Maryland District Court
Judge:Catherine C Blake
Case #: 1:18-cv-00945
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal - Employment Discrim
Case Filed:Apr 02, 2018
Terminated:Aug 21, 2018
Last checked: Saturday Sep 29, 2018 5:45 AM EDT
Defendant
Parexel International
Defendant
Parexel International, LLC
Represented By
Kathleen A McGinley
Jackson Lewis PC
contact info
Larry R Seegull
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Ventzislav Valtchev
1803 Reynolds Court
Crofton, MD 21114
Represented By
Shelby Suzanne Skeabeck
Shawe & Rosenthal
contact info
Elizabeth Torphy Donzella
Shawe And Rosenthal LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Shamaila Khaliq
Represented By
Elizabeth Marzo Borinsky
contact info

GPO Aug 21 2018
MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 8/21/2018. (dass, Deputy Clerk) (c/m 8/21/18-das)

Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Friday, August 31, 2018
30 30 corresp Miscellaneous Fri 08/31 2:25 PM
Copy of remand letter from Circuit Court for Baltimore City re: dated receipt of remand. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 27, 2018
29 29 utility Remark Mon 08/27 1:53 PM
Certified mail signed receipt. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 21, 2018
28 28 corresp Miscellaneous Tue 08/21 4:05 PM
Correspondence to the Clerk of the Circuit Court for Baltimore City re: Remand. (dass, Deputy Clerk) (cc/m 8/21/18-das) (dass, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certified mail reciept
Att: 2 (8/21/2018) Signed Letter
27 27 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Remand to State Court Tue 08/21 3:49 PM
ORDER granting Plainitiff's11 Motion to Remand to the Circuit Court for Baltimore City; closing case. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 8/21/2018. (dass, Deputy Clerk) (c/m 8/21/18-das)
Related: [-]
26 26 5 pgs order Memorandum Opinion Tue 08/21 3:47 PM
MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 8/21/2018. (dass, Deputy Clerk) (c/m 8/21/18-das)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 30, 2018
25 25 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 07/30 12:22 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re11 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Shamaila Khaliq.(Borinsky, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Shamaila Khaliq
Monday, July 23, 2018
24 24 notice Notice (Other) Mon 07/23 9:02 AM
NOTICE by Ventzislav Valtchev NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL (Torphy Donzella, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 18, 2018
23 23 1 pgs order Memorandum to Parties Wed 07/18 3:45 PM
MEMORANDUM to Counsel re: the plaintff's reply regarding the motion to remand was filed incorrectly. Please re-file so the motion may be resolved. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 7/18/2018. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 13, 2018
22 22 notice QC Notice - Miscellaneous Wed 06/13 9:50 AM
QC NOTICE:21 Motion to Remand, filed by Shamaila Khaliq was filed incorrectly. **REPLY was filed as a MOTION in error. Please re-file using the event "Reply to Response to Motion" found in the category "Motions and Related Filings", sub-category "Responses and Replies". Please link the Reply to the Original Motion (ECF#11) when prompted. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 12, 2018
21 21 motion Remand Tue 06/12 11:03 PM
MOTION to Remand Reply to Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand by Shamaila Khaliq(Borinsky, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Declaration of Shamaila Khaliq
Wednesday, May 30, 2018
20 20 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Wed 05/30 9:56 AM
MARGINAL ORDER granting Plaintiff's19 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Reply to Defendant Parexel's Opposition to Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 5/30/2018. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
utility Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Wed 05/30 9:57 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to11 MOTION to Remand to State Court . Reply due by 6/12/2018. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 28, 2018
19 19 motion Extension of Time Mon 05/28 1:28 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Reply to Defendant PAREXEL's Opposition to Motion to Remand by Shamaila Khaliq(Borinsky, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 18, 2018
18 18 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 05/18 4:05 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re11 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Parexel International, LLC.(McGinley, Kathleen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, May 02, 2018
17 17 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 05/02 4:55 PM
MARGINAL ORDER granting Parexel International, LLC's15 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to11 MOTION to Remand to State Court . Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 5/2/2018. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
16 16 2 pgs order Order Wed 05/02 4:53 PM
MARGINAL ORDER approving13 Stipulation for extension of time for Defendant Valtchez to respond to the complaint, filed by Ventzislav Valtchev. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 5/2/2018. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 30, 2018
15 15 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 04/30 12:15 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion to Remand by Parexel International, LLC.(McGinley, Kathleen)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 27, 2018
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 04/27 2:33 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Shelby Suzanne Skeabeck on behalf of Ventzislav Valtchev (Skeabeck, Shelby)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Stipulation Fri 04/27 2:31 PM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time by Ventzislav Valtchev(Torphy Donzella, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 04/27 2:27 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Torphy Donzella on behalf of Ventzislav Valtchev (Torphy Donzella, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Saturday, April 21, 2018
11 11 motion Remand to State Court Sat 04/21 5:59 PM
MOTION to Remand to State Court by Shamaila Khaliq(Borinsky, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement Memorandum in Support of Motion to Remand,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibits in Support of Motion to Remand
Friday, April 13, 2018
10 10 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 04/13 4:57 PM
MARGINAL ORDER granting9 Consent Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant PAREXEL International, LLC to File Response to Complaint. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 4/13/2018. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 04/13 1:07 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to2 Complaint by Parexel International, LLC.(Seegull, Larry)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 12, 2018
8 8 misc Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement Thu 04/12 3:42 PM
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Parexel International, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Parexel International Corporation, Corporate Parent Pamplona Investment Partners I LP for Parexel International, LLC.(Seegull, Larry)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Supplemental Thu 04/12 3:36 PM
Supplemental to1 Notice of Removal filed by Parexel International, LLC (Seegull, Larry)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 03, 2018
6 6 corresp Miscellaneous Tue 04/03 3:28 PM
Removal Notification Letter to Defendant Valtchev. (c/m 4/3/18-das) (dass, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
5 5 corresp Miscellaneous Tue 04/03 3:23 PM
Removal Notification Letter to Counsel. (c/m and c/em via ad hoc to attorneys E.Borinsky and F. Boston 4/3/18) (dass, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
notice Deficiency Notice Tue 04/03 3:52 PM
Deficiency Notice to Parexel International, LLC -- Your Local Rule 103.3 disclosure statement has not been filed. The Statement must be filed by 4/10/2018 (dass, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 02, 2018
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/03 3:06 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Larry R Seegull on behalf of Parexel International, LLC (dass, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/03 3:05 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen A McGinley on behalf of Parexel International, LLC (dass, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
2 2 cmp Complaint Tue 04/03 3:01 PM
COMPLAINT against Parexel International, Parexel International, LLC, Ventzislav Valtchev, filed by Shamaila Khaliq.(dass, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Case Information Report
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Tue 04/03 2:48 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Baltimore City, case number 24C181440 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 14637105101), filed by Parexel International, LLC.(dass, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Remark - State Court Docs Tue 04/03 3:04 PM
THE ABOVE DOCUMENT (2) IS A COPY OF ORIGINAL PAPER FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR BALTIMIORE CITY. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]