Town of Butler, Alabama v. Endo Health Solutions Inc. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-45216 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Feb 23, 2018 |
Case in other court: | Alabama Southern, 1:18-cv-00060 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 5:22 PM EST |
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
The Harvard Drug Group, L.L.C.
|
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
Sandoz Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
781 Chestnut Ridge Road
Morgantown, WV 26505 |
|
Defendant
Indivior Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Wal-Mart Stores Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Allergan Finance LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Town of Butler, Alabama
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10/08/2019 2:32 PM EDT |
Wednesday, February 07, 2018 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc. from Circuit Court of Choctaw County, Alabama, case number CV-2018-90009. ( Filing fee $ 400, Receipt number 1128-2181297, Online Credit Card Payment.), filed by Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc.. (Bains, Lee) (tgw). [Transferred from alsd on 2/23/2018.] | |
Att: 1 75 pgs Exhibit 1 - Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - State Court Docket and File | ||
Att: 3 (2/9/2018) Civil Cover Sheet | ||
2 | 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Endo International plc, Endo International plc identifying Corporate Parent Endo International plc for Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc... [Transferred from alsd on 2/23/2018.] | |
Friday, February 09, 2018 | ||
3 | 3 Document endorsed NOTED by District Judge William H. Steele: Corporate Disclosure Statement2 filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Steele, William) [Transferred from alsd on 2/23/2018.] | |
Tuesday, February 13, 2018 | ||
4 | 4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply pleadings pending Transfer to MDL No. 2804 by McKesson Corporation. (Prater, Harlan) [Transferred from alsd on 2/23/2018.] | |
Wednesday, February 14, 2018 | ||
MOTIONS REFERRED:4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply pleadings pending Transfer to MDL No. 2804 to Judge Steele (tgw) [Transferred from alsd on 2/23/2018.] | ||
5 | 5 Order granting4 MOTION to extend deadline to respond to the complaint pending Transfer to MDL No. 2804. The deadline to answer the complaint is STAYED. McKesson is ordered to notify the Court when it seeks transfer to MDL by 2/28/2018 or show cause for failure to seek transfer. McKesson is ordered to update the Court of developments of the transfer as they occur. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 2/14/2018. (tgw) [Transferred from alsd on 2/23/2018.] | |
Friday, February 16, 2018 | ||
6 | 6 NOTICE by McKesson Corporation re5 Order, Set Deadlines, Terminate Motions,,, of Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-10) (Prater, Harlan) [Transferred from alsd on 2/23/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A | ||
Monday, February 19, 2018 | ||
7 | 7 Document endorsed NOTED by District Judge William H. Steele: Notice of Conditional Transfer6 filed by McKesson Corporation. (Steele, William) [Transferred from alsd on 2/23/2018.] | |
Friday, February 23, 2018 | ||
8 | 8 Conditional Transfer Order (MDL) from Northern District of Ohio requesting transfer of action. Entire case file sent to requesting District. Case Closed. (tgw) [Transferred from alsd on 2/23/2018.] | |
9 | 9 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Alabama Southern. Case number 1:18-cv-00060. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |