Akins v. Seidberg Law Offices PC
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | Diane J Humetewa |
Case #: | 2:18-cv-00954 |
Nature of Suit | 710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause | 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 27, 2018 |
Terminated: | May 21, 2019 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 23, 2018 2:22 AM MST |
Defendant
Seidberg Law Offices PC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Aaleon Akins
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Thursday, June 06, 2019 | ||
37 | 37
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Attorney Fees
Thu 06/06 3:30 PM
ORDER granting the36 Motion for Attorney Fees. Defendant Seidberg Law Offices, P.C. shall pay $15,000.00 in attorneys' fees and costs to the Thompson Consumer Law Group, PLLC. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 6/5/2019. (LFIG) |
|
Tuesday, June 04, 2019 | ||
36 | 36
motion
Attorney Fees
Tue 06/04 6:03 PM
MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs by Aaleon Akins.(McDevitt, David) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Timesheets, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Declaration of David N. McDevitt, | ||
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, May 21, 2019 | ||
35 | 35
6
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Certify Class
Tue 05/21 11:18 AM
ORDER granting the32 Joint Motion for Class Certification and Final Approval of Class Action Settlement. The parties and settlement administrator are directed to implement this Order and the Agreement in accordance with the terms of the Agreement and this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk is respectfully directed to terminate this action. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 5/20/2019. (See Order for details.) (LFIG) |
|
Thursday, March 28, 2019 | ||
34 | 34
misc
Stipulation
Thu 03/28 1:00 PM
STIPULATION and Addendum to the Class Action Settlement Agreement by Aaleon Akins. (McDevitt, David) |
|
Thursday, March 14, 2019 | ||
33 | 33
minutes
In-Court Hearing 1 - Common Prompts (Text Only) ~Util - Set Deadlines
Thu 03/14 4:54 PM
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Diane J Humetewa: Fairness Hearing held on 3/14/2019. As set forth on the record, the parties are to meet and confer and within 14 days, submit a revised proposed settlement agreement. APPEARANCES: Russeell Thompson for Plaintiff. Manuel Newburger and Kenneth Seidberg for Defendants. (Court Reporter Linda Schroeder.) Hearing held 4:02 PM to 4:46 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LFIG) |
|
32 | 32
motion
Certify Class
Thu 03/14 12:27 PM
Joint MOTION to Certify Class and Final Approval of Class Settlement by Aaleon Akins.(McDevitt, David) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of David McDevitt with supporting exhibits, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Aaelon Akins, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Declaration of Manny Newburger with supporting exhibits, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Declaration of Bailey Hughes, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Proposed Final Order and Judgment | ||
Friday, December 21, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Continue
Fri 12/21 10:43 AM
ORDER granting the29 Joint Motion to Continue and resetting the Fairness Hearing for 3/14/2019 at 4:00 PM in Courtroom 605, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Diane J Humetewa. ORDERED the parties must direct the Settlement Administrator to mail a copy of this Order to all Class Members as expeditiously as possible, but no later than January 9, 2019. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED affirming all other deadlines specified in the Court's prior27 Order. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 12/20/2018. (LFIG) |
|
Thursday, December 20, 2018 | ||
30 | 30
motion
Continue
Thu 12/20 4:48 PM
First MOTION to Continue Reset Final Fairness Hearing by Seidberg Law Offices PC.(Seidberg, Kenneth) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Order | ||
29 | 29
motion
Continue
Thu 12/20 1:37 PM
First MOTION to Continue Reset Final Fairness Hearing by Seidberg Law Offices PC. (Seidberg, Kenneth) |
|
Wednesday, December 12, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Wed 12/12 3:32 PM
ORDER resetting the Fairness Hearing for 3/5/2019 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 605, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Diane J Humetewa. ORDERED the parties must mail a copy of this Order to all Class Members as expeditiously as possible, but no later than January 4, 2019. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED affirming all other deadlines specified in the Court's prior27 Order. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 12/12/2018. (LFIG) |
|
Tuesday, October 23, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
25
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings ~Util - Terminate Motions
Tue 10/23 4:18 PM
ORDER granting the parties'26 Joint Motion for Conditional Certification and Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement Agreement as set forth in this Order. ORDERED setting a Hearing for 2/28/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 605, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Diane J Humetewa. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 10/23/2018. (See Order for details.) (LFIG) |
|
Tuesday, October 02, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 10/02 7:48 AM
Joint MOTION for Conditional Certification and Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement Agreement by Aaleon Akins. (David McDevitt)(EJA) |
|
Att: 1 Appendix Class Settlement Agreement and Exhibits | ||
25 | 25
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
Tue 10/02 7:45 AM
ORDER granting23 Joint Motion. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to file the document currently lodged at Doc.24 . Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 10/1/18. (EJA) |
|
Tuesday, September 25, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
respoth
Lodged Proposed Document
Tue 09/25 5:15 PM
LODGED Proposed Joint Motion for Conditional Certification and Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement re:23 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Joint Motion for Conditional Certification and Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement . Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation for Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Aaleon Akins.(McDevitt, David) |
|
Att: 1 Appendix Class Settlement Agreement and Exhibits | ||
23 | 23
motion
File Excess Pages
Tue 09/25 5:13 PM
Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Joint Motion for Conditional Certification and Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement by Aaleon Akins.(McDevitt, David) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Excess Pages | ||
Monday, September 24, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Report - Status
Mon 09/24 8:29 PM
STATUS REPORT regarding Settlement by Aaleon Akins. (McDevitt, David) |
|
21 | 21
notice
Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel
Mon 09/24 1:30 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by David Neal McDevitt on behalf of Aaleon Akins. (McDevitt, David) |
|
Friday, July 27, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Notice of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery
Fri 07/27 3:28 PM
NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Plaintiff Aaleon Akins. (Panvini, Joseph) |
|
Thursday, July 26, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines ~Util - Terminate Hearings
Thu 07/26 7:36 AM
ORDER - A Stipulation to Dismiss shall be filed on or before 9/24/2018. If a Stipulation to Dismiss has not been filed the parties shall file a Status Report to the Court on that date. The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 8/1/2018 is VACATED. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 7/26/18. (DXD) |
|
Monday, July 23, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Notice of Settlement
Mon 07/23 4:49 PM
NOTICE of Settlement and Joint Request to Vacate Rule 16 Conference by Aaleon Akins. (Panvini, Joseph) |
|
Thursday, July 19, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery
Thu 07/19 3:18 PM
NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant Seidberg Law Offices PC. (Seidberg, Kenneth) |
|
Wednesday, June 27, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
order
MIDP - Order Ext MID Response Deadline for 30 Days (Settlement)
Wed 06/27 1:04 PM
ORDER - In their Stipulated Notice Deferring Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Responses (Doc.15 ), the parties have indicated that they have a good faith belief that this case will be resolved within 30 days. Therefore, the time to submit MID responses is extended for 30 days. No further extensions will be granted. ORDERED by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 6/27/2018. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LFIG) |
|
15 | 15
misc
Stipulation
Wed 06/27 6:24 AM
STIPULATION Deferring Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Responses by Aaleon Akins. (Panvini, Joseph) |
|
Thursday, May 31, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 05/31 1:31 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Seidberg Law Offices PC. (Seidberg, Kenneth) |
|
Wednesday, May 30, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 05/30 2:10 PM
Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint by Seidberg Law Offices PC.(Seidberg, Kenneth) |
|
Friday, May 25, 2018 | ||
misc
Remark (Public)
Fri 05/25 4:42 PM
Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Manuel H Newburger on behalf of defendant. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) |
||
Thursday, May 24, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Report - Settlement Talks/Discussions
Thu 05/24 10:26 AM
REPORT of Settlement Talks/Discussions by Aaleon Akins. (Panvini, Joseph) |
|
Thursday, May 17, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
5
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Thu 05/17 11:53 AM
ORDER setting a Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 8/1/2018 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 605, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Diane J Humetewa. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 5/17/2018. (See Order for details.) (LFIG) |
|
Friday, May 11, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
order
MIDP - Order of Extension of Time to Answer
Fri 05/11 1:36 PM
ORDER approving the8 Stipulation and a one-time extension of time until 6/1/2018 for Defendant to respond to the complaint. The parties' obligations to produce the information called for in the MIDP will be triggered by Defendant's answer to the complaint after the extension. The parties should be aware that the filing of a motion to dismiss under Rule 12(b)(6) will not postpone the time for compliance with the MIDP. General Order 17-08 provides that compliance may be deferred only for motions to dismiss based on lack of subject-matter jurisdiction, lack of personal jurisdiction, sovereign immunity, or absolute or qualified immunity of a public official. No further extensions will be granted. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 5/11/2018. (LFIG) |
|
Monday, May 07, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel
Mon 05/07 12:58 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth William Seidberg on behalf of Seidberg Law Offices PC. (Seidberg, Kenneth) |
|
Friday, May 04, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint
Fri 05/04 2:24 PM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT by Aaleon Akins.(Panvini, Joseph) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, April 12, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
service
Service Executed
Thu 04/12 10:35 AM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Aaleon Akins: Proof of Service re: Complaint and all filed documents upon Seidberg Law Offices, P.C. on 04/10/2018. (Thompson, Russell) |
|
Thursday, March 29, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
2
pgs
order
Order re Rule 12(b) Motions
Thu 03/29 1:22 PM
ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. ORDERED that Plaintiff serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant and file a notice of service. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 3/28/2018. (LFIG) |
|
Wednesday, March 28, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Wed 03/28 10:36 AM
Summons Issued as to Seidberg Law Offices PC. (SLQ) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice re Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP)
Wed 03/28 10:34 AM
NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (SLQ) |
|
Tuesday, March 27, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
misc
New Case Opened
Wed 03/28 10:33 AM
Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-15314905. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Diane J Humetewa. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 18-00954 PHX-DJH. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (SLQ) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons Submitted
Wed 03/28 10:32 AM
SUMMONS Submitted by Aaleon Akins (submitted by Russell Thompson). (SLQ) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 03/28 10:30 AM
COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-15314905 filed by Aaleon Akins (submitted by Russell Thompson).(SLQ) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet |