Alnylam Pharmaceuticals, Inc. v. Silence Therapeutics GmbH et al
Massachusetts District Court | |
Judge: | Mark L Wolf |
Case #: | 1:18-cv-10613 |
Nature of Suit | 830 Property Rights - Patent |
Cause | 28:2201 Declaratory Judgment |
Case Filed: | Mar 29, 2018 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 25, 2018 4:53 AM EDT |
Defendant
Silence Therapeutics GmbH
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Silence Therapeutics plc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alnylam Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
300 Third Street
Cambridge, MA 02142 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/28/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, December 14, 2018 | ||
38 | 38
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Fri 12/14 11:17 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Alnylam Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Cotter, John) |
|
Tuesday, December 11, 2018 | ||
37 | 37
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Tue 12/11 11:42 AM
Judge Mark L. Wolf: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting36 Motion for Extension of Time. (Bono, Christine) |
|
Thursday, December 06, 2018 | ||
36 | 36
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Thu 12/06 1:54 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to January 11, 2019 to File Answer re35 Amended Complaint by Silence Therapeutics GmbH, Silence Therapeutics plc.(Hubbard, Jared) |
|
Monday, December 03, 2018 | ||
35 | 35
cmp
Amended Complaint
Mon 12/03 12:48 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT (Second) against All Defendants, filed by Alnylam Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Cotter, John) |
|
Thursday, November 29, 2018 | ||
34 | 34
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Order on Motio
Thu 11/29 12:45 PM
Judge Mark L. Wolf: ORDER entered finding as moot11 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; finding as moot16 Motion for Leave to File Document ; finding as moot18 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer ; finding as moot19 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply ; finding as moot21 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; finding as moot24 Motion ; granting25 Motion to Amend; finding as moot29 Motion for Discovery. (Bono, Christine) |
|
Tuesday, November 13, 2018 | ||
33 | 33
notice
Notice of Change of Address or Firm Name
Tue 11/13 7:01 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address or Firm Name by John J. Cotter (Cotter, John) |
|
Friday, October 19, 2018 | ||
32 | 32
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Fri 10/19 12:38 PM
Assented to MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Una Fan) by Alnylam Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Cotter, John) |
|
Thursday, September 06, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
misc
Stipulation
Thu 09/06 10:29 AM
STIPULATION re25 MOTION to Amend Complaint ,21 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Plaintiff's Amended Complaint ,29 MOTION for Discovery Regarding Jurisdiction and Request for Briefing Schedule by Silence Therapeutics GmbH, Silence Therapeutics plc. (Hubbard, Jared) |
|
Friday, August 17, 2018 | ||
30 | 30
respm
Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
Fri 08/17 5:58 PM
AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re21 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (Declaration with Exhibits 1-23) filed by Alnylam Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Cotter, John) |
|
29 | 29
motion
Discovery
Fri 08/17 5:53 PM
MOTION for Discovery Regarding Jurisdiction by Alnylam Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Cotter, John) |
|
28 | 28
26
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Fri 08/17 5:40 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re21 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by Alnylam Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Cotter, John) |
|
Thursday, August 16, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
respm
Affidavit in Support of Motion
Thu 08/16 6:31 PM
AFFIDAVIT in Support re25 MOTION to Amend Complaint (Cotter Declaration with Exhibit A) filed by Alnylam Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Cotter, John) |
|
26 | 26
7
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Support of Motion
Thu 08/16 6:02 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re25 MOTION to Amend Complaint filed by Alnylam Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Cotter, John) |
|
25 | 25
motion
Amend
Thu 08/16 5:58 PM
MOTION to Amend Complaint by Alnylam Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Cotter, John) |
|
Wednesday, August 01, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Wed 08/01 2:33 PM
Joint MOTION re21 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (Motion to Schedule Briefing) by Alnylam Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Cotter, John) |
|
Wednesday, July 25, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
respm
Addendum to Motion/Memorandum
Wed 07/25 9:55 AM
ADDENDUM re16 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint Containing Certain Impounded Facts -- Notice Pursuant to Order of English Court filed by Alnylam Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Cotter, John) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit | ||
Friday, July 20, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
18
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Support of Motion
Fri 07/20 3:54 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re21 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by Silence Therapeutics GmbH, Silence Therapeutics plc.(Hubbard, Jared) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Robert Quinn, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of Eric W. Lin | ||
21 | 21
motion
Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Fri 07/20 3:51 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Silence Therapeutics GmbH, Silence Therapeutics plc.(Hubbard, Jared) |
|
Thursday, July 12, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
6
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Thu 07/12 5:52 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re19 MOTION for Extension of Time to July 27, 2018 to File Response/Reply as to16 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint Containing Certain Impounded Facts filed by Alnylam Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Cotter, John) |
|
Wednesday, July 11, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Wed 07/11 10:02 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to July 27, 2018 to File Response/Reply as to16 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint Containing Certain Impounded Facts by Silence Therapeutics GmbH, Silence Therapeutics plc.(Hubbard, Jared) |
|
Tuesday, July 03, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Tue 07/03 10:12 AM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to 7/20/2018 to File Answer re15 Amended Complaint, by Silence Therapeutics GmbH, Silence Therapeutics plc.(Hubbard, Jared) |
|
Friday, June 29, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Leave to File Document
Fri 06/29 8:41 AM
MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint Containing Certain Impounded Facts by Alnylam Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Cotter, John) |
|
Friday, June 22, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
cmp
Amended Complaint
Fri 06/22 5:22 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Alnylam Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Cotter, John) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 6, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 7, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 8, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 9, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit 10, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit 11, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit 12, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit 13, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit 14 | ||
Thursday, June 14, 2018 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Thu 06/14 11:01 AM
Judge Mark L. Wolf: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting14 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Opposition due by 7/13/2018. Reply due by 8/3/2018. (Bono, Christine) |
||
Thursday, June 07, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Thu 06/07 12:23 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to July 13, 2018 to File Response/Reply as to11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Alnylam Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Cotter, John) |
|
Friday, June 01, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 06/01 4:50 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Silence Therapeutics GmbH, Silence Therapeutics plc identifying Other Affiliate Invesco Asset Management for Silence Therapeutics plc.. (Hubbard, Jared) |
|
12 | 12
15
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Support of Motion
Fri 06/01 4:47 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Silence Therapeutics GmbH, Silence Therapeutics plc.(Hubbard, Jared) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Robert Quinn, Ph.D., | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of Michelle Yang | ||
11 | 11
motion
Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Fri 06/01 4:46 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Silence Therapeutics GmbH, Silence Therapeutics plc.(Hubbard, Jared) |
|
Friday, April 27, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Fri 04/27 11:46 AM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to June 1, 2018 to File Answer re1 Complaint, by Alnylam Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Cotter, John) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Fri 04/27 1:10 PM
Judge Mark L. Wolf: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Silence Therapeutics GmbH answer due 6/1/2018; Silence Therapeutics plc answer due 6/1/2018. (Bono, Christine) |
||
Tuesday, April 24, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
service
Notice of Service of Process
Tue 04/24 4:02 PM
Notice of Service of Process filed by Alnylam Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Individual(s)/Entities served: Silence Therapeutics plc. (Cotter, John) |
|
Wednesday, April 04, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear
Wed 04/04 4:31 PM
Judge Mark L. Wolf: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Scott K. Reed, Ha Kung Wong, Robert S. Schwartz, Melinda R. Roberts, Prajakta A. Sonalker, Una Fan, Gregory J. Manas, Omobolaji A. Bedu. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Franklin, Yvonne) |
|
Tuesday, April 03, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Attorney Payment of Fees
Tue 04/03 5:16 PM
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY PAYMENT OF FEES as to6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Scott K. Reed Filing fee: $ 600, receipt number 0101-7076441 by Plaintiff Alnylam Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0101-7078452. Payment Type : PRO HAC VICE. (Cotter, John) |
|
Monday, April 02, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 04/02 6:24 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Scott K. Reed Filing fee: $ 600, receipt number 0101-7076441 by Alnylam Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Cotter, John) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Reed Declaration, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Wong Declaration, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Schwartz Declaration, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Roberts Declaration, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Fan Declaration, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F - Sonalker Declaration, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit G - Manas Declaration, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit H - Bedu Declaration | ||
Friday, March 30, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Fri 03/30 2:40 PM
Summons Issued as to Silence Therapeutics GmbH, Silence Therapeutics plc. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (McKillop, Matthew) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Case Assignment
Fri 03/30 2:24 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Mark L. Wolf assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (DaSilva, Carolina) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Report on the filing/termination of patent/trademark case
Fri 03/30 2:19 PM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION REGARDING PATENT. (McKillop, Matthew) |
|
Thursday, March 29, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 03/29 5:35 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Alnylam Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Cotter, John) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 03/29 5:30 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7072364 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Alnylam Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Cotter, John) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 6, | ||
Att: 7 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 8 Category Sheet, | ||
Att: 9 PTO From A 120 |