North Carolina Middle District Court
Case #: 1:18-cr-00101
Case Filed:Mar 26, 2018
Terminated:May 16, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 28, 2018 3:16 AM EDT
Defendant
ANTONIO FERRAN-CARDOSO (8)
Defendant
MARIA LOURDES FLEITAS-BATISTA (7)
Defendant
LUIS ENRIQUE GINARTE-HERNANDEZ (2)
Defendant
WALTER GINARTE-MACHADO (6)
Defendant
JUAN CARLOS HERNANDEZ-SANTANA (3)
Defendant
HUBERT LOPEZ-BALDOQUIN (5)
Defendant
LEONARDO YORDAN MERINO-VELAZCO (4)
Defendant
ALEXANDER QUESADA-SEGUI (1)
Defendant
YELENYS RODRIGUEZ-PERAZA (9)
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
JOANNA G. MCFADDEN
U. S. Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 07/05/2024 2:01 PM EDT
Monday, March 26, 2018
1 1 12 pgs INDICTMENT as to ALEXANDER QUESADA-SEGUI (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 8, LUIS ENRIQUE GINARTE-HERNANDEZ (2) count(s) 1, 2, 3, JUAN CARLOS HERNANDEZ-SANTANA (3) count(s) 1, 2, 3, LEONARDO YORDAN MERINO-VELAZCO (4) count(s) 1, 8, HUBERT LOPEZ-BALDOQUIN (5) count(s) 1, 2, 3, WALTER GINARTE-MACHADO (6) count(s) 1, MARIA LOURDES FLEITAS-BATISTA (7) count(s) 1, 8, ANTONIO FERRAN-CARDOSO (8) count(s) 1, 4, 5, YELENYS RODRIGUEZ-PERAZA (9) count(s) 1, 6, 7. (Sheets, Jamie)
Related: [-]