Walker v. Commissioner of Social Security
New York Western District Court | |
Judge: | Michael A Telesca |
Case #: | 6:18-cv-06228 |
Nature of Suit | 863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:205 Denial Social Security Benefits |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jun 15, 2018 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Wednesday, July 18, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
order
Stipulation and Order ~Util - Terminate Motions
Wed 07/18 7:44 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER granting attorney fees. Motions terminated:9 MOTION for Attorney Fees Under the Equal Access to Justice Act filed by Emily Victoria Walker.. Signed by Hon. Michael A. Telesca on 7/18/18. (JMC) |
|
Tuesday, July 17, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Affidavit
Tue 07/17 10:21 AM
AFFIDAVIT re9 MOTION for Attorney Fees Under the Equal Access to Justice Act Assignment of EAJA fees to Plaintiff's counsel by Emily Victoria Walker. (Goldstein, Justin) |
|
Monday, July 16, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Attorney Fees
Mon 07/16 8:25 PM
MOTION for Attorney Fees Under the Equal Access to Justice Act by Emily Victoria Walker.(Goldstein, Justin) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Affirmation of Justin Goldstein | ||
Friday, June 15, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
order
Judgment
Fri 06/15 9:26 AM
JUDGMENT signed by Mary C. Loewenguth, Clerk of Court on 6/15/2018. (BK) |
|
Thursday, June 14, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
order
Stipulation and Order
Thu 06/14 1:43 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER for Remand for further administrative proceedings. (Clerk to close case.). Signed by Hon. Michael A. Telesca on 6/14/18. (JMC) |
|
Friday, June 01, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
service
Affidavit of Service
Fri 06/01 10:38 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint served on Commissioner of Social Security on 05/30/2018, filed by Emily Victoria Walker. (Hiller, Kenneth) |
|
Wednesday, March 28, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 03/28 1:28 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Parkerson Peck on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Peck, Jason) |
|
Tuesday, March 27, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Tue 03/27 9:53 AM
Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (BK) |
|
Att: 1 Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Summons | ||
Monday, March 26, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 03/26 1:09 PM
ORDER granting2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Hon. Michael A. Telesca on 3/26/18. (JMC) |
|
Tuesday, March 20, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 03/20 11:50 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Emily Victoria Walker.(Hiller, Kenneth) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 03/20 11:50 AM
COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Emily Victoria Walker.(Hiller, Kenneth) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 4 Summons, | ||
Att: 5 Summons, | ||
Att: 6 Summons | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 03/20 2:04 PM
Case assigned to Hon. Michael A. Telesca. Notification to chambers of on-line civil case opening. (JHF) |
||
notice
Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge
Tue 03/20 2:05 PM
Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (JHF) |
||
utility
Social Security Standby Magistrate
Tue 03/20 2:06 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of case assignment. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Feldman. (JHF) |