Clarke County, Mississippi v. Purdue Pharma, L.P. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-45278 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Mar 24, 2018 |
Case in other court: | Mississippi Southern, 2:18-cv-00036 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 5:23 PM EST |
Defendant
Sandoz Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Mallinkrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
781 Chestnut Ridge Road
Morgantown, WV 26505 |
|
Defendant
Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Mallinkrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Smith Drug Company
|
|
Defendant
Specgx, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
The Purdue Frederick Company
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp.
|
|
Defendant
Does 1-100, Inclusive
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Indivior, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Insys Therapeutics, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Plaintiff
Clarke County, Mississippi
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 4:38 PM EDT |
Wednesday, March 07, 2018 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Allergan PLC, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Does 1-100, Inclusive, Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Insys Therapeutics, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinkrodt LLC, Mallinkrodt PLC, McKesson Corporation, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma, Inc., Purdue Pharma, L.P., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-3653804), filed by Clarke County, Mississippi.(LDR) [Transferred from mssd on 3/24/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
2 | 2 Summons Issued as to Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Allergan PLC, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Insys Therapeutics, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinkrodt LLC, Mallinkrodt PLC, McKesson Corporation, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma, Inc., Purdue Pharma, L.P., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (LDR) [Transferred from mssd on 3/24/2018.] | |
3 | 3 Letter sent to MDL Clerk with docket entries and complaint. (LDR) [Transferred from mssd on 3/24/2018.] | |
Thursday, March 15, 2018 | ||
4 | 4 ORDER Staying Telephonic Case Management Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on March 15, 2018 (KPM) [Transferred from mssd on 3/24/2018.] | |
Tuesday, March 20, 2018 | ||
5 | 5 COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER transferring case to the Northern District of Ohio. (LDR) [Transferred from mssd on 3/24/2018.] | |
6 | 6 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER: transferring this case to the Northern District of Ohio and assigned to the Honorable Dan A. Polster. (LDR) [Transferred from mssd on 3/24/2018.] | |
Saturday, March 24, 2018 | ||
7 | 7 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Mississippi Southern. Case number 2:18-cv-00036. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |