Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-10992

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Stuart M Bernstein
Case #: 1:18-ap-01083
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Apr 03, 2018
Terminated:Jan 29, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Next Phase Solar Inc.
Represented By
Next Phase Solar Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
SunEdison Litigation Trust
Represented By
David R. Hurst
Cole, Schotz, Meisel, Forman & Leonard,
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Friday, January 29, 2021
misc Close Adversary Proceeding Fri 01/29 11:41 AM
Adversary Case 1:18-ap-1083 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Barrett, Chantel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 09, 2019
13 13 notice Notice, Dismissal Tue 04/09 1:50 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Related [+] filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-] 3
Tuesday, November 27, 2018
12 12 misc Affidavit Tue 11/27 12:08 PM
Affidavit (Notice of Selection of Mediator) Related [+]. Filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-] 5390
Monday, October 15, 2018
11 11 answer Statement Mon 10/15 3:17 PM
Statement /ENPHASE ENERGY INC. DBA NEXT PHASE SOLAR, INC.S CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Related [+] filed by Benjamin Mintz on behalf of Enphase Energy, Inc.. (Mintz, Benjamin)
Related: [-] 9
10 10 17 pgs answer Memorandum of Law Mon 10/15 3:14 PM
Memorandum of Law /MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF NEXT PHASE SOLAR, INC.S MOTION TO DISMISS ADVERSARY COMPLAINT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT Related [+] filed by Benjamin Mintz on behalf of Enphase Energy, Inc.. (Mintz, Benjamin)
Related: [-] 9
9 9 motion Motion, Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Mon 10/15 3:12 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding /NEXT PHASE SOLAR, INC.S MOTION TO DISMISS ADVERSARY COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEEDURE 12(b)(6) OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEEDURE 12(e) Related [+] filed by Benjamin Mintz on behalf of Enphase Energy, Inc.. (Mintz, Benjamin)
Related: [-] 1
Friday, July 20, 2018
8 8 notice Notice, Appearance in Adversary Proceeding Fri 07/20 11:58 AM
Notice of Appearance in Adversary Proceeding filed by Benjamin Mintz on behalf of Next Phase Solar Inc.. (Mintz, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 18, 2018
7 7 misc Certificate of Service Mon 06/18 6:22 PM
Amended Certificate of Service of P. Ratkowiak regarding service of First Amended Complaint, Second Summons and Order Granting SunEdison Litigation Trust's Motion for Order Establishing Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code [Docket No. 5390] Related [+] Filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-] 6
Friday, June 15, 2018
6 6 misc Certificate of Service Fri 06/15 2:27 PM
Certificate of Service of P. Ratkowiak regarding service of First Amended Complaint, Second Summons and Order Granting SunEdison Litigation Trust's Motion for Order Establishing Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code [Docket No. 5390] Related [+] Filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-] 3 ,5
Thursday, June 14, 2018
5 5 cmp Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (PDF Upload) Thu 06/14 3:49 PM
Second Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference against Next Phase Solar Inc. (Ortiz, Carmen)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Motion, Extend Time Thu 06/14 10:17 AM
Motion to Extend Time (SunEdison Litigation Trust's Motion for Order Extending Time for Service of Process Pursuant to Rules 7004(a) and 9006(b)(1) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure in Certain Adversary Proceedings) filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust with hearing to be held on 7/10/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 7/3/2018,. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Motion
Att: 2 Exhibit A to Motion - Proposed Order
Wednesday, June 13, 2018
3 3 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 06/13 11:45 AM
Amended Complaint against Next Phase Solar Inc. (First) to: (I) Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547, 548 and 550; and (II) Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 502(d) Related [+] Filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-] 1
misc Request for Subsequent Summons Wed 06/13 1:49 PM
Request for a Second Summons filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 03, 2018
2 2 cmp Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference Tue 04/03 12:26 PM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference to be held on 5/15/2018 (check with court for location), Answer due by 5/3/2018, (Braithwaite, Kenishia)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Tue 04/03 11:42 AM
Adversary case 18-01083 Complaint against Next Phase Solar Inc. to: (I) Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547, 548 and 550; and (II) Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 502(d) (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) Filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-]