Scott County, Tennessee v. Purdue Pharma LP et al (
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-45273 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 24, 2018 |
Case in other court: | Tennessee Eastern, 3:18-cv-00083 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 5:23 PM EST |
Defendant
Mortimer D.A. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc. f/k/a Par Pharmaceutical Holdings, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Rhodes Pharmaceuticals, L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Beverly Sackler
|
|
Defendant
David A. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Jonathan D. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Kathe A. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Ortho McNeil Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Richard S. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Theresa Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Specgx, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Teva Phamaceutical Industries Ltd
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family
|
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. a/k/a Walgreen Co.
|
|
Defendant
Walmart Inc. f/k/a Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Insys Therapeutics, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
H.D. Smith, LLC d/b/a H.D. Smith, f/k/a H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Company
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Ilene Sackler Lefcourt
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Morris Dickson Co.
|
|
Defendant
Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
781 Chestnut Ridge Road
Morgantown, WV 26505 |
|
Defendant
Noramco Inc
|
|
Plaintiff
Scott County, Tennessee
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 7:46 PM EDT |
Friday, March 02, 2018 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3617165.), filed by Scott County, Tennessee.(Byrd, Kenneth) [Transferred from tned on 3/24/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Other Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons Actavis LLC, | ||
Att: 3 Summons Actavis Pharma, Inc., | ||
Att: 4 Summons Allergan PLC, | ||
Att: 5 Summons Americsource Bergen Drug Corporation, | ||
Att: 6 Summons Cardinal Health, Inc., | ||
Att: 7 Summons Cephalon, Inc., | ||
Att: 8 Summons Endo Health Solutions, Inc., | ||
Att: 9 Summons Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., | ||
Att: 10 Summons Insys Therapeutics, Inc., | ||
Att: 11 Summons Johnson & Johnson, | ||
Att: 12 Summons Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., | ||
Att: 13 Summons Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., | ||
Att: 14 Summons Mallinckrodt LLC, | ||
Att: 15 Summons Mallinckrodt PLC, | ||
Att: 16 Summons McKesson Corporation, | ||
Att: 17 Summons Noramco, Inc., | ||
Att: 18 Summons Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., | ||
Att: 19 Summons The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., | ||
Att: 20 Summons Purdue Pharma, Inc., | ||
Att: 21 Summons Purdue Pharma, LP, | ||
Att: 22 Summons Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd, | ||
Att: 23 Summons Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., | ||
Att: 24 Summons Watson Laboratories, Inc., | ||
Att: 25 Summons Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. | ||
Saturday, March 03, 2018 | ||
2 | 2 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac). Attorneys, John T. Spragens, Elizabeth J. Cabraser, Bruce W. Leppla, Steven E. Fineman,Paulina do Amaral are not admitted (See LR 83.5). This matter will be referred to a magistrate judge if a pro hac motion is not filed within 15 days of this Notice. A form motion can be found here: http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/docs/pro_hac_vice.pdf.(BDG, )Notices mailed to attorneys. [Transferred from tned on 3/24/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Notice, | ||
Att: 2 Notice | ||
Monday, March 05, 2018 | ||
3 | 3 Summons Issued as to Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma. Inc., Allergan PLC, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc, Cephalon, Inc, Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Insys Therapeutics, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, McKesson Corporation, Noramco, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals,Inc., Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma LP, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc, Teva Pharmeaceutical Industries Ltd., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (BDG, ) [Transferred from tned on 3/24/2018.] | |
4 | 4 Administrative Notice to Counsel, Attorney, Andrea T McKellar, is not registered for CM/ECF. Please register for CM/ECF. Requirements due by 3/12/2018 . (BDG, ) Notice mailed to McKellar. [Transferred from tned on 3/24/2018.] | |
Tuesday, March 06, 2018 | ||
District Judge J Ronnie Greer and Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton added. (ABF) [Transferred from tned on 3/24/2018.] | ||
5 | 5 ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.2(d)(3), the undersigned finds that the above-captioned case is related to Campbell County, Tennessee v. Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, et al., No. 3:18-CV-06. Because the first of these cases was assigned to District Judge J. Ronnie Greer and Magistrate Judge H. Bruce Guyton, this case will also be assigned to District Judge J. Ronnie Greer and Magistrate Judge H. Bruce Guyton. However, consolidation is not ordered.Signed by Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton on 3/6/18. (ABF) [Transferred from tned on 3/24/2018.] | |
Friday, March 09, 2018 | ||
6 | 6 Order Governing Depositions.Signed by Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton on 3/9/2018. (BDG, ) [Transferred from tned on 3/24/2018.] | |
7 | 7 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss.Signed by Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton on 3/9/2018. (BDG, ) [Transferred from tned on 3/24/2018.] | |
8 | 8 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information.Signed by Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton on 3/9/2018. (BDG, ) [Transferred from tned on 3/24/2018.] | |
Friday, March 16, 2018 | ||
Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Bruce W. Leppla ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3628344.) filed by Scott County, Tennessee, 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John T. Spragens ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3628372.) filed by Scott County, Tennessee, 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Paulina do Amaral ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3628363.) filed by Scott County, Tennessee, 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Elizabeth J. Cabraser ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3628333.) filed by Scott County, Tennessee, 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Steven E. Fineman ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3628357.) filed by Scott County, Tennessee (ABF) [Transferred from tned on 3/24/2018.] | ||
9 | 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Elizabeth J. Cabraser ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3628333.) by Scott County, Tennessee.(Chalos, Mark) [Transferred from tned on 3/24/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Other certificate of good standing, | ||
Att: 2 Other certificate of service | ||
10 | 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Bruce W. Leppla ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3628344.) by Scott County, Tennessee.(Chalos, Mark) [Transferred from tned on 3/24/2018.] | |
Att: 1 certificate of good standing, | ||
Att: 2 certificate of service | ||
11 | 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Steven E. Fineman ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3628357.) by Scott County, Tennessee.(Chalos, Mark) [Transferred from tned on 3/24/2018.] | |
Att: 1 certificate of good standing, | ||
Att: 2 certificate of service | ||
12 | 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Paulina do Amaral ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3628363.) by Scott County, Tennessee.(Chalos, Mark) [Transferred from tned on 3/24/2018.] | |
Att: 1 certificate of good standing, | ||
Att: 2 certificate of service | ||
13 | 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John T. Spragens ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3628372.) by Scott County, Tennessee.(Chalos, Mark) [Transferred from tned on 3/24/2018.] | |
Att: 1 certificate of good standing, | ||
Att: 2 certificate of service | ||
14 | 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scott County, Tennessee. Actavis Pharma. Inc. served on 3/8/2018. (Chalos, Mark) [Transferred from tned on 3/24/2018.] | |
15 | 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scott County, Tennessee. McKesson Corporation served on 3/8/2018. (Chalos, Mark) [Transferred from tned on 3/24/2018.] | |
Wednesday, March 21, 2018 | ||
Case transferred to District of Northern Ohio. Certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. (ABF) [Transferred from tned on 3/24/2018.] | ||
16 | 16 CERTIFIED CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-15) transferring case to the MDL Panel. (ABF) [Transferred from tned on 3/24/2018.] | |
Saturday, March 24, 2018 | ||
17 | 17 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Tennessee Eastern. Case number 3:18-cv-00083. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |