Broward County, Florida v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-45332 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 02, 2018 |
Case in other court: | Florida Southern, 0:18-cv-60535 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 5:26 PM EST |
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
One Johnson & Johnson
New Brunswick, NJ 08933 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Noramco, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Wal-Mart Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Walgreen Co.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Actavis, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Allergan Finance LLC
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CVS Orlando, Florida Distribution, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CVS Vero, Florida Distribution, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo International PLC
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
H. D. Smith, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
HealthMart Systems, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Insys Therapeutics, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Broward County, Florida
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
Terminated: 07/16/2018
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
Terminated: 07/16/2018
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
H. D. Smith Holding Company
Terminated: 06/11/2018
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
H. D. Smith Holdings, LLC
Terminated: 06/11/2018
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 5:45 PM EDT |
Monday, March 12, 2018 | ||
1 | 1 179 pgs COMPLAINT FOR: (1) VIOLATION OF THE FLORIDA DECEPTIVE AND UNFAIR TRADE PRACTICES ACT; (2) PUBLIC NUISANCE; (3) NEGLIGENCE; (4) UNJUST ENRICHMENT; AND (5) VIOLATION OF THE RACKETEER INFLUENCED AND CORRUPT ORGANIZATIONS ACT against AmerisourceBergen Corporation, CVS Health Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo International PLC, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., HealthMart Systems, Inc., Insys Therapeutics, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, McKesson Corporation, Purdue Pharma L.P., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Wal-Mart Inc. f/k/a Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. a/k/a Walgreen Co.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-10477840, filed by Broward County, Florida.(Gilbert, Robert) [Transferred from flsd on 4/2/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
2 | 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (rms1) [Transferred from flsd on 4/2/2018.] | |
Wednesday, March 21, 2018 | ||
3 | 3 ORDER STAYING CASE. Administratively Closing Case. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 3/21/2018. (pes) NOTICE: If there are sealed documents in this case, they may be unsealed after 1 year or as directed by Court Order, unless they have been designated to be permanently sealed. See Local Rule 5.4 and Administrative Order 2014-69. [Transferred from flsd on 4/2/2018.] | |
Thursday, March 29, 2018 | ||
4 | 4 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Broward County, Florida. Attorney Mark Jeffrey Dearman added to party Broward County, Florida(pty:pla). (Dearman, Mark) [Transferred from flsd on 4/2/2018.] | |
Friday, March 30, 2018 | ||
5 | 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (dj) [Transferred from flsd on 4/2/2018.] | |
6 | 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Broward County, Florida. AmerisourceBergen Corporation waiver sent on 3/20/2018, answer due 5/21/2018. (Dearman, Mark) [Transferred from flsd on 4/2/2018.] | |
7 | 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Broward County, Florida. Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. waiver sent on 3/20/2018, answer due 5/21/2018. (Dearman, Mark) [Transferred from flsd on 4/2/2018.] | |
8 | 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Broward County, Florida. Cardinal Health, Inc. waiver sent on 3/20/2018, answer due 5/21/2018. (Dearman, Mark) [Transferred from flsd on 4/2/2018.] | |
Monday, April 02, 2018 | ||
9 | 9 Certified CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-17) transferring case to the Northern District of Ohio re: MDL 2804 for consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to the Honorable Dan A. Polster. (Signed by Jeffery N. Luthi, Clerk of the Panel). (gp) [Transferred from flsd on 4/2/2018.] | |
10 | 10 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Florida Southern. Case number 0:18-cv-60535. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |