City of West Lafayette v. Purdue Pharma LP et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-45300 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 27, 2018 |
Case in other court: | Indiana Northern, 4:18-cv-00013 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 5:25 PM EST |
Defendant
Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
781 Chestnut Ridge Road
Morgantown, WV 26505 |
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC
|
|
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
|
|
Defendant
DIK Drug Company
|
|
Defendant
Indivior Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc. f/k/a Par Pharmaceutical Holdings, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Sandoz Inc.
|
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
The Kroger Co.
|
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walmart Inc. f/k/a Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Noramco Inc
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., The
|
|
Plaintiff
City of West Lafayette
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 8:18 PM EDT |
Monday, March 12, 2018 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3508978.), filed by City of West Lafayette.(Toops, Lynn) [Transferred from innd on 3/27/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons | ||
2 | 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Lynn A Toops on behalf of City of West Lafayette (Toops, Lynn) [Transferred from innd on 3/27/2018.] | |
3 | 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Irwin B Levin on behalf of City of West Lafayette (Levin, Irwin) [Transferred from innd on 3/27/2018.] | |
4 | 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard E Shevitz on behalf of City of West Lafayette (Shevitz, Richard) [Transferred from innd on 3/27/2018.] | |
5 | 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeff S Gibson on behalf of City of West Lafayette (Gibson, Jeff) [Transferred from innd on 3/27/2018.] | |
6 | 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Vess A Miller on behalf of City of West Lafayette (Miller, Vess) [Transferred from innd on 3/27/2018.] | |
7 | 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan A Knoll on behalf of City of West Lafayette (Knoll, Jonathan) [Transferred from innd on 3/27/2018.] | |
Tuesday, March 13, 2018 | ||
Judge Rudy Lozano and Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich added. (New Case) (sct) [Transferred from innd on 3/27/2018.] | ||
8 | 8 Summons Issued as to Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Allergan PLC, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health Inc, Cephalon Inc, Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, McKesson Corporation. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (sct) [Transferred from innd on 3/27/2018.] | |
Thursday, March 15, 2018 | ||
9 | 9 Related Case Remark - Counsel has indicated on the Civil Cover Sheet that this case is related to Case No. 2:17-cv-00431 RL-APR. (sct) [Transferred from innd on 3/27/2018.] | |
Thursday, March 22, 2018 | ||
10 | 10 Uncertified CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-16), transferring case to MDL 2804 in the Northern District of Ohio before Judge Dan A. Polster. Signed by Jeffery N Luthi, Clerk of the Panel on 3/22/2018. (jld) [Transferred from innd on 3/27/2018.] | |
11 | 11 CERTIFIED ORDER transferring case to Multi-District Litigation, transferring case to MDL 2804 in the Northern District of Ohio before Judge Dan A. Polster. Signed by Jeffery N Luthi, Clerk of the Panel on 3/22/2018. ***Civil Case Terminated. Case sent to Northern Ohio electronically (mlc) [Transferred from innd on 3/27/2018.] | |
Tuesday, March 27, 2018 | ||
12 | 12 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Indiana Northern. Case number 4:18-cv-00013. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |