City of Brunswick, Georgia v. Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-45270 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Mar 24, 2018 |
Case in other court: | Georgia Southern, 2:18-cv-00023 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 5:23 PM EST |
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
The Purdue Frederick Company Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Noramco Inc
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
City of Brunswick, Georgia
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/20/2019 11:19 AM EDT |
Tuesday, March 06, 2018 | ||
Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 113J-2329455. (ca) [Transferred from gasd on 3/24/2018.] | ||
1 | 1 44 pgs COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by City of Brunswick, Georgia.(ca) [Transferred from gasd on 3/24/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
2 | 2 RULE 26 INSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on 3/6/2018. (ca) [Transferred from gasd on 3/24/2018.] | |
Tuesday, March 20, 2018 | ||
3 | 3 CONDITIONAL TRANSDER ORDER re1 Complaint filed by City of Brunswick, Georgia. Signed by Jeffery N. Luthi, Clerk of the Panel on 3/20/2018. (ca) [Transferred from gasd on 3/24/2018.] | |
Saturday, March 24, 2018 | ||
4 | 4 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Georgia Southern. Case number 2:18-cv-00023. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |