Massachusetts District Court
Judge:Richard G Stearns
Case #: 1:18-cv-10619
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Mar 30, 2018
Terminated:May 11, 2018
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 26, 2018 4:56 AM EDT
Counter Claimant
Hope Summers
Unit 2157 - Box2157
Teaneck, NJ 07666
Counter Defendant
Allen Egon Cholakian
Defendant
Clara Arroyave
Represented By
Kristopher N. Austin
Foley Hoag LLP
contact info
Defendant
Attorney General of the Commonwealth of Massachusetts
One Ashburton Place
Boston, MA 02108
Represented By
Cassandra Bolanos
Office Of The Attorney General (ma)
contact info
Kimberly A. Parr
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
City of Cambrige Police Department
Defendant
Federal Bureau of Investigation
Defendant
Jane does A-Z
Defendant
John does A-Z
Defendant
Francisco Marriott
Represented By
Kristopher N. Austin
Foley Hoag LLP
contact info
Defendant
Placeme Inc
Represented By
Kristopher N. Austin
Foley Hoag LLP
contact info
Defendant
Baby Poppi
Defendant
Hope Summers
Unit 2157 - Box 2157
Teaneck, NJ 07666
Plaintiff
Allen Egon Cholakian
PO BOX 380477 Harvard Square Station
Cambridge, MA 02238
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Bristol-Myers Squibb, Inc
Terminated: 04/23/2018
Represented By
Stephen W. Hassink
Dla Piper Us LLP
contact info

GPO May 11 2018
Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER dismissing all defendants as the court lacks subject matter jurisdiction as there are no cognizable federal claims.(Zierk, Marsha)

Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, May 14, 2018
18 18 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 05/14 9:59 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly A. Parr on behalf of Attorney General of the Commonwealth of Massachusetts (Parr, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 11, 2018
17 17 order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Fri 05/11 12:47 PM
Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered finding as moot10 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; finding as moot12 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. (Pacho, Arnold)
Related: [-]
16 16 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Fri 05/11 12:45 PM
Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered. ORDER DISMISSING CASE. (Pacho, Arnold)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Copy Mailed Fri 05/11 11:38 AM
Copy of the court's Order dismissing all defendants was mailed to plaintiff Allen Egon Cholakian and defendant Hope Summers on 5/11/2018. (mkz)
Related: [-]
14 14 5 pgs order Memorandum & Order Fri 05/11 11:35 AM
Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER dismissing all defendants as the court lacks subject matter jurisdiction as there are no cognizable federal claims.(Zierk, Marsha)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 02, 2018
13 13 5 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Wed 05/02 9:15 AM
MEMORANDUM in Support re12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Attorney General of the Commonwealth of Massachusetts. (Pacho, Arnold)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 01, 2018
12 12 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Tue 05/01 5:03 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ( Responses due by 5/15/2018) by Attorney General of the Commonwealth of Massachusetts.(Bolanos, Cassandra)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support of Defendant Attorney General's Motion to Dismiss
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 05/01 1:23 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Cassandra Bolanos on behalf of Attorney General of the Commonwealth of Massachusetts (Bolanos, Cassandra)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 23, 2018
10 10 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 04/23 5:15 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Clara Arroyave, Francisco Marriott, Placeme Inc.(Austin, Kristopher)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 04/23 1:38 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen W. Hassink on behalf of Bristol-Myers Squibb, Inc (Hassink, Stephen)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 04/23 11:40 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Bristol-Myers Squibb, Inc. (Hassink, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 05, 2018
7 7 notice Notice of Change of Address or Firm Name Thu 04/05 3:56 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Hope Summers. (Pacho, Arnold)
Related: [-]
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Counterclaim Thu 04/05 3:54 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, and COUNTERCLAIM against Allen Egon Cholakian by Hope Summers. (Pacho, Arnold)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 30, 2018
5 5 service Summons Issued Fri 03/30 2:18 PM
Summons Issued as to Allen Egon Cholakian. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Castilla, Francis) Modified on 3/30/2018 (adminn, )
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Case Assignment Fri 03/30 2:17 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Richard G. Stearns assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (adminn, ) Modified on 3/30/2018 (adminn, )
Related: [-]
3 3 order General Order 09-1 Fri 03/30 2:11 PM
General Order 09-1, dated January 6, 2009 regarding the E-Government Act and Personal Identifiers entered. (Castilla, Francis) Modified on 3/30/2018 (adminn, )
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Filing Fee/Payment Received Fri 03/30 2:09 PM
Filing fee/payment: $ 400.00, receipt number 1BST067640 for1 Complaint, (Vieira, Leonardo)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 03/30 2:05 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Allen Egon Cholakian.(Castilla, Francis) (Castilla, Francis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G,
Att: 8 Exhibit H-J
Att: 9 (3/30/2018) Civil Cover Sheet Category