The City of Winfield, West Virginia v. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-45294 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 21:0801 |
Case Filed: | Mar 27, 2018 |
Case in other court: | West Virginia Southern, 3:18-cv-00400 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 5:25 PM EST |
Defendant
Purdue Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Rhodes Pharmaceuticals, L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Jonathan Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Kathe Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Dr. Richard Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Specgx, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
The Purdue Frederick Company Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Warner Chilcott Company, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Wal-Mart Stores East L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Actavis Elizabeth LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Kadian, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Mid Atlantic LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis South Atlantic LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Totowa LLC
874 Walker Road, Suite C
Dover, DE 19904 |
|
Defendant
Allergan Finance LLC f/k/a Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan Finance, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Allergan Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC f/k/a Actavis PLC
|
|
Defendant
Allergan Sales, LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
The City of Winfield, West Virginia
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 4:31 PM EDT |
Wednesday, March 07, 2018 | ||
CASE assigned to Judge David A. Faber. (klc) [Transferred from wvsd on 3/27/2018.] | ||
1 | 1 34 pgs COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # 0425-6278151. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jsa) [Transferred from wvsd on 3/27/2018.] | |
2 | 2 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., McKesson Corporation, Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc., re:1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (jsa) [Transferred from wvsd on 3/27/2018.] | |
Att: 1 summons as to Cardinal Health, Inc., | ||
Att: 2 summons as to McKesson Corporation, | ||
Att: 3 summons as to Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, | ||
Att: 4 summons as to Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc. | ||
3 | 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Aboulhosn. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (jsa) [Transferred from wvsd on 3/27/2018.] | |
Thursday, March 22, 2018 | ||
4 | 4 NOTIFICATION FROM JUDICIAL PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION re: Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-16), MDL 2804. (kp) [Transferred from wvsd on 3/27/2018.] | |
5 | 5 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-16) JUDICIAL PANEL ON MDL: certified copy from the Northern District of Ohio transferring this action to the USDC/NDOH for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1407. Signed by Jeffery N. Luthi, Clerk of the Panel on 3/22/2018. (cc: attys) (ts) [Transferred from wvsd on 3/27/2018.] | |
Tuesday, March 27, 2018 | ||
6 | 6 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of West Virginia Southern. Case number 3:18-cv-00400. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |