Smith v. Reiskin et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Jeffrey S White |
Case #: | 4:18-cv-01239 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Feb 26, 2018 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 25, 2018 3:02 AM PDT |
Defendant
Edward D Reiskin
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Tegsco LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
San Francisco Municipal Transportation Agency
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Smith
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sean Kayode
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
San Francisco Municipal Transportation Authority
Terminated: 05/04/2018
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor
Joel Drotts
Terminated: 06/01/2018
537 Jones Street, #3423
San Francisco, CA 94102 |
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, February 25, 2020 | ||
71 | 71
misc
Stipulation without Proposed Order
Tue 02/25 3:43 PM
STIPULATION re70 Order, Terminate Deadlines and Hearings, Set Deadlines JOINT STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by Edward D Reiskin, San Francisco Municipal Transportation Agency. (Snodgrass, Wayne) |
|
70 | 70
2
pgs
order
Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Set Deadlines
Tue 02/25 8:27 AM
ORDER re 69 Notice OF SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/25/20. Dismissal or Joint Status Report due by 3/13/2020. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) |
|
Wednesday, February 19, 2020 | ||
69 | 69
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 02/19 11:31 AM
NOTICE by Sean Kayode, James Smith Notice of Settlement (Roeser, Stephanie) |