California Northern District Court
Judge:Edward J Davila
Referred: Nathanael M Cousins
Case #: 3:18-cv-01725
Nature of Suit850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Case Filed:Mar 20, 2018
Last checked: Sunday Sep 16, 2018 1:41 AM PDT
Defendant
Facebook, Inc.
Represented By
Brian Michael Lutz
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Paul J. Collins
Gibson, Dunn, Crutcher LLP
contact info
Kristin A. Linsley, Esq.
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Orin Snyder
Gibson Dunn And Crutcher
contact info
Joshua Seth Lipshutz
Gibson, Dunn And Crutcher LLP
contact info
Defendant
David M. Wehner
Represented By
Orin Snyder
Gibson Dunn And Crutcher
contact info
Defendant
Mark E. Zuckerberg
Represented By
Orin Snyder
Gibson Dunn And Crutcher
contact info
Defendant
Sheryl K. Sandberg
Represented By
Orin Snyder
Gibson Dunn And Crutcher
contact info
Interested Party
Jeremiah F. Hallisey
Represented By
Mark Cotton Molumphy
Cotchett, Pitre & Mccarthy LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Natalie Ocegueda
Represented By
Francis A. Bottini, Jr.
Bottini & Bottini, Inc.
contact info
Movant
Michael P. Carfagna
Represented By
Robert Vincent Prongay
Glancy Prongay & Murray LLP
contact info
Movant
Bilkish Patel
Represented By
Jennifer Pafiti
Pomerantz LLP
contact info
Jeremy A Lieberman
Pomerantz LLP
contact info
Movant
Phoenix Insurance Company Ltd.
Represented By
Jennifer Pafiti
Pomerantz LLP
contact info
Jeremy A Lieberman
Pomerantz LLP
contact info
Movant
Public Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi
Represented By
Kate Whitman Aufses
Bernstein Litowitz Berger Grossmann LLP
contact info
Jeremy P. Robinson
Bernstein Litowitz Berger Grossmann LLP
contact info
Avi Josefson
Bernstein Litowitz Berger Grossmann LLP
contact info
John Christopher Browne
Bernstein Litowitz Berger Grossman LLP
contact info
Gerald H. Silk
Bernstein Litowitz Berger Grossmann LLP
contact info
David Ronald Stickney
Bernstein, Litowitz, Berger & Grossmann
contact info
Michael D. Blatchley
Bernstein Litowitz Berger Grossmann LLP
contact info
Movant
Engin Taner
Represented By
Jennifer Pafiti
Pomerantz LLP
contact info
Jeremy A Lieberman
Pomerantz LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Fan Yuan
Represented By
Jennifer Pafiti
Pomerantz LLP
contact info
J Alexander Hood, II
Pomerantz LLP
contact info
Jeremy A Lieberman
Pomerantz LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Amalgamated Bank
Represented By
Dennis J. Herman
Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP
contact info
Michael Albert
Robbins Geller Rudman And Dowd LLP
contact info
Danielle Suzanne Myers
Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP
contact info
Jason Cassidy Davis
Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP
contact info
Kenneth Joseph Black
Robbins Geller Rudman And Dowd LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Ernestine Bennett
Represented By
Jason Cassidy Davis
Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP
contact info


1. Facebook Sued by Investors Over Voter-Profile Harvesting (bloomberg.com)
Submitted Wed 03/21/2018
Docket last updated: 05/06/2021 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, March 20, 2018
2 2 2 pgs misc Proposed Summons Tue 03/20 2:02 PM
Proposed Summons. (Pafiti, Jennifer) (Filed on 3/20/2018)
Related: [-]
1 1 26 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 03/20 2:01 PM
COMPLAINT against Facebook, Inc., David M. Wehner, Mark E. Zuckerberg ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12203094.). Filed byFan Yuan.(Pafiti, Jennifer) (Filed on 3/20/2018)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification,
Att: 2 Schedule A,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet