Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-22432

Tennessee Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:David S Kennedy
Case #: 2:18-ap-00061
Nature of Suit11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
Case Filed:Mar 22, 2018
Terminated:Oct 09, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
FedEx Credit Union
2731 Nonconnah Blvd.
Memphis, TN 38132
Represented By
FedEx Credit Union
contact info
Plaintiff
Nickki DeSarzant
3235 Kinderhill Lane
Germantown, TN 38138
Represented By
Gary L. Jewel
Gary L. Jewel
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Tuesday, October 09, 2018
court Close Adversary Case Tue 10/09 12:56 PM
Adversary Case 2:18-ap-61 Closed (djw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 20, 2018
utility Order Past Due Wed 06/20 12:04 PM
ORDER PAST DUE: Consent Order was to have been previously submitted by Gary Jewel Related [+] (djw)
Related: [-] 5 Amended/Corrected Complaint by Gary L. Jewel on behalf of Nickki DeSarzant against FedEx Credit Union. (Jewel, Gary)
Tuesday, May 22, 2018
court Minutes - Clerk's Office Tue 05/22 7:34 PM
Minutes; Disposition: CONSENT ORDER. Order To Be Filed By: Gary L. Jewel Related [+] Order due by 6/5/2018. (tll)
Related: [-] 5 Amended/Corrected Complaint by Gary L. Jewel on behalf of Nickki DeSarzant against Nickki DeSarzant. (Jewel, Gary)
court Minutes - Clerk's Office Tue 05/22 7:34 PM
Minutes; Disposition: CONSENT ORDER. Order To Be Filed By: Gary L. Jewel Related [+] Order due by 6/5/2018. (tll)
Related: [-] 9 Objection to Filed by Defendant FedEx Credit Union (related document(s)5 Amended/Corrected Complaint by Gary L. Jewel on behalf of Nickki DeSarzant against Nickki DeSarzant. (Jewel, Gary) ). (Drexler, David)
Thursday, April 05, 2018
utility Update Hearing Deadlines - gen hearing,pretrial conf,show cause,trial,confhrg Thu 04/05 10:42 AM
Update Hearing Deadlines Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 5/22/2018 at 10:30 AM at Room 945, Memphis, TN. (tll)
Related: [-] 9 Objection to Filed by Defendant FedEx Credit Union (related document(s)5 Amended/Corrected Complaint by Gary L. Jewel on behalf of Nickki DeSarzant against Nickki DeSarzant. (Jewel, Gary) ). (Drexler, David)
Wednesday, April 04, 2018
9 9 answer Objection Wed 04/04 4:32 PM
Objection to Filed by Defendant FedEx Credit Union Related [+]. (Drexler, David)
Related: [-] 5 Amended/Corrected Complaint by Gary L. Jewel on behalf of Nickki DeSarzant against Nickki DeSarzant. (Jewel, Gary)
Saturday, March 31, 2018
8 8 court BNC Certificate Of Mailing Sun 04/01 12:29 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 03/31/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference (RE:Amended Complaint). (related document(s)5 Amended/Corrected Complaint by Gary L. Jewel on behalf of Nickki DeSarzant against Nickki DeSarzant. (Jewel, Gary) ) Pre-Trial Conference set for 5/22/2018 at 10:30 AM at Room 945, Memphis, TN. (tll)
Thursday, March 29, 2018
7 7 court Summons And Notice Of Pretrial Conference Thu 03/29 12:45 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Related [+]. Pre-Trial Conference set for 5/22/2018 at 10:30 AM at Room 945, Memphis, TN. (tll)
Related: [-] Amended Complaint5 Amended/Corrected Complaint by Gary L. Jewel on behalf of Nickki DeSarzant against Nickki DeSarzant. (Jewel, Gary)
6 6 court Summons And Notice Of Pretrial Conference Thu 03/29 12:43 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Related [+]. Pre-Trial Conference set for 5/22/2018 at 10:30 AM at Room 945, Memphis, TN. (tll)
Related: [-] Amended Complaint5 Amended/Corrected Complaint by Gary L. Jewel on behalf of Nickki DeSarzant against Nickki DeSarzant. (Jewel, Gary)
Wednesday, March 28, 2018
5 5 cmp Amended/Corrected Complaint Wed 03/28 9:37 AM
Amended/Corrected Complaint by Gary L. Jewel on behalf of Nickki DeSarzant against Nickki DeSarzant. (Jewel, Gary)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 26, 2018
utility Corrective Entry (Filer Must Take Further Action) Mon 03/26 9:05 AM
Request For Correction By Filer: Related [+] (djw)
Related: [-] 4 THIS ENTRY IS VOID. PDF DOES NOT REFLECT ADVERSARY CASE NUMBER. Amended/Corrected Complaint by Gary L. Jewel on behalf of Nickki DeSarzant against Nickki DeSarzant. (Jewel, Gary) Modified on 3/26/2018 .
Friday, March 23, 2018
4 4 cmp Amended/Corrected Complaint Fri 03/23 10:16 AM
Amended/Corrected Complaint by Gary L. Jewel on behalf of Nickki DeSarzant against Nickki DeSarzant. (Jewel, Gary)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 22, 2018
3 3 cmp Amended/Corrected Complaint Thu 03/22 4:48 PM
THIS ENTRY IS VOID. PDF AND DOCKET ENTRY DOES NOT MATCH (PDF DOES NOT STATE "AMENDED"). Amended/Corrected Complaint by Gary L. Jewel on behalf of Nickki DeSarzant against Nickki DeSarzant. (Jewel, Gary) Modified on 3/23/2018 (Williams, Doris)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet Thu 03/22 4:28 PM
Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet Filed by Gary L. Jewel on behalf of Plaintiff Nickki DeSarzant. (Jewel, Gary)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 03/22 4:21 PM
Adversary case 18-00061 (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)): Complaint by Nickki DeSarzant against FedEx Credit Union. (Jewel, Gary)
Related: [-]