Rutherford County, Tennessee v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-45258 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 19, 2018 |
Case in other court: | Tennessee Middle, 3:18-cv-00238 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 5:21 PM EST |
Defendant
Specgx, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Rhodes Pharmaceuticals, L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Beverly Sackler
|
|
Defendant
David A. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Jonathan D. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Kathe A. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Mortimer D.A. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Richard S. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Theresa Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc. f/k/a Par Pharmaceutical Holdings, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
THE PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY, INC.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
The Kroger Co.
|
|
Defendant
Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family
|
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. a/k/a Walgreen Co.
|
|
Defendant
Walmart Inc. f/k/a Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Insys Therapeutics, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Ilene Sackler Lefcourt
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Morris Dickson Co.
|
|
Defendant
Murfreesboro Pharmaceutical Nursing Supply, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
781 Chestnut Ridge Road
Morgantown, WV 26505 |
|
Defendant
Noramco Inc
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Rutherford County, Tennessee
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 5:47 PM EDT |
Monday, February 26, 2018 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, LLC, Allergan PLC, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Insys Therapeutics, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt Plc,, McKesson Corporation, Noramco, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2619103), filed by Rutherford County, Tennessee.(mg) [Transferred from tnmd on 3/19/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet | ||
2 | 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (mg) [Transferred from tnmd on 3/19/2018.] | |
3 | 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg) [Transferred from tnmd on 3/19/2018.] | |
Tuesday, February 27, 2018 | ||
TN State Bar status verified as active for Mark P. Chalos, Kenneth S. Byrd, and John Tate Spragens. (mg) [Transferred from tnmd on 3/19/2018.] | ||
CA State Bar status verified as active for Elizabeth J. Cabraser, and Bruce W. Leppla. (mg) [Transferred from tnmd on 3/19/2018.] | ||
NY State Bar status verified as active for Steven E. Fineman, and Paulina do Amaral. (mg) [Transferred from tnmd on 3/19/2018.] | ||
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Elizabeth J. Cabraser, Bruce W. Leppla, Steven E. Fineman, Paulina do Amaral: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court where admitted, and pay a fee of $75.00 (LR 83.01(d)). PHV due by 3/20/2018. (mg) [Transferred from tnmd on 3/19/2018.] | ||
4 | 4 Summons issued as to All Defendants. Service copies will be picked up by counsel. (mg) [Transferred from tnmd on 3/19/2018.] | |
5 | 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/30/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 764 before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (mg) [Transferred from tnmd on 3/19/2018.] | |
6 | 6 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01. Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01(d)(5). Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 2/27/2018. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (mg) [Transferred from tnmd on 3/19/2018.] | |
Wednesday, March 14, 2018 | ||
7 | 7 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO 14) filed by the UNITED STATES JUDICIAL PANEL on MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION IN RE: NATIONAL PRESCRIPTION OPIATE LITIGATION MDL No. 2804, transferring the case to the ND of Ohio. This order does not become effective until it is filed in the Office of the Clerk of the United States District Court for the Northern District of Ohio. (af) [Transferred from tnmd on 3/19/2018.] | |
8 | 8 CERTIFIED COPY of CTO 14 received from the ND of Ohio. (Case is ready for closing/transfer; Proposed order submitted to chambers). (af) [Transferred from tnmd on 3/19/2018.] | |
Monday, March 19, 2018 | ||
9 | 9 ORDER: Pursuant to the Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-14) of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, Docket No. 2804, this case is hereby transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Ohio for coordinated or consolidated proceedings. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case and electronically transmit the record to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Ohio. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 3/19/2018. (mg) [Transferred from tnmd on 3/19/2018.] | |
10 | 10 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Tennessee Middle. Case number 3:18-cv-00238. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |