Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-10992

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Stuart M Bernstein
Case #: 1:18-ap-01049
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Apr 02, 2018
Terminated:Jan 29, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Bluewave Capital LLC
Represented By
Bluewave Capital LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
SunEdison Litigation Trust
Represented By
David R. Hurst
Cole, Schotz, Meisel, Forman & Leonard,
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Friday, January 29, 2021
misc Close Adversary Proceeding Fri 01/29 9:58 AM
Adversary Case 1:18-ap-1049 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Barrett, Chantel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 08, 2019
9 9 notice Notice, Dismissal Tue 10/08 9:28 AM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Related [+] filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-] 3
Thursday, December 20, 2018
8 8 misc Certificate of Service Thu 12/20 9:24 AM
Certificate of Service of P. Ratkowiak regarding service of Notice of (I) Agreement to Enter Mediation Prior to Response Due Date and (II) Selection of Mediator Related [+] Filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-] 7
7 7 misc Affidavit Thu 12/20 9:11 AM
Affidavit (Notice of (I) Agreement to Enter Mediation Prior to Response Due Date and (II) Selection of Mediator) Related [+]. Filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-] 5390
Monday, October 22, 2018
6 6 order So Ordered Stipulation Mon 10/22 7:20 AM
So Ordered Stipulation Signed On 10/19/2018. Re: Extending Time To Answer, Move, Or Otherwise Respond To Complaint (Barrett, Chantel)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 02, 2018
5 5 misc Certificate of Service Mon 07/02 4:38 PM
Certificate of Service of P. Ratkowiak regarding service of First Amended Complaint, Second Summons and Order Granting SunEdison Litigation Trust's Motion for Order Establishing Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code [Docket No. 5390] Related [+] filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-] 3 ,4
Thursday, June 28, 2018
4 4 cmp Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (PDF Upload) Thu 06/28 10:07 AM
Second Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference against BlueWave MA, LLC. (Braithwaite, Kenishia)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 27, 2018
3 3 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 06/27 5:06 PM
Amended Complaint against BlueWave MA, LLC (First) to: (I) Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547, 548 and 550; and (II) Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 502(d) Related [+] Filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-] 1
misc Request for Subsequent Summons Wed 06/27 5:45 PM
Request for a Second Summons filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 02, 2018
2 2 cmp Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference Mon 04/02 2:50 PM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 5/15/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB), Answer due by 5/2/2018, (Braithwaite, Kenishia)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Mon 04/02 10:51 AM
Adversary case 18-01049 Complaint against Bluewave Capital LLC to: (I) Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547, 548 and 550; and (II) Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 502(d) (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) Filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-]