Norton Energy Storage LLC
Member Case
Lead case is: 5:18-bk-50757
Lead case is: 5:18-bk-50757
Ohio Northern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Alan M Koschik |
Case #: | 5:18-bk-50764 |
Case Filed: | Mar 31, 2018 |
Terminated: | May 26, 2020 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $0 to $50,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $0 to $50,000 |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Norton Energy Storage LLC, Debtor
341 White Pond Dr
Akron, OH 44320-1119 |
Represented By
|
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 6:17 PM EDT |
Tuesday, May 26, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Tue 05/26 3:55 PM
Final Decree Issued. Case Closed. (bhemi) |
|
9 | 9
![]() Order on Debtors' Motion for Entry of (I) A Final Decree for FE Aircraft Leasing Corp and (II) Directing the Use of An Amended Case Caption Signed on 5/26/2020 . (bhemi crt) |
|
Tuesday, June 11, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Expungement/Withdrawal of Claims: 1 Filed by Creditor INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE . (bhemi crt) |
|
Tuesday, May 15, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individual Filed by Debtor Norton Energy Storage LLC . (Franklin, Bridget aty) |
|
6 | 6
![]() Schedule A/B: Property Non-Individual , Schedule D: Non-Individual- Creditors Having Claims Secured by Property , Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims Non-Individual , Schedule G: Non-Individual- Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases , Schedule H: Non-Individual- Codebtors , Summary of Assets and Liabilities Schedules for Non-Individual Filed by Debtor Norton Energy Storage LLC. (Franklin, Bridget aty) |
|
Thursday, April 05, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice and Service of Papers by Robert O Lampl Filed by Interested Party International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Local 272. (Lampl, Robert aty) |
|
Tuesday, April 03, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Order for Joint Administration. All pleadings and claims to be docketed in Lead Case No. 18-50757 An Order has been entered in accordance with Rule 1015(b) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure directing the joint administration of the chapter 11 cases of FirstEnergy Solutions Corp,; FE Aircraft Leasing Corp,; FirstEnergy Generation, LLC; FirstEnergy Generation Mansfield Unit 1 Corp.; FirstEnergy Nuclear Generation, LLC; FirstEnergy Nuclear Operating Company; and Norton Energy Storage LLC. The docket in Case No. 18-50757 should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. Signed on 4/3/2018. (bhemi crt) Modified on 4/3/2018 (bhemi) |
|
court
Hearing Held
Tue 04/03 1:34 PM
Hearing Held --granted -- (mknot) |
||
Sunday, April 01, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Declaration Re: Electronic Filing Filed by Debtor Norton Energy Storage L.L.C.. (Merklin, Marc aty) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Motion for Joint Administration of the Debtors' Chapter 11 Cases Filed by Debtor Norton Energy Storage L.L.C. (Merklin, Marc aty) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Saturday, March 31, 2018 | ||
1 | 1
![]() Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $1717 Filed by Norton Energy Storage L.L.C. Chapter 11 Plan due by 07/30/2018. Disclosure Statement due by 07/30/2018. Atty Disclosure Statement due 04/16/2018. Schedule A/B due 04/16/2018. Schedule D due 04/16/2018. Schedule E/F due 04/16/2018. Schedule G due 04/16/2018. Schedule H due 04/16/2018. Statement of Financial Affairs due 04/16/2018. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 04/16/2018. Incomplete Filings due by 04/16/2018. (Merklin, Marc aty) |