Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-10992

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Stuart M Bernstein
Case #: 1:18-ap-01062
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Apr 02, 2018
Terminated:Jan 29, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Dynasolar Services, LLC
Represented By
Dynasolar Services, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
SunEdison Litigation Trust
Represented By
David R. Hurst
Cole, Schotz, Meisel, Forman & Leonard,
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/01/2025 1:08 PM EDT
Friday, January 29, 2021
misc Close Adversary Proceeding Fri 01/29 10:22 AM
Adversary Case 1:18-ap-1062 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Barrett, Chantel)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 03, 2018
8 8 notice Notice, Dismissal Mon 12/03 9:56 AM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Related [+] filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-] 1
Friday, October 05, 2018
7 7 misc Certificate of Service Fri 10/05 3:39 PM
Certificate of Service of P. Ratkowiak regarding service of Notice of (I) Agreement to Enter Mediation Prior to Response Due Date and (II) Selection of Mediator Related [+] Filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-] 6
6 6 misc Affidavit Fri 10/05 3:32 PM
Affidavit (Notice of (I) Agreement to Enter Mediation Prior to Response Due Date and (II) Selection of Mediator) Related [+]. Filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-] 5390
Wednesday, June 13, 2018
5 5 motion Motion, Extend Time Wed 06/13 8:05 PM
Motion to Extend Time (SunEdison Litigation Trusts Motion for Order Extending Time for Service of Process Pursuant to Rules 7004(a) and 9006(b)(1) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure in Certain Adversary Proceedings) filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust with hearing to be held on 7/10/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 7/3/2018,. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Motion
Att: 2 Exhibit A to Motion - Proposed Order
Friday, June 08, 2018
4 4 misc Certificate of Service Fri 06/08 10:57 PM
Certificate of Service of P. Ratkowiak regarding service of Complaint, Second Summons and Order Granting SunEdison Litigation Trust's Motion for Order Establishing Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code [Docket No. 5390] Related [+] Filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-] 1 ,3
Wednesday, June 06, 2018
3 3 cmp Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (PDF Upload) Wed 06/06 2:58 PM
Second Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference against Dynasolar Services, LLC . (Ortiz, Carmen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 05, 2018
misc Request for Subsequent Summons Tue 06/05 12:09 PM
Request for a Second Summons filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 02, 2018
2 2 cmp Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference Mon 04/02 3:33 PM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 5/15/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB), Answer due by 5/2/2018, (Braithwaite, Kenishia)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Mon 04/02 11:50 AM
Adversary case 18-01062 Complaint against Dynasolar Services, LLC to: (I) Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547, 548 and 550; and (II) Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 502(d) (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) Filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-]