Chatham County, Georgia v. Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-45267 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Medical Malpractice |
Case Filed: | Mar 22, 2018 |
Case in other court: | Georgia Southern, 4:18-cv-00042 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 5:21 PM EST |
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
The Purdue Frederick Company Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Noramco Inc
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Chatham County, Georgia
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 5:40 PM EDT |
Tuesday, March 06, 2018 | ||
1 | 1 44 pgs COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Chatham County, Georgia. Opiate Litigation MDL No. 2804(jrb) Modified on 3/7/2018 (jrb). [Transferred from gasd on 3/22/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Cover Sheet | ||
Wednesday, March 07, 2018 | ||
Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 113J-2329437. (jrb) [Transferred from gasd on 3/22/2018.] | ||
2 | 2 General ORDER: Report of 26(f) Planning Meeting. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 3/7/18. (jrb) [Transferred from gasd on 3/22/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Litigant's Bill of Rights | ||
Tuesday, March 20, 2018 | ||
3 | 3 Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-15) MDL No. 2804. (jrb) [Transferred from gasd on 3/22/2018.] | |
Thursday, March 22, 2018 | ||
4 | 4 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Georgia Southern. Case number 4:18-cv-00042. Electronic file, copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |