Matrix Broadcasting, LLC and Matrix Broadcasting Holdings, LLC
Texas Northern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Barbara J Houser |
Case #: | 3:18-bk-31045 |
Case Filed: | Mar 27, 2018 |
Terminated: | May 31, 2019 |
Plan Confirmed: | Mar 21, 2019 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 50-99 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Matrix Broadcasting, LLC
14285 Midway Rd Ste 475
Addison, TX 75001-3706 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
1100 Commerce Street Room 976
Dallas, TX 75242 |
Docket last updated: 47 minutes ago |
Friday, May 31, 2019 | ||
182 | 182
order
Final decree
Fri 05/31 1:44 PM
Order granting motion for final decree (Case closed) Pursuant to LBR 9070-1, any exhibits that were admitted by the Court may be claimed and removed from the Clerks Office during the 60-day period following final disposition of a case by the attorney or party who introduced the exhibits. Any exhibit not removed within the 60-day period may be destroyed or otherwise disposed of by the Bankruptcy Clerk Entered on 5/31/2019. (Blanco, J.) |
|
Thursday, May 30, 2019 | ||
181 | 181
order
Compensation
Thu 05/30 3:31 PM
Order granting application for compensation granting for Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner, fees awarded: $205150.00, expenses awarded: $1130.96 Entered on 5/30/2019. (Blanco, J.) |
|
180 | 180
order
Compensation
Thu 05/30 3:28 PM
Order granting application for compensation granting for Lermen Senter PLLC, fees awarded: $102586.00, expenses awarded: $757.95 Entered on 5/30/2019. (Blanco, J.) |
|
Tuesday, May 28, 2019 | ||
179 | 179
court
Court admitted exhibits
Tue 05/28 4:17 PM
Court admitted exhibits date of hearing 5/28/2019. DEBTOR ADMITTED EXHIBITS 1,2 AND 3 ADMITTED.172 Application for compensation Final Fee Application for Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner, Debtor's Attorney, Period: 3/27/2018 to 3/31/2019, Fee: $205150, Expenses: $1130.96. Filed by Attorney Lindsey Lee Robin (Robin, Lindsey) MODIFIED dates to match application on 5/1/2019 (Okafor, M.).,173 Application for compensation First and Final Fee Application for Lermen Senter PLLC, Debtor's Attorney, Period: 3/27/2018 to 4/9/2019, Fee: $102586, Expenses: $757.95. Filed by Attorney Lindsey Lee Robin) (Jeng, Hawaii) |
|
court
Hearing held
Wed 05/29 10:02 AM
Hearing held on 5/28/2019. (Appearances: M. Cooley and L. Robin for Applicants and former debtors; T. Connop for Alpha; S. Buckman (telephonically), special counsel for former debtors. Evidentiary hearing. Application granted. Counsel to upload order.) (Harden, D.) |
||
court
Hearing held
Wed 05/29 10:03 AM
Hearing held on 5/28/2019. (Appearances: M. Cooley and L. Robin for Applicants and former debtors; T. Connop for Alpha; S. Buckman (telephonically), special counsel for former debtors. Evidentiary hearing. Application granted. Counsel to upload order.) (Harden, D.) |
||
court
Hearing held
Wed 05/29 10:09 AM
Hearing held on 5/28/2019. (Appearances: M. Cooley and L. Robin for Applicants and former debtors; T. Connop for Alpha; S. Buckman (telephonically), special counsel for former debtors. Evidentiary hearing. Application granted. Counsel to upload order.) (Harden, D.) |
||
Friday, May 24, 2019 | ||
178 | 178
misc
List (witness/exhibit/generic)
Fri 05/24 3:48 PM
Witness and Exhibit List filed by Consolidated debtor Matrix Broadcasting Holdings, LLC, Debtor Matrix Broadcasting, LLC . (Robin, Lindsey) |