inc..(Pyle, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 1:58 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Glassdoor, Inc.. (Pyle, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 1:56 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Jackson Pyle on behalf of Glassdoor, Inc. (Pyle, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 26, 2018
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 3:25 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed Glassdoor, Inc. served on 3/26/2018, answer due 4/16/2018. (Giordano, Philip)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 19, 2018
3 3 service Summons Issued Mon 1:39 PM
Summons Issued as to Glassdoor, Inc., John Does 1-20. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (McKillop, Matthew)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Case Assignment Mon 1:06 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Coppola, Katelyn)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 16, 2018
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 9:05 PM
COMPLAINT with Demand for Jury Trial against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7053734 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Craft Beer Stellar, LLC.(Giordano, Philip)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G,
Att: 8 Civil Cover Sheet JS044-1,
Att: 9 Supplement Category Sheet