Bacon County Hospital Foundation, Inc. v. Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-45285 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 |
Case Filed: | Mar 27, 2018 |
Case in other court: | Georgia Southern, 5:18-cv-00020 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 5:24 PM EST |
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
The Purdue Frederick Company Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Noramco Inc
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Bacon County Hospital Foundation, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 8:36 PM EDT |
Friday, March 09, 2018 | ||
Filing fee: $400, receipt number 113J-2332712. (slt) [Transferred from gasd on 3/27/2018.] | ||
1 | 1 45 pgs COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Bacon County Hospital Foundation, Inc.(slt) [Transferred from gasd on 3/27/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
Monday, March 12, 2018 | ||
2 | 2 RULE 26 INSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on 3/12/2018. (ca) [Transferred from gasd on 3/27/2018.] | |
Thursday, March 22, 2018 | ||
3 | 3 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-16) re1 Complaint filed by Bacon County Hospital Foundation, Inc. Signed by Jeffrey N. Luthi, Clerk of the Panel on 3/22/2018. (ca) [Transferred from gasd on 3/27/2018.] | |
Tuesday, March 27, 2018 | ||
4 | 4 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Georgia Southern. Case number 5:18-cv-00020. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |