Harding Enterprises, LLC
Missouri Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Barry S Schermer |
Case #: | 1:18-bk-10219 |
Case Filed: | Mar 19, 2018 |
Terminated: | Sep 26, 2022 |
Debtor
Harding Enterprises, LLC
2312 Orr Rd
Poplar Bluff, MO 63901-2538 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
Office of US Trustee
111 S Tenth St, Ste 6.353
St. Louis, MO 63102 |
Docket last updated: 03/20/2018 12:02 AM CDT |
Monday, March 19, 2018 | ||
1 | 1
49
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition - Attorney (Chapter 7)
Mon 03/19 4:33 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals, Schedules and Statements . Fee Amount $335 Filed by Harding Enterprises, LLC Government Proof of Claim due by 09/17/2018. (Jewel, Deidre) |
|
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Mon 03/19 4:35 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) 18-10219 [misc,volp7a] ( 335.00). Receipt number 14801066, amount $ 335.00. (U.S. Treasury) |