Virginia Eastern District Court
Judge:Anthony J Trenga
Referred: John F Anderson
Case #: 1:18-cv-00338
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Mar 23, 2018
Terminated:Jul 16, 2018
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 19, 2018 5:09 AM EDT
Defendant
Atlantic Coast Cotton, Inc.
Represented By
Thomas Joseph Flaherty
Littler Mendelson, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Mitchell G. Gittler
Plaintiff
Nathan Lucrisia
Represented By
Katherine Lynn Herrmann
The Erlich Law Office PLLC
contact info
Joshua Harry Erlich
The Erlich Law Office PLLC
contact info
Davia Kelsey Craumer
The Erlich Law Office PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Monday, July 16, 2018
17 17 order So Ordered Tue 07/17 10:22 AM
So Ordered in re16 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Nathan Lucrisia. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 07/16/2018. (jlan)
Related: [-]
Saturday, July 14, 2018
16 16 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Sat 07/14 1:56 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Nathan Lucrisia. (Erlich, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 12, 2018
15 15 5 pgs order Order Rule 16b Scheduling Order Thu 07/12 8:55 AM
Order Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order - Upon consideration of the representations made by the parties in the Proposed Joint Discovery Plan, and taking note of the Scheduling Order entered in this case, the court makes the following rulings: The Joint Discovery Plan filed by the parties is approved and shall control discovery to the extent of its application unless further modified by the court. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 07/12/2018. SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS. (wgar, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 11, 2018
14 14 misc Discovery Plan Wed 07/11 2:04 PM
Proposed Joint Discovery Plan by Nathan Lucrisia.(Erlich, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 21, 2018
13 13 order Scheduling Order Thu 06/21 3:04 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 7/18/2018 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 501 before Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/15/2018 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J Trenga. Discovery due by 11/9/2018. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 6/21/2018. (jall)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 magistrate consent,
Att: 2 pretrial notice
12 12 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 06/21 2:37 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Atlantic Coast Cotton, Inc..(Flaherty, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
11 11 misc Financial Disclosure Statement Thu 06/21 2:34 PM
Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Atlantic Coast Cotton, Inc.. (Flaherty, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 31, 2018
10 10 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 05/31 10:59 AM
ORDER granting9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. ORDERED, that Defendants files their Answer or responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint by June 21, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 05/31/2018. (wgar, )
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 05/31 10:19 AM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to1 Complaint by Atlantic Coast Cotton, Inc..(Flaherty, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, May 25, 2018
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 05/29 10:51 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nathan Lucrisia: as to Atlantic Coast Cotton, Inc. served on 5/16/2018, answer due 6/6/2018; Mitchell G. Gittler served on 5/10/2018, answer due 5/31/2018. (acha, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 11, 2018
7 7 service Summons Issued Wed 04/11 9:37 AM
Summons Issued as to Atlantic Coast Cotton, Inc., Mitchell G. Gittler. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two Electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint.(jlan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice
6 6 misc Proposed Summons Wed 04/11 9:23 AM
Proposed Summons re1 Complaint to Defendant Mitchell G. Gittler by Nathan Lucrisia. (Herrmann, Katherine)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Proposed Summons Wed 04/11 9:22 AM
Proposed Summons re1 Complaint to Defendant Atlantic Coast Cotton, Inc. by Nathan Lucrisia. (Herrmann, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 03, 2018
misc Docket Annotation Wed 04/11 9:16 AM
USB Drive received per order entered 03/29/2018.(jlan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 29, 2018
4 4 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Thu 03/29 2:33 PM
ORDER granting2 Motion for Leave; ORDERED that Plaintiff may deliver Exhibit Bin the form of a flash or "thumb" drive to the Clerk of this Court to be attached to the Complaint (Dkt. 1) in this matter. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 03/29/2018. (jlan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 28, 2018
3 3 misc Waiver of Wed 03/28 10:37 AM
Waiver of re2 MOTION Leave to File Document re1 Complaint Oral Argument by Nathan Lucrisia (Erlich, Joshua)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Miscellaneous Relief (MOTION) Wed 03/28 10:37 AM
MOTION Leave to File Document re1 Complaint by Nathan Lucrisia.(Erlich, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, March 23, 2018
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 03/26 10:45 AM
COMPLAINT against Atlantic Coast Cotton, Inc., Mitchell G. Gittler ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6006187.), filed by Nathan Lucrisia.(acha, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet